EP1467654 - A MULTI-MODALITY APPARATUS FOR DYNAMIC ANATOMICAL, PHYSIOLOGICAL AND MOLECULAR IMAGING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.10.2009 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.10.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.11.2009 [2009/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Multi-Dimensional Imaging, Inc. Suite 100, 400 Newport Center Drive Newport Beach CA 92660 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/43] | For all designated states Multi-Dimensional Imaging, Inc. Suite 100, 400 Newport Center Drive Newport Beach, CA 92660 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EISENBERG, Harvey, C. 2014 Yacht Resolute Newport beach, CA 92660 / US | 02 /
MCCROSKEY, William, K. 5475 Parkside Trail Solon, OH 44139 / US | 03 /
ROHLER, David, P. 3722 Meadowbrook Boulevard University Heights, OH 44118 / US | 04 /
VICKERS, David, S. 9020 Bramley Drive Independence, OH 44131 / US | 05 /
BRADSHAW, Frank, T. 3299 Aberdeen Road Shaker Heights, OH 44122 / US | 06 /
OUIMETTE, Donald, R. 178 Roxbury Road Plantsville, CT 06479 / US | 07 /
DEUCHER, Joseph, S. 1112 Ford Road Lyndhurst, OH 44124 / US | [2004/43] | Representative(s) | Marx, Lothar Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx Patentanwälte Postfach 86 02 45 81629 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/43] | Marx, Lothar, Dr. Patentanwälte Schwabe, Sandmair, Marx Stuntzstrasse 16 81677 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03702043.5 | 07.01.2003 | [2004/43] | WO2003US00527 | Priority number, date | US20020039128 | 07.01.2002 Original published format: US 39128 | [2004/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03058222 | Date: | 17.07.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/29] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1467654 | Date: | 20.10.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.07.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61B6/03 | [2004/43] | CPC: |
A61B6/541 (EP,US);
A61B6/027 (EP,US);
A61B6/032 (EP,US);
A61B6/037 (EP,US);
A61B6/4014 (EP,US);
A61B6/4021 (EP,US);
A61B6/4035 (EP,US);
A61B6/4291 (EP,US);
A61B6/466 (EP,US);
A61B6/482 (EP,US);
A61B6/5235 (EP,US);
G01T1/1611 (EP,US);
G01T1/1644 (EP,US);
G01T1/2985 (EP,US);
A61B5/352 (EP,US);
A61B6/4085 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/43] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MULITMODALES GERÄT ZUR DYNAMISCH ANATOMISCHEN, PHYSIOLOGISCHEN UND MOLEKULAREN BILDGEBUNG | [2004/43] | English: | A MULTI-MODALITY APPARATUS FOR DYNAMIC ANATOMICAL, PHYSIOLOGICAL AND MOLECULAR IMAGING | [2004/43] | French: | DISPOSITIF MULTIMODAL D'IMAGERIE ANATOMIQUE, PHYSIOLOGIQUE ET MOLECULAIRE | [2004/43] | Entry into regional phase | 05.08.2004 | National basic fee paid | 05.08.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.08.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.08.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 05.08.2004 | Examination requested [2004/51] | 03.08.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.02.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.08.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.05.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/46] | 17.06.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2008 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   14.02.2008 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO0075691 (ELGEMS LTD [IL], et al) [X] 1 * page 1, lines 28-31 * * page 12, line 9 - page 13, line 20 * * page 14, lines 21-29 * * page 17, line 13 - page 18, line 19 * * page 21, lines 4-7 * * figures 1A-1D *; | [X]CA2252993 (UNIV SHERBROOKE [CA]) [X] 1 * page 1, columns 8-13 * * page 8, line 14 - page 11, line 2 * * page 16, lines 18-27 * * figure 2 *; | [A]US5376795 (HASEGAWA BRUCE H [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 1, lines 17-25 * * column 6, lines 23-37 * * column 6, line 67 - column 7, line 37 * * column 10, lines 19-48 * * figures 1A-1D,2 *; | [A]US5391877 (MARKS MICHAEL A [US]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 8 - column 4, line 34 * * figure 1 *; | [A]US5966422 (DAFNI EHUD [IL], et al) [A] 1 * column 5, lines 6-54 * * figures 1A,1D * | Examination | US4709382 | US5430783 |