EP1479481 - PORTABLE WORK BENCH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.01.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tejero Lopez, José Antonio Plaza Padre Garcia Jimenez, 2 18291 Casanueva / ES | [2004/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2004/48] | Representative(s) | Isern-Jara, Nuria, et al J. Isern Patentes y Marcas Avda. Diagonal 463 Bis 2[deg] 08036 Barcelona / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2010/10] | Isern-Jara, Nuria, et al J. Isern Patentes y Marcas Avda. Diagonal 463 Bis 2[deg] 08036 Barcelona / ES | ||
Former [2006/41] | von den Steinen, Axel, et al Böck, Tappe, v.d. Steinen, Wiegand Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Georg-Schlosser-Strasse 6 35390 Giessen / DE | ||
Former [2004/48] | von den Steinen, Axel Böck.Tappe.Kirschner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Ludwigsplatz 9 35390 Giessen / DE | Application number, filing date | 03702657.2 | 23.01.2003 | [2004/48] | WO2003ES00032 | Priority number, date | ES20020000239 | 01.02.2002 Original published format: ES 200200239 | [2004/48] | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03064112 | Date: | 07.08.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1479481 | Date: | 24.11.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.08.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1479481 | Date: | 24.03.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | ES | 07.08.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B25B1/22, B25H1/02 | [2004/48] | CPC: |
B25H1/10 (EP);
B25B5/08 (EP);
B25B5/085 (EP);
B25H1/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/48] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TRAGBARE WERKBANK | [2004/48] | English: | PORTABLE WORK BENCH | [2004/48] | French: | BANC DE TRAVAIL PORTABLE | [2004/48] | Entry into regional phase | 06.08.2004 | Translation filed | 06.08.2004 | National basic fee paid | 06.08.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.08.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.08.2004 | Examination requested [2004/48] | 23.03.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.06.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.11.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 03.02.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 03.02.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.12.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/09] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 03.02.2010 | Request for further processing filed | 03.02.2010 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 15.02.2010 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 03.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2010 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   09.02.2010 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 24.03.2010 | EE | 24.03.2010 | FI | 24.03.2010 | HU | 24.03.2010 | NL | 24.03.2010 | SE | 24.03.2010 | SI | 24.03.2010 | SK | 24.03.2010 | TR | 24.03.2010 | BG | 24.06.2010 | GR | 25.06.2010 | ES | 05.07.2010 | PT | 26.07.2010 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | CY | 24.03.2010 | |
EE | 24.03.2010 | ||
FI | 24.03.2010 | ||
NL | 24.03.2010 | ||
SE | 24.03.2010 | ||
SI | 24.03.2010 | ||
SK | 24.03.2010 | ||
TR | 24.03.2010 | ||
BG | 24.06.2010 | ||
GR | 25.06.2010 | ||
ES | 05.07.2010 | ||
PT | 26.07.2010 | ||
Former [2013/26] | CY | 24.03.2010 | |
EE | 24.03.2010 | ||
FI | 24.03.2010 | ||
NL | 24.03.2010 | ||
SE | 24.03.2010 | ||
SI | 24.03.2010 | ||
SK | 24.03.2010 | ||
BG | 24.06.2010 | ||
GR | 25.06.2010 | ||
ES | 05.07.2010 | ||
PT | 26.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/08] | EE | 24.03.2010 | |
FI | 24.03.2010 | ||
NL | 24.03.2010 | ||
SE | 24.03.2010 | ||
SI | 24.03.2010 | ||
SK | 24.03.2010 | ||
BG | 24.06.2010 | ||
GR | 25.06.2010 | ||
ES | 05.07.2010 | ||
PT | 26.07.2010 | ||
Former [2010/51] | EE | 24.03.2010 | |
FI | 24.03.2010 | ||
NL | 24.03.2010 | ||
SE | 24.03.2010 | ||
SI | 24.03.2010 | ||
SK | 24.03.2010 | ||
BG | 24.06.2010 | ||
GR | 25.06.2010 | ||
ES | 05.07.2010 | ||
Former [2010/49] | EE | 24.03.2010 | |
FI | 24.03.2010 | ||
NL | 24.03.2010 | ||
SE | 24.03.2010 | ||
SI | 24.03.2010 | ||
SK | 24.03.2010 | ||
GR | 25.06.2010 | ||
ES | 05.07.2010 | ||
Former [2010/48] | EE | 24.03.2010 | |
FI | 24.03.2010 | ||
NL | 24.03.2010 | ||
SE | 24.03.2010 | ||
SI | 24.03.2010 | ||
GR | 25.06.2010 | ||
ES | 05.07.2010 | ||
Former [2010/46] | FI | 24.03.2010 | |
NL | 24.03.2010 | ||
SI | 24.03.2010 | ||
GR | 25.06.2010 | ||
ES | 05.07.2010 | ||
Former [2010/45] | FI | 24.03.2010 | |
NL | 24.03.2010 | ||
SI | 24.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/38] | FI | 24.03.2010 | |
SI | 24.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/36] | SI | 24.03.2010 | Cited in | International search | [X]US1818501 (ODIN EUGENE A); | [X]GB842094 (CHARLES KELLER); | [Y]US2997900 (PUGSLEY LAWRENCE E); | [A]US3815892 (TULK G); | [Y]US4509731 (SCHAAL GUENTER [DE], et al); | [Y]US4619446 (YANG TAI-HER [TW]); | [A]WO9818603 (LANG ARMAND [LU]) |