29.06.2012 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 01.08.2012 [2012/31] |
22.07.2011 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 24.08.2011 [2011/34] |
20.07.2011 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
20.07.2011 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
05.03.2011 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
02.03.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
18.02.2011 |
New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings |
|
10.12.2010 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
29.10.2010 |
Change - applicant |
published on 01.12.2010 [2010/48] |
16.08.2010 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
03.08.2010 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
06.04.2010 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
04.03.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
04.09.2009 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
08.05.2009 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
08.05.2009 |
First examination report |
|
06.03.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
07.03.2008 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 09.04.2008 [2008/15] |
06.03.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.03.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.03.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
04.03.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.10.2004 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 24.11.2004 [2004/48] |
08.10.2004 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 24.11.2004 [2004/48] |
29.09.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.09.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
31.08.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
31.08.2004 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
31.08.2004 |
Deletion: Fee payment for extension state |
|
31.08.2004 |
Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state |
|
28.02.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.09.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
10.09.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.09.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.09.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
26.03.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|