EP1466133 - SUBMERGED EVAPORATOR WITH INTEGRATED HEAT EXCHANGER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.11.2007 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.11.2011 [2011/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Johnson Controls Denmark ApS Christian X's Vej 201 8270 Højbjerg / DK | [2007/21] |
Former [2004/42] | For all designated states York Refrigeration ApS Christian X's Vej 201 8270 Hojbjerg / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KNOLL, Istvan Kalkaerparken 121 DK-8270 Hojbjerg / DK | [2004/42] | Representative(s) | Gregersen, Niels Henrik, et al Patrade A/S Ceresbyen 75 8000 Aarhus C / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2009/29] | Gregersen, Niels Henrik, et al Patrade A/S Fredens Torv 3A 8000 Aarhus C / DK | ||
Former [2005/11] | Gregersen, Niels Henrik, et al Patrade A/S Fredens Torv 3A 8000 Aarhus C / DK | Application number, filing date | 03702359.5 | 17.01.2003 | [2004/42] | WO2003DK00030 | Priority number, date | DK20020000075 | 17.01.2002 Original published format: DK 200200075 | [2004/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03060411 | Date: | 24.07.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1466133 | Date: | 13.10.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.07.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1466133 | Date: | 03.01.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.07.2003 | Classification | IPC: | F28D9/00, F25B39/02 | [2004/42] | CPC: |
F28D21/0017 (EP,US);
F25B39/022 (EP,US);
F28D9/0043 (EP,US);
F28F9/005 (EP,US);
F28D2021/0071 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/46] |
Former [2004/42] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GETAUCHTER VERDAMPFER MIT INTEGRIERTEM WÄRMEAUSTAUSCHER | [2004/42] | English: | SUBMERGED EVAPORATOR WITH INTEGRATED HEAT EXCHANGER | [2004/42] | French: | EVAPORATEUR IMMERGE A ECHANGEUR THERMIQUE INTEGRE | [2004/42] | Entry into regional phase | 19.07.2004 | National basic fee paid | 19.07.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.07.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.08.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 19.07.2004 | Examination requested [2004/42] | 16.09.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.03.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.07.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.07.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.11.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 16.11.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP04020111.3 / EP1479985 | Opposition(s) | 05.10.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 03.01.2007 | CH | 03.01.2007 | CY | 03.01.2007 | CZ | 03.01.2007 | EE | 03.01.2007 | LI | 03.01.2007 | PT | 03.01.2007 | SI | 03.01.2007 | TR | 03.01.2007 | LU | 17.01.2007 | MC | 31.01.2007 | BG | 04.04.2007 | HU | 04.07.2007 | [2011/46] |
Former [2009/43] | BE | 03.01.2007 | |
CH | 03.01.2007 | ||
CY | 03.01.2007 | ||
CZ | 03.01.2007 | ||
EE | 03.01.2007 | ||
LI | 03.01.2007 | ||
SI | 03.01.2007 | ||
TR | 03.01.2007 | ||
LU | 17.01.2007 | ||
MC | 31.01.2007 | ||
BG | 04.04.2007 | ||
HU | 04.07.2007 | ||
Former [2009/39] | BE | 03.01.2007 | |
CH | 03.01.2007 | ||
CY | 03.01.2007 | ||
CZ | 03.01.2007 | ||
EE | 03.01.2007 | ||
LI | 03.01.2007 | ||
SI | 03.01.2007 | ||
LU | 17.01.2007 | ||
MC | 31.01.2007 | ||
BG | 04.04.2007 | ||
Former [2009/34] | BE | 03.01.2007 | |
CH | 03.01.2007 | ||
CY | 03.01.2007 | ||
CZ | 03.01.2007 | ||
EE | 03.01.2007 | ||
LI | 03.01.2007 | ||
SI | 03.01.2007 | ||
MC | 31.01.2007 | ||
BG | 04.04.2007 | ||
Former [2009/11] | BE | 03.01.2007 | |
CH | 03.01.2007 | ||
CZ | 03.01.2007 | ||
EE | 03.01.2007 | ||
LI | 03.01.2007 | ||
SI | 03.01.2007 | ||
MC | 31.01.2007 | ||
BG | 04.04.2007 | ||
Former [2008/01] | BE | 03.01.2007 | |
CH | 03.01.2007 | ||
CZ | 03.01.2007 | ||
LI | 03.01.2007 | ||
SI | 03.01.2007 | ||
MC | 31.01.2007 | ||
BG | 04.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/49] | CH | 03.01.2007 | |
LI | 03.01.2007 | ||
SI | 03.01.2007 | ||
MC | 31.01.2007 | ||
BG | 04.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/47] | CH | 03.01.2007 | |
LI | 03.01.2007 | ||
SI | 03.01.2007 | ||
BG | 04.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/40] | CH | 03.01.2007 | |
LI | 03.01.2007 | ||
BG | 04.04.2007 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB901077 (AQUA CHEM INC) [A] 6 * detail (21) *; | [A]US4073340 (PARKER KENNETH O) [A] 9 * the whole document *; | [A]US4437322 (ERTINGER RICHARD E [US]) [A] 5 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0758073 (BALCKE DUERR GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9745689 (NEK UMWELTTECHNIK AG [CH], et al) [A] 3,4,7,10* the whole document *; | [A]US6158238 (LAMPINEN MARKKU [FI], et al) [A] 8 * the whole document * |