EP1482802 - GLYPHOSATE FORMULATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.10.2006 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Syngenta Limited European Regional Centre Priestley Road Surrey Research Park Guildford, Surrey GU2 7YH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/48] | For all designated states Syngenta Limited European Regional Centre Priestley Road Surrey Research Park Guildford Surrey GU2 7YH / GB | ||
Former [2004/50] | For all designated states Syngenta Limited European Regional Centre Priestley Road Surrey Research Park Guildford Surrey GU2 7YH / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bean, Michael John Syngenta Crop Protection Inc., 410 Swing Road Greensboro, NC 27409 / US | 02 /
Formstone, Carl Andrew, Syngenta Ltd. Jealott's Hill International Research Centre Bracknell, Berkshire RG42 6EY / GB | 03 /
Hopkins, Derek John Syngenta Crop Prot. Muenchwilen AG, Breitenloh 5 CH-4333 Muenchwilen / CH | [2004/50] | Representative(s) | Ward, Steven Paul, et al Syngenta Limited Intellectual Property Department Jealott's Hill International Research Centre P.O. Box 3538 Bracknell, Berkshire RG42 6YA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/50] | Ward, Steven Paul, et al Syngenta Limited, Intellectual Property Department, Jealott's Hill International Research Centre, P.O. Box 3538 Bracknell RG42 6YA / GB | Application number, filing date | 03702749.7 | 12.02.2003 | [2004/50] | WO2003GB00615 | Priority number, date | GB20020004482 | 26.02.2002 Original published format: GB 0204482 | [2004/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03071873 | Date: | 04.09.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1482802 | Date: | 08.12.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.09.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1482802 | Date: | 30.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.09.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A01N57/20, A01N25/30 | [2004/50] | CPC: |
A01N57/20 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
A01N57/20, A01N2300/00 (US,EP);
A01N57/20, A01N25/30 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/50] | Extension states | AL | 27.09.2004 | LT | 27.09.2004 | LV | 27.09.2004 | MK | 27.09.2004 | RO | 27.09.2004 | Title | German: | GLYPHOSAT-FORMULIERUNG | [2004/50] | English: | GLYPHOSATE FORMULATION | [2004/50] | French: | FORMULATION DE GLYPHOSATE | [2004/50] | Entry into regional phase | 27.09.2004 | National basic fee paid | 27.09.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.09.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.08.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 27.09.2004 | Examination requested [2004/50] | 23.03.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.10.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 04.10.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.08.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 30.11.2005 | BE | 30.11.2005 | CH | 30.11.2005 | CY | 30.11.2005 | EE | 30.11.2005 | FI | 30.11.2005 | LI | 30.11.2005 | NL | 30.11.2005 | SI | 30.11.2005 | SK | 30.11.2005 | TR | 30.11.2005 | IE | 13.02.2006 | BG | 28.02.2006 | DK | 28.02.2006 | GR | 28.02.2006 | LU | 28.02.2006 | MC | 28.02.2006 | SE | 28.02.2006 | [2009/02] |
Former [2008/38] | AT | 30.11.2005 | |
BE | 30.11.2005 | ||
CH | 30.11.2005 | ||
EE | 30.11.2005 | ||
FI | 30.11.2005 | ||
LI | 30.11.2005 | ||
NL | 30.11.2005 | ||
SI | 30.11.2005 | ||
SK | 30.11.2005 | ||
TR | 30.11.2005 | ||
IE | 13.02.2006 | ||
BG | 28.02.2006 | ||
DK | 28.02.2006 | ||
GR | 28.02.2006 | ||
LU | 28.02.2006 | ||
MC | 28.02.2006 | ||
SE | 28.02.2006 | ||
Former [2008/28] | AT | 30.11.2005 | |
BE | 30.11.2005 | ||
CH | 30.11.2005 | ||
EE | 30.11.2005 | ||
FI | 30.11.2005 | ||
LI | 30.11.2005 | ||
NL | 30.11.2005 | ||
SI | 30.11.2005 | ||
SK | 30.11.2005 | ||
IE | 13.02.2006 | ||
BG | 28.02.2006 | ||
DK | 28.02.2006 | ||
GR | 28.02.2006 | ||
LU | 28.02.2006 | ||
MC | 28.02.2006 | ||
SE | 28.02.2006 | ||
Former [2007/45] | AT | 30.11.2005 | |
BE | 30.11.2005 | ||
CH | 30.11.2005 | ||
FI | 30.11.2005 | ||
LI | 30.11.2005 | ||
NL | 30.11.2005 | ||
SI | 30.11.2005 | ||
SK | 30.11.2005 | ||
IE | 13.02.2006 | ||
BG | 28.02.2006 | ||
DK | 28.02.2006 | ||
GR | 28.02.2006 | ||
LU | 28.02.2006 | ||
MC | 28.02.2006 | ||
SE | 28.02.2006 | ||
Former [2007/40] | AT | 30.11.2005 | |
BE | 30.11.2005 | ||
CH | 30.11.2005 | ||
FI | 30.11.2005 | ||
IT | 30.11.2005 | ||
LI | 30.11.2005 | ||
NL | 30.11.2005 | ||
SI | 30.11.2005 | ||
SK | 30.11.2005 | ||
IE | 13.02.2006 | ||
BG | 28.02.2006 | ||
DK | 28.02.2006 | ||
GR | 28.02.2006 | ||
LU | 28.02.2006 | ||
MC | 28.02.2006 | ||
SE | 28.02.2006 | ||
Former [2007/13] | AT | 30.11.2005 | |
BE | 30.11.2005 | ||
CH | 30.11.2005 | ||
FI | 30.11.2005 | ||
LI | 30.11.2005 | ||
NL | 30.11.2005 | ||
SI | 30.11.2005 | ||
SK | 30.11.2005 | ||
IE | 13.02.2006 | ||
BG | 28.02.2006 | ||
DK | 28.02.2006 | ||
GR | 28.02.2006 | ||
LU | 28.02.2006 | ||
MC | 28.02.2006 | ||
SE | 28.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | AT | 30.11.2005 | |
BE | 30.11.2005 | ||
CH | 30.11.2005 | ||
FI | 30.11.2005 | ||
LI | 30.11.2005 | ||
NL | 30.11.2005 | ||
SI | 30.11.2005 | ||
SK | 30.11.2005 | ||
BG | 28.02.2006 | ||
DK | 28.02.2006 | ||
GR | 28.02.2006 | ||
MC | 28.02.2006 | ||
SE | 28.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/44] | AT | 30.11.2005 | |
BE | 30.11.2005 | ||
CH | 30.11.2005 | ||
FI | 30.11.2005 | ||
LI | 30.11.2005 | ||
NL | 30.11.2005 | ||
SK | 30.11.2005 | ||
BG | 28.02.2006 | ||
DK | 28.02.2006 | ||
GR | 28.02.2006 | ||
MC | 28.02.2006 | ||
SE | 28.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/41] | AT | 30.11.2005 | |
BE | 30.11.2005 | ||
CH | 30.11.2005 | ||
FI | 30.11.2005 | ||
LI | 30.11.2005 | ||
NL | 30.11.2005 | ||
SK | 30.11.2005 | ||
BG | 28.02.2006 | ||
DK | 28.02.2006 | ||
GR | 28.02.2006 | ||
SE | 28.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/38] | AT | 30.11.2005 | |
BE | 30.11.2005 | ||
CH | 30.11.2005 | ||
FI | 30.11.2005 | ||
LI | 30.11.2005 | ||
NL | 30.11.2005 | ||
SK | 30.11.2005 | ||
DK | 28.02.2006 | ||
GR | 28.02.2006 | ||
SE | 28.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/36] | AT | 30.11.2005 | |
BE | 30.11.2005 | ||
CH | 30.11.2005 | ||
FI | 30.11.2005 | ||
LI | 30.11.2005 | ||
NL | 30.11.2005 | ||
SK | 30.11.2005 | ||
DK | 28.02.2006 | ||
SE | 28.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/35] | AT | 30.11.2005 | |
CH | 30.11.2005 | ||
FI | 30.11.2005 | ||
LI | 30.11.2005 | ||
NL | 30.11.2005 | ||
SK | 30.11.2005 | ||
DK | 28.02.2006 | ||
SE | 28.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/34] | AT | 30.11.2005 | |
CH | 30.11.2005 | ||
FI | 30.11.2005 | ||
LI | 30.11.2005 | ||
NL | 30.11.2005 | ||
DK | 28.02.2006 | ||
SE | 28.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/33] | CH | 30.11.2005 | |
FI | 30.11.2005 | ||
LI | 30.11.2005 | ||
NL | 30.11.2005 | ||
SE | 28.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/27] | FI | 30.11.2005 | |
NL | 30.11.2005 | ||
SE | 28.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/23] | FI | 30.11.2005 | |
NL | 30.11.2005 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4840659 (FRANZ JOHN E [US]) [A] 1-18 * column 8, line 31 ** column 14, line 63 - column 15, line 2 *; | [A]US6010979 (OSBORN MARTIN KEITH [GB], et al) [A] 1-18 * column 2, line 1 - column 4, line 41 * * column 4, line 42 - line 56 * * examples 1-3; claim 1 * |