EP1464126 - Power control during state transition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2004/41] | POWER CONTROL DURING STATE TRANSITION | ||
[2008/50] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.01.2010 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Qualcomm, Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [2004/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHEN, Tao 5415 Harvest Run Drive San Diego, CA 92130 / US | 02 /
TIEDEMANN, Edward, G., Jr. 656 Barretts Mill Road Concord, MA 01742 / US | [2004/41] | Representative(s) | Walsh, Michael Joseph, et al Tomkins & Co. 5, Dartmouth Road Dublin 6 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/41] | Walsh, Michael Joseph, et al TOMKINS & CO. 5, Dartmouth Road Dublin 6 / IE | Application number, filing date | 03701979.1 | 03.01.2003 | [2004/41] | WO2003US00135 | Priority number, date | US20020347592P | 09.01.2002 Original published format: US 347592 P | US20020126753 | 19.04.2002 Original published format: US 126753 | [2004/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03061154 | Date: | 24.07.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1464126 | Date: | 06.10.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.07.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1464126 | Date: | 25.03.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.07.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/005 | [2004/41] | CPC: |
H04W52/50 (EP,KR,US);
H04W52/18 (KR);
H04W52/58 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/41] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Sendeleistungsregelung während eines Zustandübergangs | [2008/50] | English: | Power control during state transition | [2008/50] | French: | Contrôle de puissance lors de la transition d'un etat | [2008/50] |
Former [2004/41] | SENDELEISTUNGSREGELUNG WÄHREND ZUSTANDÜBERGANGS | ||
Former [2004/41] | POWER CONTROL DURING STATE TRANSITION | ||
Former [2004/41] | CONTROLE DE PUISSANCE LORS DE LA TRANSITION D'UN ETAT | Entry into regional phase | 29.07.2004 | National basic fee paid | 29.07.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.07.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.08.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 29.07.2004 | Examination requested [2004/41] | 25.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.04.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.11.2008 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 18.11.2008 | 04.11.2008 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 14.11.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.11.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 18.11.2008 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 11.02.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 11.02.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP09154664.8 / EP2066042 | Opposition(s) | 29.12.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 25.03.2009 | BE | 25.03.2009 | CY | 25.03.2009 | CZ | 25.03.2009 | DK | 25.03.2009 | EE | 25.03.2009 | FI | 25.03.2009 | IT | 25.03.2009 | NL | 25.03.2009 | SI | 25.03.2009 | SK | 25.03.2009 | TR | 25.03.2009 | BG | 25.06.2009 | SE | 25.06.2009 | GR | 26.06.2009 | ES | 06.07.2009 | PT | 01.09.2009 | HU | 26.09.2009 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/42] | AT | 25.03.2009 | |
BE | 25.03.2009 | ||
CY | 25.03.2009 | ||
CZ | 25.03.2009 | ||
DK | 25.03.2009 | ||
EE | 25.03.2009 | ||
FI | 25.03.2009 | ||
IT | 25.03.2009 | ||
NL | 25.03.2009 | ||
SI | 25.03.2009 | ||
SK | 25.03.2009 | ||
BG | 25.06.2009 | ||
SE | 25.06.2009 | ||
GR | 26.06.2009 | ||
ES | 06.07.2009 | ||
PT | 01.09.2009 | ||
HU | 26.09.2009 | ||
Former [2012/37] | AT | 25.03.2009 | |
BE | 25.03.2009 | ||
CY | 25.03.2009 | ||
CZ | 25.03.2009 | ||
DK | 25.03.2009 | ||
EE | 25.03.2009 | ||
FI | 25.03.2009 | ||
IT | 25.03.2009 | ||
NL | 25.03.2009 | ||
SI | 25.03.2009 | ||
SK | 25.03.2009 | ||
BG | 25.06.2009 | ||
SE | 25.06.2009 | ||
GR | 26.06.2009 | ||
ES | 06.07.2009 | ||
PT | 01.09.2009 | ||
Former [2011/14] | AT | 25.03.2009 | |
BE | 25.03.2009 | ||
CZ | 25.03.2009 | ||
DK | 25.03.2009 | ||
EE | 25.03.2009 | ||
FI | 25.03.2009 | ||
IT | 25.03.2009 | ||
NL | 25.03.2009 | ||
SI | 25.03.2009 | ||
SK | 25.03.2009 | ||
BG | 25.06.2009 | ||
SE | 25.06.2009 | ||
GR | 26.06.2009 | ||
ES | 06.07.2009 | ||
PT | 01.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/48] | AT | 25.03.2009 | |
BE | 25.03.2009 | ||
CZ | 25.03.2009 | ||
DK | 25.03.2009 | ||
EE | 25.03.2009 | ||
FI | 25.03.2009 | ||
NL | 25.03.2009 | ||
SI | 25.03.2009 | ||
SK | 25.03.2009 | ||
BG | 25.06.2009 | ||
SE | 25.06.2009 | ||
GR | 26.06.2009 | ||
ES | 06.07.2009 | ||
PT | 01.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/08] | AT | 25.03.2009 | |
BE | 25.03.2009 | ||
CZ | 25.03.2009 | ||
DK | 25.03.2009 | ||
EE | 25.03.2009 | ||
FI | 25.03.2009 | ||
NL | 25.03.2009 | ||
SI | 25.03.2009 | ||
SK | 25.03.2009 | ||
BG | 25.06.2009 | ||
SE | 25.06.2009 | ||
ES | 06.07.2009 | ||
PT | 01.09.2009 | ||
Former [2009/50] | AT | 25.03.2009 | |
BE | 25.03.2009 | ||
CZ | 25.03.2009 | ||
EE | 25.03.2009 | ||
FI | 25.03.2009 | ||
NL | 25.03.2009 | ||
SI | 25.03.2009 | ||
SK | 25.03.2009 | ||
SE | 25.06.2009 | ||
ES | 06.07.2009 | ||
PT | 01.09.2009 | ||
Former [2009/49] | AT | 25.03.2009 | |
BE | 25.03.2009 | ||
CZ | 25.03.2009 | ||
EE | 25.03.2009 | ||
FI | 25.03.2009 | ||
SI | 25.03.2009 | ||
SE | 25.06.2009 | ||
ES | 06.07.2009 | ||
PT | 01.09.2009 | ||
Former [2009/46] | AT | 25.03.2009 | |
BE | 25.03.2009 | ||
FI | 25.03.2009 | ||
SI | 25.03.2009 | ||
SE | 25.06.2009 | ||
ES | 06.07.2009 | ||
Former [2009/43] | AT | 25.03.2009 | |
BE | 25.03.2009 | ||
FI | 25.03.2009 | ||
SI | 25.03.2009 | ||
SE | 25.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/39] | AT | 25.03.2009 | |
FI | 25.03.2009 | ||
SI | 25.03.2009 | ||
SE | 25.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/36] | FI | 25.03.2009 | |
SI | 25.03.2009 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9938278 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1,11,21,29,39 * abstract * * page 3, line 4 - page 4, line 21 *; | [A]WO0007377 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1,11,21,29,39 * page 3, line 13 - line 17 * * page 10, line 2 - page 11, line 3 ** page 66, line 3 - line 11 *; | [XA]WO0074289 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1,11,13,14 * page 10, line 25 - line 30 * * page 11, line 29 - line 38 * * page 24, line 5 - line 33 * * page 26, line 12 - line 27 * [A] 2,3,7,10,12,17,19-21,29,39 | Examination | WO9956405 | - "Description of the DV Control Hold Mode", 3GPP2, (20020107), pages 1 - 10 | - MOTOROLA, "BS initiated faster transition from standby to active mode", 3GPP2, (20011203), pages 1 - 4 |