EP1418067 - Towing eye [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.04.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 13.11.2013 [2013/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Scharmüller, Josef Hauptstrasse 25 A-4870 Vöcklamarkt / AT | [2004/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2004/20] | Representative(s) | Gibler, Ferdinand Gibler & Poth Patentanwälte OG Dorotheergasse 7/14 1010 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2004/20] | Gibler, Ferdinand, Dipl.Ing. Dr. Patentanwalt Dorotheergasse 7 1010 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 03450231.0 | 15.10.2003 | [2004/20] | Priority number, date | AT20020001696 | 11.11.2002 Original published format: AT 16962002 | [2004/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1418067 | Date: | 12.05.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1418067 | Date: | 11.08.2004 | [2004/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1418067 | Date: | 02.06.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.06.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B60D1/42, B60D1/14 | [2004/20] | CPC: |
B60D1/565 (EP);
B60D1/143 (EP);
B60D2001/544 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/20] | Title | German: | Zugöse | [2004/20] | English: | Towing eye | [2004/20] | French: | Anneau de remorquage | [2004/20] | Examination procedure | 11.02.2005 | Examination requested [2005/15] | 23.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.09.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.02.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.04.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 22.04.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.03.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 02.06.2010 | CZ | 02.06.2010 | DK | 02.06.2010 | EE | 02.06.2010 | FI | 02.06.2010 | IE | 02.06.2010 | RO | 02.06.2010 | SE | 02.06.2010 | SI | 02.06.2010 | SK | 02.06.2010 | BG | 02.09.2010 | GR | 03.09.2010 | ES | 13.09.2010 | PT | 04.10.2010 | AT | 15.10.2010 | LU | 15.10.2010 | BE | 31.10.2010 | CH | 31.10.2010 | LI | 31.10.2010 | MC | 31.10.2010 | HU | 03.12.2010 | [2013/46] |
Former [2013/42] | CY | 02.06.2010 | |
CZ | 02.06.2010 | ||
DK | 02.06.2010 | ||
EE | 02.06.2010 | ||
FI | 02.06.2010 | ||
IE | 02.06.2010 | ||
RO | 02.06.2010 | ||
SE | 02.06.2010 | ||
SI | 02.06.2010 | ||
SK | 02.06.2010 | ||
BG | 02.09.2010 | ||
GR | 03.09.2010 | ||
PT | 04.10.2010 | ||
AT | 15.10.2010 | ||
LU | 15.10.2010 | ||
BE | 31.10.2010 | ||
CH | 31.10.2010 | ||
LI | 31.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
HU | 03.12.2010 | ||
Former [2012/44] | BG | 02.06.2010 | |
CY | 02.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 02.06.2010 | ||
DK | 02.06.2010 | ||
EE | 02.06.2010 | ||
FI | 02.06.2010 | ||
IE | 02.06.2010 | ||
RO | 02.06.2010 | ||
SE | 02.06.2010 | ||
SI | 02.06.2010 | ||
SK | 02.06.2010 | ||
GR | 03.09.2010 | ||
PT | 04.10.2010 | ||
AT | 15.10.2010 | ||
LU | 15.10.2010 | ||
BE | 31.10.2010 | ||
CH | 31.10.2010 | ||
LI | 31.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
HU | 03.12.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | BG | 02.06.2010 | |
CY | 02.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 02.06.2010 | ||
DK | 02.06.2010 | ||
EE | 02.06.2010 | ||
FI | 02.06.2010 | ||
IE | 02.06.2010 | ||
RO | 02.06.2010 | ||
SE | 02.06.2010 | ||
SI | 02.06.2010 | ||
SK | 02.06.2010 | ||
GR | 03.09.2010 | ||
PT | 04.10.2010 | ||
AT | 15.10.2010 | ||
BE | 31.10.2010 | ||
CH | 31.10.2010 | ||
LI | 31.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
HU | 03.12.2010 | ||
Former [2012/41] | BG | 02.06.2010 | |
CY | 02.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 02.06.2010 | ||
DK | 02.06.2010 | ||
EE | 02.06.2010 | ||
FI | 02.06.2010 | ||
IE | 02.06.2010 | ||
RO | 02.06.2010 | ||
SE | 02.06.2010 | ||
SI | 02.06.2010 | ||
SK | 02.06.2010 | ||
GR | 03.09.2010 | ||
PT | 04.10.2010 | ||
AT | 15.10.2010 | ||
BE | 31.10.2010 | ||
CH | 31.10.2010 | ||
LI | 31.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
Former [2012/11] | CY | 02.06.2010 | |
CZ | 02.06.2010 | ||
DK | 02.06.2010 | ||
EE | 02.06.2010 | ||
FI | 02.06.2010 | ||
IE | 02.06.2010 | ||
RO | 02.06.2010 | ||
SE | 02.06.2010 | ||
SI | 02.06.2010 | ||
SK | 02.06.2010 | ||
GR | 03.09.2010 | ||
PT | 04.10.2010 | ||
AT | 15.10.2010 | ||
BE | 31.10.2010 | ||
CH | 31.10.2010 | ||
LI | 31.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/38] | CY | 02.06.2010 | |
CZ | 02.06.2010 | ||
DK | 02.06.2010 | ||
EE | 02.06.2010 | ||
FI | 02.06.2010 | ||
IE | 02.06.2010 | ||
RO | 02.06.2010 | ||
SE | 02.06.2010 | ||
SI | 02.06.2010 | ||
SK | 02.06.2010 | ||
GR | 03.09.2010 | ||
PT | 04.10.2010 | ||
BE | 31.10.2010 | ||
CH | 31.10.2010 | ||
LI | 31.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/24] | CY | 02.06.2010 | |
CZ | 02.06.2010 | ||
DK | 02.06.2010 | ||
EE | 02.06.2010 | ||
FI | 02.06.2010 | ||
IE | 02.06.2010 | ||
RO | 02.06.2010 | ||
SE | 02.06.2010 | ||
SI | 02.06.2010 | ||
SK | 02.06.2010 | ||
GR | 03.09.2010 | ||
PT | 04.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/19] | CY | 02.06.2010 | |
CZ | 02.06.2010 | ||
DK | 02.06.2010 | ||
EE | 02.06.2010 | ||
FI | 02.06.2010 | ||
IE | 02.06.2010 | ||
RO | 02.06.2010 | ||
SE | 02.06.2010 | ||
SI | 02.06.2010 | ||
SK | 02.06.2010 | ||
GR | 03.09.2010 | ||
PT | 04.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/10] | CY | 02.06.2010 | |
CZ | 02.06.2010 | ||
EE | 02.06.2010 | ||
FI | 02.06.2010 | ||
IE | 02.06.2010 | ||
RO | 02.06.2010 | ||
SE | 02.06.2010 | ||
SI | 02.06.2010 | ||
SK | 02.06.2010 | ||
GR | 03.09.2010 | ||
PT | 04.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/09] | CY | 02.06.2010 | |
EE | 02.06.2010 | ||
FI | 02.06.2010 | ||
IE | 02.06.2010 | ||
SE | 02.06.2010 | ||
SI | 02.06.2010 | ||
GR | 03.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/07] | CY | 02.06.2010 | |
FI | 02.06.2010 | ||
IE | 02.06.2010 | ||
SE | 02.06.2010 | ||
SI | 02.06.2010 | ||
GR | 03.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/05] | CY | 02.06.2010 | |
FI | 02.06.2010 | ||
SE | 02.06.2010 | ||
SI | 02.06.2010 | ||
GR | 03.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/01] | FI | 02.06.2010 | |
SE | 02.06.2010 | ||
SI | 02.06.2010 | ||
GR | 03.09.2010 | ||
Former [2010/52] | FI | 02.06.2010 | |
SE | 02.06.2010 | ||
SI | 02.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/50] | FI | 02.06.2010 | |
SE | 02.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/49] | SE | 02.06.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2356998 (GEORGE HANIQUET) [Y] 1,10,12,13 * figure 1 *; | [Y]DE6910130U (FENDT & CO XAVER [DE]) [Y] 1,10,12,13 * figures 1,2 *; | [XY]US4157189 (POLEY ROGER G [US]) [X] 1,2,5 * figure 4 * [Y] 4,6,7; | [A]DE3049456 (FRIESE PAUL) [A] 1,10-13 * figure 1 *; | [A]EP0650857 (CBM SPA [IT]) [A] 1,10-13 * column 5 - column 6; figure 1 *; | [XY]US5725229 (MCWETHY WESLEY I [US]) [X] 1-3,5,8,9 * figure 1 * [Y] 4,6,7; | [X]US2001038191 (MASSEY RANDY A [US]) [X] 1-4 * figure 12 *; | [XP] - URL: www.buyersproducts.com, (20040317), XP002273890 [XP] 1-3,5,8,9 * Pages were created the 21/9/2001 * |