Designated contracting states | AT | | BE | | BG | | CH | | CY | | CZ | | DE | | DK | | EE | | ES | | FI | | FR | | GB | | GR | | HU | | IE | | IT | | LI | | LU | | MC | Lapse: 31.01.2009 | NL | | PT | | SE | | SI | | SK | | TR | | Examination procedure | 01.10.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Entry into regional phase | 24.08.2004 | National basic fee paid | | 24.08.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | | 24.08.2004 | Examination fee paid | | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | European patent granted | 19.11.2008 | Opposition procedure | 20.08.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.10.2009 | INPADOC data Tooltip | The EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority. | Event date: | 27.10.2004 | | Event description: | REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED | Effective DATE: | 20040824 | | Event date: | 27.10.2004 | | Event description: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | A2 | Designated State(s): | AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR | | Event date: | 27.10.2004 | | Event description: | REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT | Validation States: | AL LT LV MK RO | | Event date: | 04.10.2006 | | Event description: | PARTY DATA CHANGED (APPLICANT DATA CHANGED OR RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION TRANSFERRED) | OWNER: | MERCK FROSST CANADA LTD. | | Event date: | 15.08.2007 | | Event description: | FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED | Effective DATE: | 20070712 | | Event date: | 19.11.2008 | | Event description: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | B1 | Designated State(s): | AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR | | Event date: | 19.11.2008 | | Event description: | REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT | Validation States: | AL LT LV MK RO | | Event date: | 19.11.2008 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG GB FG4D | Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED | | Event date: | 28.11.2008 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH EP | Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENT TAKES EFFECT AS A NATIONAL PATENT IN CH/LI | | Event date: | 10.12.2008 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG IE FG4D | Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND | | Event date: | 15.12.2008 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH NV | Code Expl.: | NEW AGENT | REPRESENTATIVE: | RITSCHER & PARTNER AG | | Event date: | 02.01.2009 | | Event description: | CORRESPONDS TO: | Ref Document Number: | 60324767 | Country of Ref Document: | DE | DATE OF REF DOCUMENT: | 20090102 | Kind Code of Ref Document: | P | | Event date: | 09.03.2009 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DK T3 | Code Expl.: | +EP PATENT WITH DANISH CLAIMS | | Event date: | 18.03.2009 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG IE SPCF | Code Expl.: | REQUEST FOR GRANT OF SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE | Free Format Text: | SPC003/2009: 20090219 | SPC Suppl Protection Certif: | SPC003/2009 | Filing DATE: | 20090219 | | Event date: | 25.03.2009 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG GB CTFF | Code Expl.: | SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE FILED | Free Format Text: | PRODUCT NAME: LAROPIPRANT OR A PHARMACEUTICALLY ACCEPTABLE SALT THEREOF AND OPTIONALLY NICOTINIC ACID; REGISTERED: UK EU/1/08/459/001 20080703; UK EU/1/08/459/002 20080703; UK EU/1/08/459/003 20080703; UK EU/1/08/459/004 20080703; UK EU/1/08/459/005 20080703; UK EU/1/08/459/006 20080703; UK EU/1/08/459/007 20080703; UK EU/1/08/459/008 20080703; UK EU/1/08/459/009 20080703; UK EU/1/08/459/010 20080703; UK EU/1/08/459/011 20080703; UK EU/1/08/458/001 20080703; UK EU/1/08/458/002 20080703; UK EU/1/08/458/003 20080703; UK EU/1/08/458/004 20080703; UK EU/1/08/458/005 20080703; UK EU/1/08/458/006 20080703; UK EU/1/08/458/007 20080703; UK EU/1/08/458/008 20080703; UK EU/1/08/458/009 20080703; UK EU | SPC Suppl Protection Certif: | SPC/GB09/009 | Filing DATE: | 20090220 | | Event date: | 17.04.2009 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR CR | Code Expl.: | REQUEST FOR SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE LAID OPEN TO THE PUBLIC (EEC REGULATION OF 18 JUNE 1992) | Free Format Text: | PRODUCT NAME: LAROPIPRANT OU L?UN DE SES SELS PHARMACEUTIQUEMENT ACCEPTABLES ET ACIDE NICOTINIQUE; REGISTRATION NO/DATE IN FRANCE: EU/1/08/459/001 DU 20080703; REGISTRATION NO/DATE AT EEC: EU/1/08/459/001 DU 20080703 | SPC Suppl Protection Certif: | 09C0010 | Filing DATE: | 20090312 | | Event date: | 16.04.2009 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG ES FG2A 2316717 T3 | Code Expl.: | +DEFINITIVE PROTECTION | | Event date: | 06.05.2009 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG NL AC1 | Code Expl.: | APPLICATION FOR A SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE | SPC Suppl Protection Certif: | 300377 | Filing DATE: | 20090220 | | Event date: | 27.04.2009 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG LU CCP | Code Expl.: | +SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE | Free Format Text: | 91534, EXPIRES: 20230707 | SPC Suppl Protection Certif: | 91534 | Expiry DATE: | 20230707 | | Event date: | 25.03.2009 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FI SPCF | Code Expl.: | SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE APPLICATION FILED | SPC Suppl Protection Certif: | C20090008 | | Event date: | 05.06.2009 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR CP | Code Expl.: | SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE (SPC) FILED | | Event date: | 15.06.2009 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DK CTFF | Code Expl.: | APPLICATION FOR SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE (SPC) FILED | SPC Suppl Protection Certif: | CA 2009 00006 | Filing DATE: | 20090328 | Expiry DATE: | 20230703 | | Event date: | 29.06.2009 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG HU AG4A E005019 HU | Code Expl.: | +FILING OF THE TRANSLATION OF THE TEXT OF EUROPEAN PATENTS | | Event date: | 25.05.2009 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG LT ND9D | Code Expl.: | +FILING A SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE | Free Format Text: | PRODUCT NAME: ACIDUM NICOTINICUM/LAROPIPRANTUM; REG. NO/DATE: EU/1/08/458-460/011 20080703 | SPC Suppl Protection Certif: | PA2009001 | Filing DATE: | 20090325 | | Event date: | 15.07.2009 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG AT UEP 414690 AT T | Code Expl.: | +PUBLICATION OF TRANSLATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT SPECIFICATION | | Event date: | 31.08.2009 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | MC | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20090131 | | Event date: | 02.09.2009 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG IE SPCG | Code Expl.: | +SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE GRANTED | Free Format Text: | SPC003/2009: 20090811, EXPIRES: 20230702 | SPC Suppl Protection Certif: | SPC003/2009 | Filing DATE: | 20090811 | Expiry DATE: | 20230702 | | Event date: | 15.09.2009 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG AT ESZA 414690 AT T | Code Expl.: | +APPLICATION FILED FOR A CERTIFICATE OF PROTECTION (E-SERIES) | Free Format Text: | PRODUCT NAME: LAROPIPRANT ODER EIN PHARMAZEUTISCH ANNEHMBARES SALZ DAVON UND NICOTINSAEURE | SPC Suppl Protection Certif: | SZ 14/2009 | Filing DATE: | 20090519 | | Event date: | 28.10.2009 | | Event description: | NO OPPOSITION FILED | Effective DATE: | 20090820 | | Event date: | 29.05.2009 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH SPCF | Code Expl.: | SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE FILED | Free Format Text: | PRODUCT NAME: LAROPIPRANT + NIKOTINSAEURE; REGISTRATION NUMBER/DATE: SWISSMEDIC 58647 26.03.2009 | Filing DATE: | 20090527 | | Event date: | 18.12.2009 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR CY | Code Expl.: | +SUPPLEMENTARY CERTIFICATE OF PROTECTION GRANTED (EEC REGULATION OF 18 JUNE 1992) | Free Format Text: | PRODUCT NAME: LAROPIPRANT OU L?UN DE SES SELS PHARMACEUTIQUEMENT ACCEPTABLES ET ACIDE NICOTINIQUE; REGISTRATION NO/DATE IN FRANCE: EU/1/08/459/001 DU 20080703; REGISTRATION NO/DATE AT EEC: EU/1/08/459/001 DU 20080703 | SPC Suppl Protection Certif: | 09C0010 | Filing DATE: | 20090312 | Extension DATE: | 20230703 | | Event date: | 18.12.2009 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR AV | Code Expl.: | OTHER ACTION AFFECTING THE EXISTENCE OR THE VALIDITY OF AN INDUSTRIAL PROPERTY RIGHT | | Event date: | 25.05.2009 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG LT ND9D | Code Expl.: | +FILING A SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE | Free Format Text: | PRODUCT NAME: ACIDUM NICOTINICUM/LAROPIPRANTUM; REG.NO./DATE: EU/1/08/459/001-011, EU/1/08/458/001-011, EU/1/08/460/001-011 20080703 | SPC Suppl Protection Certif: | PA2009001 | Filing DATE: | 20090325 | | Event date: | 16.06.2009 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG SE SPCF | Code Expl.: | APPLICATION FOR SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE FILED | Free Format Text: | PRODUCT NAME: NIKOTINSYRA/LAROPIPRANT; NAT REG. NO/DATE: EG EU/1/08/459/001-011 20080703; FIRST REG.: EG EU/1/08/459/001-011 20080703 | SPC Suppl Protection Certif: | 09900101.L | | Event date: | 23.02.2010 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG SE SPCG | Code Expl.: | +SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE GRANTED | SPC Suppl Protection Certif: | 09900101.L | | Event date: | 17.02.2009 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG SE TRGR | Code Expl.: | +TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT | | Event date: | 30.01.2009 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG PT SC4A | Code Expl.: | +TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE | Free Format Text: | AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION | Effective DATE: | 20090120 | | Event date: | 18.12.2009 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR AV | Code Expl.: | OTHER ACTION AFFECTING THE EXISTENCE OR THE VALIDITY OF AN INDUSTRIAL PROPERTY RIGHT | SPC Suppl Protection Certif: | 09C0010 | | Event date: | 31.12.2010 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH SPCG | Code Expl.: | +SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE GRANTED | Free Format Text: | PRODUCT NAME: LAROPIPRANT + NIKOTINSAEURE; REGISTRATION NUMBER/DATE: SWISSMEDIC 58647 26.03.2009 | SPC Suppl Protection Certif: | C01470107/01 | Filing DATE: | 20090527 | Extension DATE: | 20240325 | | Event date: | 20.04.2011 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG GB CTFG | Code Expl.: | SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE GRANTED | Free Format Text: | PRODUCT NAME: LAROPIPRANT OR A PHARMACEUTICALLY ACCEPTABLE SALT THEREOF AND NICOTINIC ACID; REGISTERED: UK EU/1/08/459/001 20080703; UK EU/1/08/459/002 20080703; UK EU/1/08/459/003 20080703; UK EU/1/08/459/004 20080703; UK EU/1/08/459/005 20080703; UK EU/1/08/459/006 20080703; UK EU/1/08/460/009 20080703; UK EU/1/08/460/010 20080703; UK EU/1/08/460/011 20080703; UK EU/1/08/460/003 20080703; UK EU/1/08/460/004 20080703; UK EU/1/08/460/005 20080703; UK EU/1/08/460/006 20080703; UK EU/1/08/460/007 20080703; UK EU/1/08/460/008 20080703; UK EU/1/08/458/008 20080703; UK EU/1/08/458/009 20080703; UK EU/1/08/458/010 20080703; UK EU/1/08/458/011 20080703; UK EU/1/08/460/001 20080703; UK EU/1/08/460/0 | SPC Suppl Protection Certif: | SPC/GB09/009 | Filing DATE: | 20090220 | Extension DATE: | 20230702 | Effective DATE: | 20110404 | | Event date: | 25.02.2010 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG LT SPCG | Code Expl.: | +GRANT OF AN SPC | Free Format Text: | PRODUCT NAME: ACIDUM NICOTINICUM/LAROPIPRANTUM; REGISTRATION NO/DATE: EU/1/08/459/001-EU/1/08/459/011 2008 07 03, EU/1/08/458/001-EU/1/08/458/011 2008 07 03, EU/1/08/460/001-EU/1/08/460/01 20080703 | SPC Suppl Protection Certif: | PA2009001,C1470107 | Filing DATE: | 20090325 | Expiry DATE: | 20230122 | Extension DATE: | 20230703 | | Event date: | 25.05.2009 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG LT SPCF | Code Expl.: | FILING AN SPC | Free Format Text: | PRODUCT NAME: ACIDUM NICOTINICUM/LAROPIPRANTUM; REGISTRATION NO/DATE: EU/1/08/459/001-EU/1/08/459/011 2008 07 03, EU/1/08/458/001-EU/1/08/458/011 2008 07 03, EU/1/08/460/001-EU/1/08/460/01 20080703 | SPC Suppl Protection Certif: | PA2009001 | Filing DATE: | 20090325 | Expiry DATE: | 20230122 | | Event date: | 20.12.2012 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FI SPCG | Code Expl.: | +SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE GRANTED | SPC Suppl Protection Certif: | 363 | Extension DATE: | 20230703 | | Event date: | 31.05.2013 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | CY | Payment DATE: | 20121228 | Year of Fee Payment: | 11 | | Event date: | 15.06.2009 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG EE AA1Y E002909 EE | Code Expl.: | +SPC FILED | SPC Suppl Protection Certif: | C20090001 | Filing DATE: | 20090325 | | Event date: | 15.06.2009 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG EE FG1Y E002909 EE | Code Expl.: | +SPC GRANTED | Free Format Text: | PRODUCT NAME: TREDAPTIVE; FIRST REGISTRATION NO/DATE: K(2008)3457 20080703 | SPC Suppl Protection Certif: | C20090001 00022 | Filing DATE: | 20090325 | Extension DATE: | 20230703 | | Event date: | 13.12.2013 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH PFA | Code Expl.: | NAME/FIRM CHANGED | OWNER: | MERCK FROSST CANADA LTD., CA | Free Format Text: | FORMER OWNER: MERCK FROSST CANADA LTD., CA | | Event date: | 31.01.2014 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | PT | Payment DATE: | 20131227 | Year of Fee Payment: | 12 | | Event date: | 31.01.2014 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | EE | Payment DATE: | 20131230 | Year of Fee Payment: | 12 | | Event date: | 31.01.2014 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | SK | Payment DATE: | 20131227 | Year of Fee Payment: | 12 | | Event date: | 31.01.2014 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DK | Payment DATE: | 20131227 | Year of Fee Payment: | 12 | | Event date: | 28.02.2014 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FI | Payment DATE: | 20131227 | Year of Fee Payment: | 12 | | Event date: | 28.02.2014 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GR | Payment DATE: | 20131230 | Year of Fee Payment: | 12 | | Event date: | 17.03.2014 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DK CTFW | Code Expl.: | -SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE (SPC) WITHDRAWN, REFUSED OR DEEMED WITHDRAWN | Free Format Text: | PRODUCT NAME: LAROPIPRANT ELLER ET FARMACEUTISK ACCEPTABELT SALT DERAF OG EVENTUELT NIKOTINSYRE; NAT. REG. NO/DATE: EU/1/08/459/001-011,EU/7/08/458/001-011, EU/1/08/460/001-011 20080703; FIRST REG. NO/DATE: EU EU/1/08/459/001-011, EU/7/08/458/001-011, EU/1/08/460/001-011 20080703 | SPC Suppl Protection Certif: | CA 2009 00006 | Filing DATE: | 20090328 | Expiry DATE: | 20230122 | Extension DATE: | 20230703 | | Event date: | 31.03.2014 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | LU | Payment DATE: | 20140211 | Year of Fee Payment: | 12 | | Event date: | 30.04.2014 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | CH | Payment DATE: | 20140127 | Year of Fee Payment: | 12 | | Event date: | 30.04.2014 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IE | Payment DATE: | 20140102 | Year of Fee Payment: | 12 | | Event date: | 30.04.2014 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | CZ | Payment DATE: | 20140102 | Year of Fee Payment: | 12 | | Event date: | 30.04.2014 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | BE | Payment DATE: | 20140127 | Year of Fee Payment: | 12 | | Event date: | 30.04.2014 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | NL | Payment DATE: | 20140108 | Year of Fee Payment: | 12 | | Event date: | 30.04.2014 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | SE | Payment DATE: | 20140109 | Year of Fee Payment: | 12 | | Event date: | 30.04.2014 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | BG | Payment DATE: | 20140106 | Year of Fee Payment: | 12 | | Event date: | 30.05.2014 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | AT | Payment DATE: | 20131227 | Year of Fee Payment: | 12 | | Event date: | 30.05.2014 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | SI | Payment DATE: | 20140103 | Year of Fee Payment: | 12 | | Event date: | 30.05.2014 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | HU | Payment DATE: | 20131224 | Year of Fee Payment: | 12 | | Event date: | 30.05.2014 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | TR | Payment DATE: | 20140108 | Year of Fee Payment: | 12 | | Event date: | 30.05.2014 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | ES | Payment DATE: | 20140120 | Year of Fee Payment: | 12 | | Event date: | 30.05.2014 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IT | Payment DATE: | 20140121 | Year of Fee Payment: | 12 | | Event date: | 28.05.2014 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG GB SPCX | Code Expl.: | CORRECTION OF AN ERROR IN THE GAZETTE CONCERNING A SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE (SPC) OR A PAEDIATRIC EXTENSION | Free Format Text: | SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE NO SPC/GB09/009 GRANTED TO MERCK CANADA INC. IN RESPECT OF THE PRODUCT LAROPIPRANT OR A PHARMACEUTICALLY ACCEPTABLE SALT THEREOF AND NICOTINIC ACID, THE GRANT OF WHICH WAS ADVERTISED IN JOURNAL NO 6361 DATED 20 APRIL 2011 HAS HAD ITS MAXIMUM PERIOD OF DURATION CORRECTED, SUBJECT TO THE PAYMENT OF THE PRESCRIBED FEES IT WILL EXPIRE ON 06 JULY 2023. | SPC Suppl Protection Certif: | SPC/GB09/009 | | Event date: | 31.10.2014 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | CY | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20140122 | | Event date: | 30.06.2015 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | BE | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20150131 | | Event date: | 12.08.2015 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG NL V1 | Code Expl.: | -LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE | Effective DATE: | 20150801 | | Event date: | 25.08.2015 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG LT MM9D | Code Expl.: | -EP PATENT NO LONGER VALID IN THE REPUBLIC OF LITHUANIA | Effective DATE: | 20150122 | | Event date: | 31.08.2015 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | LU | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20150122 | | Event date: | 01.09.2015 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG SE SPCC | Code Expl.: | -SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE IS INVALID AS THE BASIC PATENT HAS CEASED BEFORE THE 20-YEAR PROTECTION PERIOD | SPC Suppl Protection Certif: | 0990010-1 | Effective DATE: | 20150123 | | Event date: | 01.09.2015 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG SE EUG | Code Expl.: | -EP PATENT HAS LAPSED | | Event date: | 29.07.2015 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG PT MM4A | Code Expl.: | -ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT | Free Format Text: | LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES | Effective DATE: | 20150722 | | Event date: | 28.08.2015 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH PL | Code Expl.: | -PATENT CEASED | | Event date: | 31.08.2015 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DK EBP | Code Expl.: | -EP PATENT LAPSED | Effective DATE: | 20150131 | | Event date: | 15.09.2015 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG AT MM01 414690 AT T | Code Expl.: | -LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES | Effective DATE: | 20150122 | | Event date: | 15.09.2015 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG EE MM4A E002909 EE | Code Expl.: | -LAPSED BY NOT PAYING THE ANNUAL FEES | Effective DATE: | 20150131 | | Event date: | 30.09.2015 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | NL | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20150801 | | Event date: | 02.10.2015 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG SK MM4A E 5215 SK | Code Expl.: | -PATENT LAPSED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF MAINTENANCE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20150122 | | Event date: | 30.10.2015 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | BG | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20150930 | | Event date: | 30.10.2015 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | LI | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20150131 | | Event date: | 30.10.2015 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FI | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20150122 | | Event date: | 30.10.2015 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | SK | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20150122 | | Event date: | 30.10.2015 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | EE | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20150131 | | Event date: | 30.10.2015 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | CH | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20150131 | | Event date: | 30.10.2015 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | CZ | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20150122 | | Event date: | 30.10.2015 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | PT | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20150722 | | Event date: | 30.10.2015 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG SI KO00 | Code Expl.: | -LAPSE OF PATENT | Effective DATE: | 20150909 | | Event date: | 04.11.2015 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG IE MM4A | Code Expl.: | -PATENT LAPSED | | Event date: | 30.11.2015 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | HU | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20150123 | | Event date: | 30.11.2015 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GR | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20150805 | | Event date: | 30.11.2015 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | SE | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20150123 | | Event date: | 30.11.2015 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | SI | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20150123 | | Event date: | 30.11.2015 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | AT | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20150122 | | Event date: | 31.12.2015 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IT | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20150122 | | Event date: | 30.12.2015 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR PLFP | Code Expl.: | +FEE PAYMENT | Year of Fee Payment: | 14 | | Event date: | 29.01.2016 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GB | Payment DATE: | 20151230 | Year of Fee Payment: | 14 | | Event date: | 29.01.2016 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IE | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20150122 | | Event date: | 29.01.2016 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DK | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20150131 | | Event date: | 26.02.2016 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG ES FD2A | Code Expl.: | -ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN | Effective DATE: | 20160226 | | Event date: | 02.10.2015 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG GR ML 20090400059 GR | Code Expl.: | -LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES | Effective DATE: | 20150805 | | Event date: | 16.02.2009 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG GR EP 20090400059 GR | Code Expl.: | +EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE | | Event date: | 29.04.2016 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | ES | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20150123 | | Event date: | 29.04.2016 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DE | Payment DATE: | 20160127 | Year of Fee Payment: | 14 | | Event date: | 31.05.2016 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FR | Payment DATE: | 20151230 | Year of Fee Payment: | 14 | | Event date: | 01.06.2016 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG IE SPCI | Code Expl.: | -SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE DECLARED INVALID | SPC Suppl Protection Certif: | SPC003/2009 | Effective DATE: | 20160512 | | Event date: | 29.11.2010 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG HU AA1S | Code Expl.: | +INFORMATION ON APPLICATION FOR A SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE | Free Format Text: | PRODUCT NAME: LAROPITANT OR ITS PHARMACEUTICALLY ACCEPTABLE SALT AND OPTIONALLY NICOTINIC ACID; REG. NO/DATE: EU/1/08/459/001-011 20080703 | SPC Suppl Protection Certif: | S0900003 | Filing DATE: | 20090302 | | Event date: | 31.08.2017 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | TR | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20150122 | | Event date: | 01.08.2017 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R119 60324767 DE | Code Expl.: | -APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE | | Event date: | 27.09.2017 | | Event description: | GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE | Effective DATE: | 20170122 | | Event date: | 27.10.2017 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR ST | Code Expl.: | -NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE | Effective DATE: | 20170929 | | Event date: | 31.10.2017 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FR | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20170131 | | Event date: | 30.11.2017 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GB | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20170122 | | Event date: | 30.11.2017 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DE | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20170801 | | Event date: | 15.07.2018 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG AT SPCN 414690 AT T | Code Expl.: | -NULLIFICATION OF AN SPC | Free Format Text: | PRODUCT NAME: LAROPIPRANT ODER EIN PHARMAZEUTISCH ANNEHMBARES SALZ DAVON UND NICOTINSAEURE; REGISTRATION NO/DATE: EU/1/08/459/001-011 EU1/08/458/001-011 EU1/08/460/001-011 20080703 | SPC Suppl Protection Certif: | 14/2009 | Filing DATE: | 20090519 | Expiry DATE: | 20230122 | Extension DATE: | 20230703 | Effective DATE: | 20230122 | | Event date: | 15.07.2018 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG AT SPCN 414690 AT T | Code Expl.: | -NULLIFICATION OF AN SPC | Free Format Text: | PRODUCT NAME: LAROPIPRANT ODER EIN PHARMAZEUTISCH ANNEHMBARES SALZ DAVON; REGISTRATION NO/DATE: EU/1/08/459/001-011 EU/1/08/458/001-011 EU/1/08/460/001-011 20080703 | SPC Suppl Protection Certif: | 41/2010 | Filing DATE: | 20101123 | Expiry DATE: | 20230122 | Extension DATE: | 20230703 | Effective DATE: | 20230122 | | Event date: | 10.05.2019 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG LT SPCW | Code Expl.: | -WITHDRAWAL OF AN SPC | Free Format Text: | PRODUCT NAME: ACIDUM NICOTINICUM/LAROPIPRANTUM; REGISTRATION NO/DATE: EU/1/08/459/001-EU/1/08/459/011 2008 07 03, EU/1/08/458/001-EU/1/08/458/011 2008 07 03, EU/1/08/460/001-EU/1/08/460/01 20080703 | SPC Suppl Protection Certif: | PA2009001,C1470107 | Filing DATE: | 20090325 | Expiry DATE: | 20230122 | Extension DATE: | 20230703 | Effective DATE: | 20190510 | | Event date: | 08.06.2009 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG IT SPCG 502009901701238 IT | Code Expl.: | +SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE (SPC) GRANTED | Free Format Text: | PRODUCT NAME: LAROPIPRANT E ACIDO NICOTINICO(TREDAPTIVE, TREVACLYN, PELZONT); AUTHORISATION NUMBER(S) AND DATE(S): TREDAPTIVE: EU/1/08/459 DA/001 A 011;TREVACLYN:EU/1/08/458 DA 001A011;PELZONT:EU/1/08/460DA 001A011, 20080703 | SPC Suppl Protection Certif: | 132009901716075 | Extension DATE: | 20230703 | | Event date: | 23.03.2009 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG IT SPCF 502009901701238 IT | Code Expl.: | +SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE (SPC) FILED | Free Format Text: | PRODUCT NAME: LAROPIPRANT E ACIDO NICOTINICO(TREDAPTIVE, TREVACLYN, PELZONT); AUTHORISATION NUMBER(S) AND DATE(S): TREDAPTIVE: EU/1/08/459 DA/001 A 011;TREVACLYN:EU/1/08/458 DA 001A011;PELZONT:EU/1/08/460DA 001A011, 20080703 | SPC Suppl Protection Certif: | 132009901716075 | | Event date: | 17.10.2008 | | Event description: | (EXPECTED) GRANT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009210 | | Event date: | 10.10.2008 | | Event description: | GRANT FEE PAID | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR3 | | Event date: | 26.07.2008 | | Event description: | DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT A PATENT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR1 | | Event date: | 10.09.2004 | | Event description: | PUBLIC REFERENCE MADE UNDER ARTICLE 153(3) EPC TO A PUBLISHED INTERNATIONAL APPLICATION THAT HAS ENTERED THE EUROPEAN PHASE | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009012 | | Event date: | 25.09.2009 | | Event description: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: NO OPPOSITION FILED WITHIN TIME LIMIT | | Event date: | 25.09.2009 | | Event description: | NO OPPOSITION FILED WITHIN TIME LIMIT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009261 | | Event date: | 13.05.2022 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH SPCL | Code Expl.: | -SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE DELETION | SPC Suppl Protection Certif: | C01470107/01 | | Event date: | 12.04.2023 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG GB SPCI | Code Expl.: | -SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE INVALID | Free Format Text: | PRODUCT NAME: LAROPIPRANT OR A PHARMACEUTICALLY ACCEPTABLE SALT THEREOF AND NICOTINIC ACID; REGISTERED: UK EU/1/08/459/001 20080707; UK EU/1/08/459/002 20080707; UK EU/1/08/459/003 20080707; UK EU/1/08/459/004 20080707; UK EU/1/08/459/005 20080707; UK EU/1/08/459/006 20080707; UK EU/1/08/460/009 20080707; UK EU/1/08/460/010 20080707; UK EU/1/08/460/011 20080707; UK EU/1/08/460/003 20080707; UK EU/1/08/460/004 20080707; UK EU/1/08/460/005 20080707; UK EU/1/08/460/006 20080707; UK EU/1/08/460/007 20080707; UK EU/1/08/460/008 20080707; UK EU/1/08/458/008 20080707; UK EU/1/08/458/009 20080707; UK EU/1/08/458/010 20080707; UK EU/1/08/458/011 20080707; UK EU/1/08/460/001 20080707; UK EU/1/08/460/0 | SPC Suppl Protection Certif: | SPC/GB09/009 | Filing DATE: | 20090220 | Effective DATE: | 20220122 | | Event date: | 12.03.2009 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR CP | Code Expl.: | SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE (SPC) FILED | Free Format Text: | PRODUCT NAME: LAROPIPRANT; ACIDE NICOTINIQUE; REGISTRATION NO/DATE: EU/1/08/459/001 20080703 | SPC Suppl Protection Certif: | 09C0010 | Filing DATE: | 20090312 | |