EP1466273 - INFORMATION DATA RETRIEVAL, WHERE THE DATA IS ORGANIZED IN TERMS, DOCUMENTS AND DOCUMENT CORPORA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.03.2011 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Elucidon Group Limited 15 The Green Richmond / GB | [2006/03] |
Former [2004/42] | For all designated states Elucidon AB Box 45093 104 30 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LINDH, Per Hypoteksvägen 22 S-129 30 Hägersten / SE | 02 /
LÖNDAHL, Björn Glavagatan 23 S-123 71 Farsta / SE | [2004/42] | Representative(s) | Wihlsson, Joakim Per Magnus Bjerkéns Patentbyrå KB P.O. Box 5366 102 49 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/42] | Wihlsson, Joakim Per Magnus Bjerkéns Patentbyra KB, Östermalmsgatan 58 114 50 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 03700652.5 | 13.01.2003 | [2004/42] | WO2003SE00033 | Priority number, date | SE20020000108 | 16.01.2002 Original published format: SE 0200108 | US20020387891P | 13.06.2002 Original published format: US 387891 P | [2004/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03060766 | Date: | 24.07.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1466273 | Date: | 13.10.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.07.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1466273 | Date: | 28.04.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 24.07.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30 | [2004/42] | CPC: |
G06F16/289 (EP,US);
Y10S707/99933 (US);
Y10S707/99935 (US);
Y10S707/99945 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/42] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ABRUF VON INFORMATIONSDATEN, WOBEI DATEN IN BEDINGUNGEN, DOKUMENTEN UND DOKUMENT-CORPORA ORGANISIERT SIND | [2004/42] | English: | INFORMATION DATA RETRIEVAL, WHERE THE DATA IS ORGANIZED IN TERMS, DOCUMENTS AND DOCUMENT CORPORA | [2004/42] | French: | RECUPERATION DE DONNEES D'INFORMATIONS ORGANISEES EN TERMES, EN DOCUMENTS ET EN CORPUS DE DOCUMENTS | [2004/42] | Entry into regional phase | 11.06.2004 | National basic fee paid | 11.06.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.06.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.06.2004 | Examination requested [2004/42] | 27.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.05.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.03.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 17.03.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.01.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 28.04.2010 | BE | 28.04.2010 | CY | 28.04.2010 | CZ | 28.04.2010 | DK | 28.04.2010 | EE | 28.04.2010 | FI | 28.04.2010 | HU | 28.04.2010 | IT | 28.04.2010 | NL | 28.04.2010 | SE | 28.04.2010 | SI | 28.04.2010 | SK | 28.04.2010 | TR | 28.04.2010 | BG | 28.07.2010 | GR | 29.07.2010 | ES | 08.08.2010 | PT | 30.08.2010 | IE | 13.01.2011 | LU | 13.01.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 28.04.2010 | |
BE | 28.04.2010 | ||
CY | 28.04.2010 | ||
CZ | 28.04.2010 | ||
DK | 28.04.2010 | ||
EE | 28.04.2010 | ||
FI | 28.04.2010 | ||
IT | 28.04.2010 | ||
NL | 28.04.2010 | ||
SE | 28.04.2010 | ||
SI | 28.04.2010 | ||
SK | 28.04.2010 | ||
TR | 28.04.2010 | ||
BG | 28.07.2010 | ||
GR | 29.07.2010 | ||
ES | 08.08.2010 | ||
PT | 30.08.2010 | ||
IE | 13.01.2011 | ||
LU | 13.01.2011 | ||
Former [2013/42] | AT | 28.04.2010 | |
BE | 28.04.2010 | ||
CY | 28.04.2010 | ||
CZ | 28.04.2010 | ||
DK | 28.04.2010 | ||
EE | 28.04.2010 | ||
FI | 28.04.2010 | ||
IT | 28.04.2010 | ||
NL | 28.04.2010 | ||
SE | 28.04.2010 | ||
SI | 28.04.2010 | ||
SK | 28.04.2010 | ||
BG | 28.07.2010 | ||
GR | 29.07.2010 | ||
ES | 08.08.2010 | ||
PT | 30.08.2010 | ||
IE | 13.01.2011 | ||
LU | 13.01.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 28.04.2010 | |
BE | 28.04.2010 | ||
CY | 28.04.2010 | ||
CZ | 28.04.2010 | ||
DK | 28.04.2010 | ||
EE | 28.04.2010 | ||
FI | 28.04.2010 | ||
IT | 28.04.2010 | ||
NL | 28.04.2010 | ||
SE | 28.04.2010 | ||
SI | 28.04.2010 | ||
SK | 28.04.2010 | ||
GR | 29.07.2010 | ||
ES | 08.08.2010 | ||
PT | 30.08.2010 | ||
IE | 13.01.2011 | ||
LU | 13.01.2011 | ||
Former [2012/08] | AT | 28.04.2010 | |
BE | 28.04.2010 | ||
CY | 28.04.2010 | ||
CZ | 28.04.2010 | ||
DK | 28.04.2010 | ||
EE | 28.04.2010 | ||
FI | 28.04.2010 | ||
IT | 28.04.2010 | ||
NL | 28.04.2010 | ||
SE | 28.04.2010 | ||
SI | 28.04.2010 | ||
SK | 28.04.2010 | ||
GR | 29.07.2010 | ||
ES | 08.08.2010 | ||
PT | 30.08.2010 | ||
IE | 13.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/15] | AT | 28.04.2010 | |
BE | 28.04.2010 | ||
CY | 28.04.2010 | ||
CZ | 28.04.2010 | ||
DK | 28.04.2010 | ||
EE | 28.04.2010 | ||
FI | 28.04.2010 | ||
IT | 28.04.2010 | ||
NL | 28.04.2010 | ||
SE | 28.04.2010 | ||
SI | 28.04.2010 | ||
SK | 28.04.2010 | ||
GR | 29.07.2010 | ||
ES | 08.08.2010 | ||
PT | 30.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/13] | AT | 28.04.2010 | |
BE | 28.04.2010 | ||
CY | 28.04.2010 | ||
CZ | 28.04.2010 | ||
DK | 28.04.2010 | ||
EE | 28.04.2010 | ||
FI | 28.04.2010 | ||
NL | 28.04.2010 | ||
SE | 28.04.2010 | ||
SI | 28.04.2010 | ||
SK | 28.04.2010 | ||
GR | 29.07.2010 | ||
ES | 08.08.2010 | ||
PT | 30.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/10] | AT | 28.04.2010 | |
CY | 28.04.2010 | ||
CZ | 28.04.2010 | ||
DK | 28.04.2010 | ||
EE | 28.04.2010 | ||
FI | 28.04.2010 | ||
NL | 28.04.2010 | ||
SE | 28.04.2010 | ||
SI | 28.04.2010 | ||
SK | 28.04.2010 | ||
GR | 29.07.2010 | ||
ES | 08.08.2010 | ||
PT | 30.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/08] | AT | 28.04.2010 | |
CY | 28.04.2010 | ||
DK | 28.04.2010 | ||
EE | 28.04.2010 | ||
FI | 28.04.2010 | ||
NL | 28.04.2010 | ||
SE | 28.04.2010 | ||
SI | 28.04.2010 | ||
GR | 29.07.2010 | ||
ES | 08.08.2010 | ||
PT | 30.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/07] | AT | 28.04.2010 | |
CY | 28.04.2010 | ||
DK | 28.04.2010 | ||
FI | 28.04.2010 | ||
NL | 28.04.2010 | ||
SE | 28.04.2010 | ||
SI | 28.04.2010 | ||
GR | 29.07.2010 | ||
ES | 08.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/05] | AT | 28.04.2010 | |
CY | 28.04.2010 | ||
FI | 28.04.2010 | ||
NL | 28.04.2010 | ||
SE | 28.04.2010 | ||
SI | 28.04.2010 | ||
GR | 29.07.2010 | ||
ES | 08.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/01] | AT | 28.04.2010 | |
FI | 28.04.2010 | ||
NL | 28.04.2010 | ||
SE | 28.04.2010 | ||
SI | 28.04.2010 | ||
GR | 29.07.2010 | ||
ES | 08.08.2010 | ||
Former [2010/52] | AT | 28.04.2010 | |
FI | 28.04.2010 | ||
NL | 28.04.2010 | ||
SE | 28.04.2010 | ||
SI | 28.04.2010 | ||
ES | 08.08.2010 | ||
Former [2010/50] | AT | 28.04.2010 | |
FI | 28.04.2010 | ||
NL | 28.04.2010 | ||
SE | 28.04.2010 | ||
ES | 08.08.2010 | ||
Former [2010/49] | AT | 28.04.2010 | |
NL | 28.04.2010 | ||
SE | 28.04.2010 | ||
ES | 08.08.2010 | ||
Former [2010/46] | NL | 28.04.2010 | |
ES | 08.08.2010 | ||
Former [2010/45] | NL | 28.04.2010 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5619709 (CAID WILLIAM R [US], et al); | [A]US5794178 (CAID WILLIAM ROBERT [US], et al); | [A]WO0033160 (TELECOM PARTNERS LTD [US], et al); | [AP]WO02071277 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US], et al); | [AE]US6510406 (MARCHISIO GIOVANNI B [US]) |