EP1480336 - ELASTIC SURFACE WAVE APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.06.2012 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.06.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.08.2012 [2012/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Taiyo Yuden Co., Ltd. 16-20, Ueno 6-chome Taito-ku Tokyo / JP | [2010/48] |
Former [2004/48] | For all designated states Fujitsu Media Devices Limited 3-12, Shin-Yokohama 2-chome, Kohoku-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 222-0033 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAWACHI, Osamu c/o FUJITSU MEDIA DEVICES LIMITED 3-12, Shin-Yokohama 2-chome, Kohoku-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 222-0033 / JP | 02 /
ORITO, Satoshi c/o FUJITSU MEDIA DEVICES LIMITED 3-12, Shin-Yokohama 2-chome, Kohoku-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 222-0033 / JP | 03 /
ABE, Takuya Room 104, Urban Plaza Sagamihara, 6-5-15 Sagamiha- ra, Sagamihara-shi, Kanagawa 229-0031 / JP | [2004/48] | Representative(s) | Sunderland, James Harry Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/48] | Sunderland, James Harry Haseltine Lake & Co., Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | Application number, filing date | 03703177.0 | 05.02.2003 | [2004/48] | WO2003JP01166 | Priority number, date | JP20020052460 | 27.02.2002 Original published format: JP 2002052460 | [2004/48] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03073610 | Date: | 04.09.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1480336 | Date: | 24.11.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.09.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1480336 | Date: | 24.08.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 04.09.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.03.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H03H9/145, H03H9/25, H03H9/64, H01L41/09, H01L41/18 | [2004/48] | CPC: |
H03H9/6469 (EP,US);
H03H9/145 (KR);
H03H9/0042 (EP,US);
H03H9/02803 (EP,US);
H03H9/25 (KR);
H03H9/64 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2011/34] |
Former [2004/48] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | ELASTIK-OBERFLÄCHENWELLENVORRICHTUNG | [2004/48] | English: | ELASTIC SURFACE WAVE APPARATUS | [2004/48] | French: | APPAREIL A ONDE DE SURFACE ELASTIQUE | [2004/48] | Entry into regional phase | 24.08.2004 | Translation filed | 20.09.2004 | National basic fee paid | 20.09.2004 | Search fee paid | 20.09.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.09.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.08.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 24.08.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.09.2004 | Examination requested [2004/48] | 12.05.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.09.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.04.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.08.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.02.2011 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 16.03.2011 | 16.03.2011 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 18.03.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.07.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 11.07.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.05.2009 | Opposition(s) | 25.05.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE4126335 (SIEMENS MATSUSHITA COMPONENTS [DE]); | [X]US5270606 (CHO FREDERICK Y [US], et al); | [X]JPH1032462 (TDK CORP); | [X]US5760664 (ALLEN DONALD [US]); | [A]EP1003286 (FUJITSU LTD [JP], et al); | [X]JP2001332954 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | International search | [A]JPS62199111 (TOYO COMMUNICATION EQUIP); | [X]JP2001332954 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) | Examination | US4281301 | JPH07336187 | JPH10261935 | JPH1188112 | DE19852300 | WO0025423 | EP1168613 | by applicant | DE4126335 | US5270606 | JPH1032462 | US5760664 | EP1003286 | JP2001332954 |