EP1476928 - SLEEVE FOR A HIGH-VOLTAGE CABLE AND CABLE ELEMENT PROVIDED WITH A SLEEVE OF THIS TYPE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.12.2006 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABB Schweiz AG Brown Boveri Strasse 6 5400 Baden / CH | [2006/04] |
Former [2004/47] | For all designated states ABB Schweiz AG Brown Boveri Strasse 6 5400 Baden / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GRAMESPACHER, Hansjoerg Loorenstrasse 27 CH-5443 Niederrohrdorf / CH | 02 /
GREUTER, Felix Im Bettliacher 8 CH-5406 Rütihof / CH | 03 /
HAGEMEISTER, Michael Weinbergstr. 168 CH-8006 Zürich / CH | [2004/47] | Representative(s) | ABB Patent Attorneys C/o ABB Schweiz AG Intellectual Property CH-IP Brown Boveri Strasse 6 5400 Baden / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2004/47] | ABB Patent Attorneys c/o ABB Schweiz AG, Intellectual Property (CH-LC/IP), Brown Boveri Strasse 6 5400 Baden / CH | Application number, filing date | 03700297.9 | 29.01.2003 | [2004/47] | WO2003CH00073 | Priority number, date | EP20020405124 | 18.02.2002 Original published format: EP 02405124 | [2004/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03069752 | Date: | 21.08.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1476928 | Date: | 17.11.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.08.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1476928 | Date: | 25.01.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.08.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H02G15/068, H02G15/184 | [2004/47] | CPC: |
H02G15/184 (EP,US);
H02G15/068 (EP,US);
Y10S174/08 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1328 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/47] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HÜLLKÖRPER FÜR EIN HOCHSPANNUNGSKABEL UND KABELELEMENT, WELCHES MIT EINEM SOLCHEN HÜLLKÖRPER VERSEHEN IST | [2004/47] | English: | SLEEVE FOR A HIGH-VOLTAGE CABLE AND CABLE ELEMENT PROVIDED WITH A SLEEVE OF THIS TYPE | [2004/47] | French: | ENVELOPPE POUR CABLE HAUTE TENSION, ET ELEMENT DE CABLE MUNI D'UNE TELLE ENVELOPPE | [2004/47] | Entry into regional phase | 06.08.2004 | National basic fee paid | 06.08.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.08.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.08.2004 | Examination requested [2004/47] | 29.07.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.09.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 15.09.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.10.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 25.01.2006 | CZ | 25.01.2006 | EE | 25.01.2006 | FI | 25.01.2006 | IE | 25.01.2006 | NL | 25.01.2006 | SI | 25.01.2006 | SK | 25.01.2006 | TR | 25.01.2006 | AT | 29.01.2006 | BE | 31.01.2006 | MC | 31.01.2006 | LU | 25.03.2006 | BG | 25.04.2006 | DK | 25.04.2006 | SE | 25.04.2006 | GR | 26.04.2006 | ES | 06.05.2006 | PT | 26.06.2006 | HU | 26.07.2006 | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/38] | CZ | 25.01.2006 | |
EE | 25.01.2006 | ||
FI | 25.01.2006 | ||
IE | 25.01.2006 | ||
NL | 25.01.2006 | ||
SI | 25.01.2006 | ||
SK | 25.01.2006 | ||
TR | 25.01.2006 | ||
AT | 29.01.2006 | ||
BE | 31.01.2006 | ||
MC | 31.01.2006 | ||
LU | 25.03.2006 | ||
BG | 25.04.2006 | ||
DK | 25.04.2006 | ||
SE | 25.04.2006 | ||
GR | 26.04.2006 | ||
ES | 06.05.2006 | ||
PT | 26.06.2006 | ||
HU | 26.07.2006 | ||
Former [2008/32] | CZ | 25.01.2006 | |
EE | 25.01.2006 | ||
FI | 25.01.2006 | ||
IE | 25.01.2006 | ||
NL | 25.01.2006 | ||
SI | 25.01.2006 | ||
SK | 25.01.2006 | ||
AT | 29.01.2006 | ||
BE | 31.01.2006 | ||
MC | 31.01.2006 | ||
LU | 25.03.2006 | ||
BG | 25.04.2006 | ||
DK | 25.04.2006 | ||
SE | 25.04.2006 | ||
GR | 26.04.2006 | ||
ES | 06.05.2006 | ||
PT | 26.06.2006 | ||
HU | 26.07.2006 | ||
Former [2008/28] | CZ | 25.01.2006 | |
EE | 25.01.2006 | ||
FI | 25.01.2006 | ||
IE | 25.01.2006 | ||
NL | 25.01.2006 | ||
SI | 25.01.2006 | ||
SK | 25.01.2006 | ||
AT | 29.01.2006 | ||
BE | 31.01.2006 | ||
MC | 31.01.2006 | ||
LU | 25.03.2006 | ||
BG | 25.04.2006 | ||
DK | 25.04.2006 | ||
SE | 25.04.2006 | ||
GR | 26.04.2006 | ||
ES | 06.05.2006 | ||
PT | 26.06.2006 | ||
Former [2008/21] | CZ | 25.01.2006 | |
FI | 25.01.2006 | ||
IE | 25.01.2006 | ||
NL | 25.01.2006 | ||
SI | 25.01.2006 | ||
SK | 25.01.2006 | ||
AT | 29.01.2006 | ||
BE | 31.01.2006 | ||
MC | 31.01.2006 | ||
LU | 25.03.2006 | ||
BG | 25.04.2006 | ||
DK | 25.04.2006 | ||
SE | 25.04.2006 | ||
GR | 26.04.2006 | ||
ES | 06.05.2006 | ||
PT | 26.06.2006 | ||
Former [2007/45] | FI | 25.01.2006 | |
IE | 25.01.2006 | ||
NL | 25.01.2006 | ||
SI | 25.01.2006 | ||
SK | 25.01.2006 | ||
AT | 29.01.2006 | ||
BE | 31.01.2006 | ||
MC | 31.01.2006 | ||
LU | 25.03.2006 | ||
BG | 25.04.2006 | ||
DK | 25.04.2006 | ||
SE | 25.04.2006 | ||
ES | 06.05.2006 | ||
PT | 26.06.2006 | ||
Former [2007/40] | FI | 25.01.2006 | |
IE | 25.01.2006 | ||
IT | 25.01.2006 | ||
NL | 25.01.2006 | ||
SI | 25.01.2006 | ||
SK | 25.01.2006 | ||
AT | 29.01.2006 | ||
BE | 31.01.2006 | ||
MC | 31.01.2006 | ||
LU | 25.03.2006 | ||
BG | 25.04.2006 | ||
DK | 25.04.2006 | ||
SE | 25.04.2006 | ||
ES | 06.05.2006 | ||
PT | 26.06.2006 | ||
Former [2007/28] | FI | 25.01.2006 | |
IE | 25.01.2006 | ||
NL | 25.01.2006 | ||
SI | 25.01.2006 | ||
SK | 25.01.2006 | ||
AT | 29.01.2006 | ||
BE | 31.01.2006 | ||
MC | 31.01.2006 | ||
LU | 25.03.2006 | ||
BG | 25.04.2006 | ||
DK | 25.04.2006 | ||
SE | 25.04.2006 | ||
ES | 06.05.2006 | ||
PT | 26.06.2006 | ||
Former [2007/13] | FI | 25.01.2006 | |
IE | 25.01.2006 | ||
NL | 25.01.2006 | ||
SI | 25.01.2006 | ||
SK | 25.01.2006 | ||
BE | 31.01.2006 | ||
MC | 31.01.2006 | ||
LU | 25.03.2006 | ||
BG | 25.04.2006 | ||
DK | 25.04.2006 | ||
SE | 25.04.2006 | ||
ES | 06.05.2006 | ||
PT | 26.06.2006 | ||
Former [2007/03] | FI | 25.01.2006 | |
IE | 25.01.2006 | ||
NL | 25.01.2006 | ||
SI | 25.01.2006 | ||
SK | 25.01.2006 | ||
MC | 31.01.2006 | ||
BG | 25.04.2006 | ||
DK | 25.04.2006 | ||
SE | 25.04.2006 | ||
PT | 26.06.2006 | ||
Former [2006/52] | FI | 25.01.2006 | |
IE | 25.01.2006 | ||
NL | 25.01.2006 | ||
SI | 25.01.2006 | ||
MC | 31.01.2006 | ||
BG | 25.04.2006 | ||
DK | 25.04.2006 | ||
SE | 25.04.2006 | ||
PT | 26.06.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | FI | 25.01.2006 | |
IE | 25.01.2006 | ||
NL | 25.01.2006 | ||
SI | 25.01.2006 | ||
MC | 31.01.2006 | ||
BG | 25.04.2006 | ||
SE | 25.04.2006 | ||
PT | 26.06.2006 | ||
Former [2006/45] | FI | 25.01.2006 | |
NL | 25.01.2006 | ||
MC | 31.01.2006 | ||
SE | 25.04.2006 | ||
Former [2006/44] | FI | 25.01.2006 | |
MC | 31.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/36] | FI | 25.01.2006 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4418240 (CHAZELAS ELIE [FR]) [A] 1-21* the whole document *; | [AD]EP0875087 (RAYCHEM GMBH [DE]) [AD] 1-21 * the whole document *; | [A]WO0074191 (ABB AB [SE], et al) [A] 1-21 * page 3, line 7 - page 5, line 2; figures 1-3 *; | [AD]US6171669 (VALLAURI UBALDO [IT], et al) [AD] 1-4,9,10 * the whole document * |