EP1467129 - SPRAYING PISTON RING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.04.2011 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.12.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GB | published on 04.01.2012 [2012/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Riken 13-5, Kudankita 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 102-0073 / JP | [2010/21] |
Former [2004/42] | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Riken 13-5, Kudan-Kita 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 102-0073 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OBARA, Ryou, c/o K. K. Riken Kashiwazaki Plt. 1-37 Hokuto-cho Kawasaki-shi, Niigata 945-0027 / JP | [2009/52] |
Former [2004/42] | 01 /
OBARA, Ryou, c/o K. K. Riken Kashiwazaki Plt. 1-37 Hokuto-cho Kawasaki-shi, Niigata 945-0027 / JP | Representative(s) | Strobel, Wolfgang, et al Kroher-Strobel Rechts- und Patentanwälte PartmbB Bavariaring 20 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/49] | Strobel, Wolfgang, et al Kroher-Strobel Rechts- und Patentanwälte Bavariaring 20 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/42] | Strobel, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Ing., et al Kroher . Strobel Rechts- und Patentanwälte Bavariaring 20 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03701105.3 | 17.01.2003 | [2004/42] | WO2003JP00340 | Priority number, date | JP20020010086 | 18.01.2002 Original published format: JP 2002010086 | [2004/42] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03062680 | Date: | 31.07.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1467129 | Date: | 13.10.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.07.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1467129 | Date: | 26.05.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 31.07.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.02.2008 | Classification | IPC: | F16J9/26, F02F5/00, C23C4/04 | [2010/01] | CPC: |
F16J9/26 (EP,KR,US);
C23C4/02 (EP,US);
C23C4/04 (EP,US);
C23C4/08 (EP,US);
F02F5/00 (KR);
Y10S384/907 (EP,US);
Y10S384/913 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12014 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12139 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12486 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12924 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2004/42] | F16J9/26, F02F5/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, DK, FR, GB, IT, SE [2010/21] |
Former [2004/42] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KOLBENRING MIT SPRITZBESCHICHTUNG | [2004/42] | English: | SPRAYING PISTON RING | [2004/42] | French: | SEGMENT DE PISTON DE PULVERISATION | [2004/42] | Entry into regional phase | 23.07.2004 | Translation filed | 15.07.2004 | National basic fee paid | 15.07.2004 | Search fee paid | 15.07.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.07.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.06.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 15.07.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.07.2004 | Examination requested [2004/42] | 16.09.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.01.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.10.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.12.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.03.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 12.03.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DK | 26.05.2010 | IT | 26.05.2010 | SE | 26.05.2010 | GB | 17.01.2011 | FR | 31.01.2011 | [2012/01] |
Former [2011/47] | DK | 26.05.2010 | |
IT | 26.05.2010 | ||
SE | 26.05.2010 | ||
FR | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/15] | DK | 26.05.2010 | |
IT | 26.05.2010 | ||
SE | 26.05.2010 | ||
Former [2011/07] | DK | 26.05.2010 | |
SE | 26.05.2010 | ||
Former [2010/49] | SE | 26.05.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | JPS48365B [ ]; | [A]US5041339 (MORI SANAE [JP], et al); | [A]EP0900326 (MAN B & W DIESEL GMBH [DK]); | [A]JPH11241153 (NIPPON PISTON RING CO LTD); | [Y]JPH11247712 (AISIN SEIKI); | [A]WO0132948 (MAN B & W DIESEL AS [DK], et al); | [Y]US2002006242 (EBERSPACHER CHRISTOF [DE], et al); | International search | [Y]WO9825017 (MAN B & W DIESEL GMBH [DK], et al); | [Y]JPH11247712 (AISIN SEIKI) | Examination | US1654509 | GB2137660 | FR2765244 |