EP1461968 - IMPROVEMENTS RELATING TO DIGITAL WIRELESS COMMUNICATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 23.12.2005 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.12.2005 | Withdrawal of application | published on 08.02.2006 [2006/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sleepydog Limited 35K Western Boulevard Leicester LE2 7HN / GB | [2004/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MOORES, Toby 35K Western Boulevard Leicester LE2 7HN / GB | 02 /
LAST, Benjamin James No. 5 King Edward Close, Kingsmead Northwich, Cheshire / GB | 03 /
HILTON, Mark Anthony 12 Ashleigh Road Leicester, LE3 0FA / GB | 04 /
ALLEN, Joanne Elizabeth 26 Kirby Lane, Kirby Muxloe Leicester LE3 3JG / GB | [2004/40] | Representative(s) | Ahmad, Sheikh Shakeel, et al Keltie LLP No.1 London Bridge London SE1 9BA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/40] | Ahmad, Sheikh Shakeel, et al David Keltie Associates Fleet Place House 2 Fleet Place London EC4M 7ET / GB | Application number, filing date | 03700332.4 | 03.01.2003 | [2004/40] | WO2003GB00006 | Priority number, date | GB20020000100 | 03.01.2002 Original published format: GB 0200100 | [2004/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03061309 | Date: | 24.07.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/30] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1461968 | Date: | 29.09.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.07.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.11.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q7/22 | [2004/40] | CPC: |
H04W4/12 (EP);
H04M1/72439 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/40] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERBESSERUNGEN BEZÜGLICH DIGITALER DRAHTLOSKOMMUNIKATIONEN | [2004/40] | English: | IMPROVEMENTS RELATING TO DIGITAL WIRELESS COMMUNICATIONS | [2004/40] | French: | AMELIORATIONS APPORTEES A DES COMMUNICATIONS SANS FIL NUMERIQUES | [2004/40] | Entry into regional phase | 14.07.2004 | National basic fee paid | 14.07.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.07.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.07.2004 | Examination requested [2004/40] | 27.10.2004 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 14.02.2005 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims | 15.09.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time | 15.12.2005 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2006/06] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2005 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5590406 (BAYLEY GWAIN [US], et al) [A] 1,22,23 * column 6, line 25 - line 44 *; | [A]US6112084 (SICHER ALAN [US], et al) [A] 1,22,23 * column 3, line 30 - line 58 * * column 10, line 33 - column 11, line 6 *; | [A] - YAMASHINA M ET AL, "PHS MOBILE MULTIMEDIA TERMINAL SYSTEM", NTT REVIEW, TELECOMMUNICATIONS ASSOCIATION, TOKYO, JP, (19970501), vol. 9, no. 3, ISSN 0915-2334, pages 94 - 105, XP000694470 [A] 1,22,23 * page 94, column 2, line 5 - page 95, column 2, line 5 * |