EP1470615 - DUAL-POLARIZED RADIATING ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.05.2006 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kathrein-Werke KG Anton-Kathrein-Strasse 1-3 83022 Rosenheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/44] | For all designated states Kathrein-Werke KG Anton-Kathrein-Strasse 1-3 83022 Rosenheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GÖTTL, Maximilian Adolf-Veit Weg 2 83112 Frasdorf / DE | [2004/44] | Representative(s) | Flach, Dieter Rolf Paul, et al Andrae l Westendorp Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Adlzreiterstrasse 11 83022 Rosenheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/40] | Flach, Dieter Rolf Paul, et al Andrae Flach Haug Adlzreiterstrasse 11 83022 Rosenheim / DE | ||
Former [2004/44] | Flach, Dieter Dipl.-Ing, et al Andrae Flach Haug Adlzreiterstrasse 11 83022 Rosenheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 03702516.0 | 23.01.2003 | [2004/44] | WO2003EP00703 | Priority number, date | DE2002103873 | 31.01.2002 Original published format: DE 10203873 | [2004/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03065505 | Date: | 07.08.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1470615 | Date: | 27.10.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.08.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1470615 | Date: | 06.07.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.08.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q13/18, H01Q21/24 | [2004/44] | CPC: |
H01Q19/10 (EP,KR,US);
H01Q21/26 (KR);
H01Q13/10 (EP,US);
H01Q13/18 (EP,KR,US);
H01Q15/14 (KR);
H01Q21/20 (EP,US);
H01Q21/24 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/44] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DUALPOLARISIERTE STRAHLERANORDNUNG | [2004/44] | English: | DUAL-POLARIZED RADIATING ASSEMBLY | [2004/44] | French: | ENSEMBLE ANTENNE RAYONNANTE A DOUBLE POLARISATION | [2004/44] | Entry into regional phase | 18.09.2003 | National basic fee paid | 18.09.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.09.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.09.2003 | Examination requested [2004/44] | 24.09.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.12.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.01.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.03.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 24.03.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.04.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 06.07.2005 | CZ | 06.07.2005 | EE | 06.07.2005 | FI | 06.07.2005 | IT | 06.07.2005 | NL | 06.07.2005 | SI | 06.07.2005 | SK | 06.07.2005 | TR | 06.07.2005 | BG | 06.10.2005 | DK | 06.10.2005 | GR | 06.10.2005 | PT | 12.12.2005 | HU | 07.01.2006 | AT | 23.01.2006 | BE | 31.01.2006 | LU | 31.01.2006 | MC | 31.01.2006 | [2009/02] |
Former [2007/40] | CZ | 06.07.2005 | |
EE | 06.07.2005 | ||
FI | 06.07.2005 | ||
IT | 06.07.2005 | ||
NL | 06.07.2005 | ||
SI | 06.07.2005 | ||
SK | 06.07.2005 | ||
TR | 06.07.2005 | ||
BG | 06.10.2005 | ||
DK | 06.10.2005 | ||
GR | 06.10.2005 | ||
PT | 12.12.2005 | ||
HU | 07.01.2006 | ||
AT | 23.01.2006 | ||
BE | 31.01.2006 | ||
LU | 31.01.2006 | ||
MC | 31.01.2006 | ||
Former [2007/28] | CZ | 06.07.2005 | |
EE | 06.07.2005 | ||
FI | 06.07.2005 | ||
NL | 06.07.2005 | ||
SI | 06.07.2005 | ||
SK | 06.07.2005 | ||
TR | 06.07.2005 | ||
BG | 06.10.2005 | ||
DK | 06.10.2005 | ||
GR | 06.10.2005 | ||
PT | 12.12.2005 | ||
HU | 07.01.2006 | ||
AT | 23.01.2006 | ||
BE | 31.01.2006 | ||
LU | 31.01.2006 | ||
MC | 31.01.2006 | ||
Former [2007/14] | CZ | 06.07.2005 | |
EE | 06.07.2005 | ||
FI | 06.07.2005 | ||
NL | 06.07.2005 | ||
SI | 06.07.2005 | ||
SK | 06.07.2005 | ||
TR | 06.07.2005 | ||
BG | 06.10.2005 | ||
DK | 06.10.2005 | ||
GR | 06.10.2005 | ||
PT | 12.12.2005 | ||
HU | 07.01.2006 | ||
BE | 31.01.2006 | ||
LU | 31.01.2006 | ||
MC | 31.01.2006 | ||
Former [2007/13] | CZ | 06.07.2005 | |
EE | 06.07.2005 | ||
FI | 06.07.2005 | ||
NL | 06.07.2005 | ||
SI | 06.07.2005 | ||
SK | 06.07.2005 | ||
TR | 06.07.2005 | ||
BG | 06.10.2005 | ||
DK | 06.10.2005 | ||
GR | 06.10.2005 | ||
PT | 12.12.2005 | ||
BE | 31.01.2006 | ||
LU | 31.01.2006 | ||
MC | 31.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/52] | CZ | 06.07.2005 | |
FI | 06.07.2005 | ||
NL | 06.07.2005 | ||
SI | 06.07.2005 | ||
SK | 06.07.2005 | ||
TR | 06.07.2005 | ||
BG | 06.10.2005 | ||
DK | 06.10.2005 | ||
GR | 06.10.2005 | ||
PT | 12.12.2005 | ||
MC | 31.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/44] | CZ | 06.07.2005 | |
FI | 06.07.2005 | ||
NL | 06.07.2005 | ||
SI | 06.07.2005 | ||
SK | 06.07.2005 | ||
BG | 06.10.2005 | ||
DK | 06.10.2005 | ||
GR | 06.10.2005 | ||
PT | 12.12.2005 | ||
MC | 31.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/29] | CZ | 06.07.2005 | |
FI | 06.07.2005 | ||
NL | 06.07.2005 | ||
SI | 06.07.2005 | ||
SK | 06.07.2005 | ||
BG | 06.10.2005 | ||
DK | 06.10.2005 | ||
GR | 06.10.2005 | ||
PT | 12.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/26] | CZ | 06.07.2005 | |
FI | 06.07.2005 | ||
NL | 06.07.2005 | ||
SI | 06.07.2005 | ||
BG | 06.10.2005 | ||
DK | 06.10.2005 | ||
GR | 06.10.2005 | ||
PT | 12.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/22] | FI | 06.07.2005 | |
NL | 06.07.2005 | ||
SI | 06.07.2005 | ||
BG | 06.10.2005 | ||
GR | 06.10.2005 | ||
PT | 12.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | FI | 06.07.2005 | |
SI | 06.07.2005 | ||
BG | 06.10.2005 | ||
GR | 06.10.2005 | ||
PT | 12.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | FI | 06.07.2005 | |
SI | 06.07.2005 | ||
BG | 06.10.2005 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4015264 (KOERNER JOHN A) [A] 1-30 * column 3, line 2 - line 15 *; | [A]US4218685 (ELLIS HAYNES JR [US]) [A] 1-30 * abstract *; | [A]US6333720 (GOETTL MAXIMILIAN [DE], et al) [A] 1-30 * abstract *; | [A] - SANGSTER A J ET AL, "Dual-polarised stripline fed slot antenna incorporating signal cancellation", IEE PROCEEDINGS: MICROWAVES, ANTENNAS AND PROPAGATION, IEE, STEVENAGE, HERTS, GB, (20011203), vol. 148, no. 6, ISSN 1350-2417, pages 357 - 362, XP006017859 [A] 1-30 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1049/ip-map:20010768 | [A] - KUGA N ET AL, "A notch-wire composite antenna for polarization diversity reception", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON ANTENNAS AND PROPAGATION, JUNE 1998, IEEE, USA, vol. 46, no. 6, ISSN 0018-926X, pages 902 - 906, XP002241219 [A] 1-30 * figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/8.686779 |