EP1476438 - OXA- AND THIADIAZOLES AND THEIR USE AS METALLOPROTEINASE INHIBITORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.02.2008 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.05.2008 | Change - representative | published on 04.06.2008 [2008/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vernalis (R&D) Limited Granta Park Abington Cambridge CB1 6GB / GB | For all designated states LABORATOIRES SERONO S.A. Z.I. de l'Ouriettaz 1170 Aubonne / CH | [2007/16] |
Former [2007/01] | For all designated states Vernalis (R&D) Limited Granta Park Abington Cambridge CB1 6GB / GB | ||
For all designated states Laboratoires Serono S.A. Z.I. de l'Ouriettaz 1170 Aubonne / CH | |||
Former [2004/47] | For all designated states Vernalis (Oxford) Ltd Granta Park Abington, Cambridge CB1 6GB / GB | ||
For all designated states Laboratoires Serono S.A. Z.I. de l'Ouriettaz 1170 Aubonne / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AYSCOUGH, A.P. British Biotech Pharmaceuticals ltd Watlington Road Cowley, Oxford OX4 6LY / GB | 02 /
DAVIES, S.J., British Biotech Pharmaceuticals ltd Watlington Road Cowley, Oxford OX4 6LY / GB | 03 /
PAIN, Gilles, British Biotech Pharmaceuticals Ltd Watlington Road Cowley, Oxford OX4 6LY / GB | 04 /
GILLON, Jean-Yves 143, route des Crêts F-74160 Collonges sous Saleve / FR | [2007/16] |
Former [2004/47] | 01 /
AYSCOUGH, A.P. British Biotech Pharmaceuticals ltd Watlington Road Cowley, Oxford OX4 6LY / GB | ||
02 /
DAVIES, S.J., British Biotech Pharmaceuticals ltd Watlington Road Cowley, Oxford OX4 6LY / GB | |||
03 /
PAIN, Gilles, British Biotech Pharmaceuticals Ltd Watlington Road Cowley, Oxford OX4 6LY / GB | |||
04 /
GILLON, Jean-Yves, 143, route des Crets Collonge sous Saleve F-74160 / FR | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/23] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/47] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03702791.9 | 20.02.2003 | [2004/47] | WO2003GB00741 | Priority number, date | GB20020004159 | 22.02.2002 Original published format: GB 0204159 | [2004/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03070711 | Date: | 28.08.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1476438 | Date: | 17.11.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.08.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1476438 | Date: | 18.04.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.08.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C07D271/06, C07D285/08, C07D413/04, C07D413/06, A61K31/4245, A61K31/433, A61P29/00 | [2004/47] | CPC: |
C07D271/06 (EP,KR,US);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P1/02 (EP);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P11/08 (EP);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/02 (EP);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P19/00 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P19/08 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/02 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P31/14 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/04 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P7/00 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
C07D285/08 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/47] | Extension states | AL | 16.08.2004 | LT | 16.08.2004 | LV | 16.08.2004 | MK | 16.08.2004 | RO | 16.08.2004 | Title | German: | OXA- UND THIADIAZOLE UND IHRE VERWENDUNG ALS METALLOPROTEINASE-INHIBITOREN | [2004/47] | English: | OXA- AND THIADIAZOLES AND THEIR USE AS METALLOPROTEINASE INHIBITORS | [2004/47] | French: | OXA- ET THIADIAZOLES ET LEUR UTILISATION COMME INHIBITEURS DE LA METALLOPROTEINASE | [2004/47] | Entry into regional phase | 16.08.2004 | National basic fee paid | 16.08.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.08.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.09.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 16.08.2004 | Examination requested [2004/47] | 21.04.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.08.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.09.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.02.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 08.02.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.01.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO9523790 (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORP [US], et al) [Y] 1-38 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO9633176 (DU PONT MERCK PHARMA [US]) [Y] 1-38 * the whole document *; | [Y]US2001021718 (BAILEY SIMON [GB], et al) [Y] 1-38 * column W *; | [Y] - CHEN J J ET AL, "Design, synthesis, activity, and structure of a novel class of matrix metalloproteinase inhibitors containing a heterocyclic P2'-P3' amide bond isostere", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY LETTERS, (19960709), vol. 6, no. 13, pages 1601 - 1606, XP004175762 [Y] 1-38 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0960-894X(96)00283-1 | [A] - VU C B ET AL, "Nonpeptidic SH2 Inhibitors of the tyrosine kinase ZAP-70", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY LETTERS, (19991018), vol. 9, no. 20, pages 3009 - 3014, XP004180527 [A] 1 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0960-894X(99)00524-7 |