Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2005090399 | Global Dossier | 28.04.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP0300555 | 21.01.2003 | CH1192002 | 22.01.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2005516973 | Global Dossier | 09.06.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | EP0300555 | 21.01.2003 | CH1192002 | 22.01.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1468000 | Global Dossier | 20.10.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP0300555 | 21.01.2003 | CH1192002 | 22.01.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR0306957 | 14.12.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | EP0300555 | 21.01.2003 | CH1192002 | 22.01.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2470674 | 31.07.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP0300555 | 21.01.2003 | CH1192002 | 22.01.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HUP0402592 | 28.04.2005 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP0300555 | 21.01.2003 | CH1192002 | 22.01.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MXPA04006991 | 10.11.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | EP0300555 | 21.01.2003 | CH1192002 | 22.01.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO03062244 | Global Dossier | 31.07.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CH1192002 | 22.01.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1615310 | 11.05.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | CH1192002 | 22.01.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2004125878 | 27.05.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | CH1192002 | 22.01.2002 |