EP1472932 - PROCESS FOR PRODUCING GREEN TEA POLYPHENOL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.02.2009 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.02.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.04.2009 [2009/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KAO CORPORATION 14-10, Nihonbashi Kayaba-cho 1-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8210 / JP | [2008/17] |
Former [2004/45] | For all designated states Kao Corporation 14-10, Nihonbashi-Kayabacho 1-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8210 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ITAYA, Eri, KAO CORPORATION RESEARCH LAB. 1-3, BUNKA 2-CHOME, SUMIDA-KU Tokyo 131-8501 / JP | 02 /
TAKAHASHI, Hirokazu, KAO CORPORATION RESEARCH LAB 1-3, BUNKA 2-CHOME, SUMIDA-KU Tokyo 131-8501 / JP | 03 /
OHISHI, Susumu, KAO CORPORATION RESEARCH LAB. 1-3, BUNKA 2-CHOME, SUMIDA-KU Tokyo 131-8501 / JP | 04 /
KONISHI, Atsushi, KAO CORPORATION RESEARCH LAB. 1-3, BUNKA 2-CHOME, SUMIDA-KU Tokyo 131-8501 / JP | 05 /
OGURA, Yoshikazu, KAO CORPORATION RESEARCH LAB. 1-3, BUNKA 2-CHOME, SUMIDA-KU Tokyo 131-8501 / JP | 06 /
NAITOH, Kouichi, KAO CORPORATION RESEARCH LAB. 1-3, BUNKA 2-CHOME, SUMIDA-KU Tokyo 131-8501 / JP | [2004/45] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/45] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03703180.4 | 05.02.2003 | [2004/45] | WO2003JP01176 | Priority number, date | JP20020028658 | 05.02.2002 Original published format: JP 2002028658 | JP20020114355 | 17.04.2002 Original published format: JP 2002114355 | [2004/45] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03065817 | Date: | 14.08.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1472932 | Date: | 03.11.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.08.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1472932 | Date: | 23.04.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 14.08.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.02.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A23F3/42, A23F3/40, A23F3/18 | [2005/13] | CPC: |
A23F3/423 (EP,US);
A23F3/42 (EP,KR,US);
A23F3/163 (EP,US);
A23F3/18 (EP,US);
A23F3/20 (EP,US);
A23F3/40 (EP,KR,US)
|
Former IPC [2004/45] | A23F3/42, A23F3/40 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/17] |
Former [2004/45] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON GRÜNTEEPOLYPHENOL | [2004/45] | English: | PROCESS FOR PRODUCING GREEN TEA POLYPHENOL | [2004/45] | French: | PROCESSUS DE PRODUCTION DE POLYPHENOL DE THE VERT | [2004/45] | Entry into regional phase | 04.08.2004 | Translation filed | 04.08.2004 | National basic fee paid | 04.08.2004 | Search fee paid | 04.08.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.08.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.07.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 04.08.2004 | Examination requested [2004/45] | 15.06.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.10.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.02.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.04.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.02.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 25.02.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.01.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XDA]JPH11113491 ; | [X]JPH03108444 ; | [A]GB559758 (ARNDT WERNER, et al) [A] 1,4,6 * example I *; | [L]JP2003219800 ; | [L]JP2003219799 ; | [A]JPS59120050 ; | [A]US2785979 (MITCHELL GEORGE F) [A] 1,6 * example 1 *; | [A]GB1284721 (FINLIP PRODUCTS LTD, et al) [A] 6 * page 1, line 26 - line 31; example . *; | [A]JP2000204370 | [XDA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990730), vol. 1999, no. 09, & JP11113491 A 19990427 (T HASEGAWA CO LTD) [XD] 1-5 * abstract * [A] 15,19 | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1991, no. 25, Database accession no. 1991-180889, XP002315800 & JPH03108444 A 19910508 (SHIMURA M) [X] 1,2,4 * abstract * | [L] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20031205), vol. 2003, no. 12, & JP2003219800 A 20030805 (KAO CORP) [L] 1,11-14 * abstract * | [L] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20031205), vol. 2003, no. 12, & JP2003219799 A 20030805 (KAO CORP) [L] 1,15-19 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19841030), vol. 008, no. 236, Database accession no. (C - 249), & JP59120050 A 19840711 (HONEN SEIYU KK; others: 02) [A] 6,15 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20001117), vol. 2000, no. 10, & JP2000204370 A 20000725 (NONG SIM CO LTD) [A] 6 * abstract * | International search | [X]JPS5352696 (ISHIGAKI TRADING); | [A]JPH0423895 (HOUSE FOOD INDUSTRIAL CO); | [A]JPH0257145 (SHIGA YOKO); | [A]JP2000135059 (INABATA KORYO CO LTD); | [A]JPH06303904 (ASAHI BREWERIES LTD) | Examination | EP0416667 | GB1546508 | GB2074004 | WO9823164 |