EP1473101 - SURFACE-COATED CUTTING TOOL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.05.2008 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 23.12.2009 [2009/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Electric Industries, Ltd. 5-33 Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0041 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/47] | For all designated states SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES, Ltd 5-33 Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0041 / JP | ||
Former [2004/45] | For all designated states SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES, Ltd 5-33 Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0041 / JP | ||
For all designated states OKADA, Yoshio, Itami Works of Sumitomo Electric Industries, Ltd 1-1, Koyakita 1-chome Itami-shi, Hyogo 664-0016 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OKADA, Yoshio, Itami Works of Sumitomo E. I. Ltd. 1-1, Koyakita 1-chome Itami-shi, Hyogo 664-0016 / JP | 02 /
MORIGUCHI, Hideki, Itami Works of Sumitomo E.I.L. 1-1, Koyakita 1-chome Itami-shi, Hyogo 664-0016 / JP | [2004/45] | Representative(s) | Cross, Rupert Edward Blount, et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/52] | Cross, Rupert Edward Blount, et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | ||
Former [2004/45] | Cross, Rupert Edward Blount, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 03701086.5 | 14.01.2003 | [2004/45] | WO2003JP00232 | Priority number, date | JP20020010098 | 18.01.2002 Original published format: JP 2002010098 | JP20020347391 | 29.11.2002 Original published format: JP 2002347391 | [2004/45] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03061885 | Date: | 31.07.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1473101 | Date: | 03.11.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.07.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 31.07.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.09.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C23C16/30, B23B27/14, C23C30/00 | [2007/42] | CPC: |
C23C16/30 (EP,KR,US);
B23B27/14 (KR);
C23C30/005 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24942 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24975 (EP,US);
Y10T428/265 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2004/45] | B23B27/14, C23C16/30 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/45] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | Title | German: | OBERFLÄCHENBESCHICHTETES SCHNEIDWERKZEUG | [2004/45] | English: | SURFACE-COATED CUTTING TOOL | [2004/45] | French: | OUTIL DE COUPE PRESENTANT UN REVETEMENT DE SURFACE | [2004/45] | Entry into regional phase | 05.08.2004 | Translation filed | 05.08.2004 | National basic fee paid | 05.08.2004 | Search fee paid | 05.08.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.08.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.08.2004 | Examination requested [2004/45] | 20.12.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/24] | 25.01.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2008 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2370551 (EUROTUNGSTENE [FR]) [A] 1-3,5-12 * example 2; claims 1,4 *; | [A]JPS586970 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES) [A] 1-3,5-12 * Patent Abstracts of Japan;; tables 1-3 *; | [DA]JPS5867858 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES) [DA] 1-3,5-13 * Patent Abstracts of Japan *; | [A]DE3434616 (SCHMALKALDEN WERKZEUG [DD]) [A] 4,5 * claims 1,4 *; | [A]JPS61195975 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES) [A] 1-3,5-12 * Patent Abstracts of Japan *; | [A]US4895770 (SCHINTLMEISTER WILFRIED [AT], et al) [A] 1-3,5-12 * column 3, line 34 - column 4, line 33 *; | [A]EP0787683 (TECMACHINE [FR]) [A] 1-3,5-12 * claims 1-3 *; | [A]US6293739 (UCHINO KATSUYA [JP], et al) [A] 1-3,5-12 * the whole document *; | [A] - PEYTAVY J L ET AL, "STUDY OF SOME PROPERTIES OF TITANIUM BORONITRIDE USED FOR THE COATING OF CUTTING TOOLS", JAN 1979, (197901), vol. 52, no. 1, pages 89 - 94, XP002428771 [A] 1-3,5-12 * the whole document * | [A] - PFOHL C ET AL, "Wear-resistant PACVD coatings of the system Ti-B-N", SURF COAT TECHNOL; SURFACE AND COATINGS TECHNOLOGY 1999 ELSEVIER SEQUOIA SA, LAUSANNE, SWITZERLAND, (19980914), vol. 116, pages 911 - 915, XP002428772 [A] 1-3,5-12 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0257-8972(99)00141-3 | International search | [A]JPH11140647 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES); | [A]JP2000141107 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES); | [A]JPS5732366 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES); | [A]JPH10176288 (BALZERS HOCHVAKUUM, et al) |