EP1468000 - PHENYL SUBSTITUTED HETEROCYCLIC COMPOUNDS USEFUL AS HERBICIDES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 15.10.2004 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.10.2004 | Withdrawal of application | published on 01.12.2004 [2004/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Syngenta Participations AG Schwarzwaldallee 215 4058 Basel / CH | [2004/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FRIEDMANN, Adrian, Alberto Syngenta Ltd. Jealotts Hill Int. Research Center Bracknell, Berkshire RG42 6EY / GB | 02 /
STOLLER, André Syngenta Crop Protection AG Schwarzwaldallee 215 CH-4058 Basel / CH | 03 /
WENDEBORN, Sebastian Syngenta Crop Protection AG Schwarzwaldallee 215 CH-4058 Basel / CH | [2004/43] | Representative(s) | Bastian, Werner Maria Syngenta Participations AG Intellectual Property P.O. Box 4002 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2004/43] | Bastian, Werner Maria Syngenta Participations AG, Intellectual Property, P.O. Box 4002 Basel / CH | Application number, filing date | 03702483.3 | 21.01.2003 | [2004/43] | WO2003EP00555 | Priority number, date | CH20020000119 | 22.01.2002 Original published format: CH 1192002 | [2004/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03062244 | Date: | 31.07.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1468000 | Date: | 20.10.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.07.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.07.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C07D498/04 | [2004/43] | CPC data not yet available | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/43] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PHENYLSUBSTITUIERTE HETEROCYCLISCHE VERBINDUNGEN VERWENDBAR ALS HERBIZIDE | [2004/43] | English: | PHENYL SUBSTITUTED HETEROCYCLIC COMPOUNDS USEFUL AS HERBICIDES | [2004/43] | French: | COMPOSES HETEROCYCLIQUES A SUBSTITUTION PHENYLE UTILISES COMME HERBICIDES | [2004/43] | Entry into regional phase | 24.06.2004 | National basic fee paid | 24.06.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.06.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.06.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 24.06.2004 | Examination requested [2004/43] | 07.10.2004 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2004/49] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0008540 (UNION CARBIDE CORP [US]) [X] 1,3-10 * page 1, line 1 - page 2, line 8; example 5; table 1 *; | [X]US4351666 (KOERWER JOHN F) [X] 1,3-10 * column 1, line 35 - column 2, line 10; examples 27,73-76 *; | [X]EP0442077 (BAYER AG [DE]) [X] 1,3-10 * page 3, line 1 - page 4, line 7; examples 68,69 *; | [X]WO9620196 (BAYER AG [DE], et al) [X] 1,3-10 * Compound Ib-17; page 1, line 1 - page 3, line 5 *; | [X]WO0078881 (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al) [X] 5* page 16, paragraph 3 - page 17, paragraph 2 *; | [X]WO0117972 (SYNGENTA PARTICIPATIONS AG [CH], et al) [X] 1-10 * Compounds 1.126, 1.149, 1.173, 1.196, 21.26, 21.101, 21.113; page 1, line 1 - page 7, line 21 *; | [X]WO0117973 (SYNGENTA PARTICIPATIONS AG [CH], et al) [X] 1-10 * Compound Ib-65; page 1 - page 5 * |