EP1466512 - A LEVER THAT COMBINES INSERTION, RETENTION, AND EJECTION FUNCTIONS FOR CARDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.03.2009 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intel Corporation 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/20] | For all designated states Intel Corporation 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95052 / US | ||
Former [2004/42] | For all designated states INTEL CORPORATION 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95052 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LING, Yun 14824 NW Yellowberry Way Portland, OR 97229 / US | 02 /
TONG, Daniel 16678 NW Paisley Drive Beaverton, OR 97006 / US | [2004/42] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/42] | Goddar, Heinz J., Dr. FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03703893.2 | 16.01.2003 | [2004/42] | WO2003US01575 | Priority number, date | US20020054083 | 18.01.2002 Original published format: US 54083 | [2004/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03063566 | Date: | 31.07.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/31] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1466512 | Date: | 13.10.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.07.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1466512 | Date: | 14.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.12.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H05K7/14 | [2004/42] | CPC: |
H05K7/1431 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/42] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HEBEL ZUM EINSCHIEBEN, ARRETIEREN UND HERAUSZIEHEN VON SCHALTUNGSKARTEN | [2004/42] | English: | A LEVER THAT COMBINES INSERTION, RETENTION, AND EJECTION FUNCTIONS FOR CARDS | [2004/42] | French: | UN MODELE NOUVEAU DE LEVIER POUR LA COMBINAISON DES FONCTIONS D'INSERTION, DE MAINTIEN, D'EJECTION DE MODULES POUR CARTES ADDITIONNELLES | [2004/42] | Entry into regional phase | 16.07.2004 | National basic fee paid | 16.07.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.07.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.08.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 16.07.2004 | Examination requested [2004/42] | 21.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.06.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 10.10.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.03.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 26.03.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.02.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 14.05.2008 | BE | 14.05.2008 | CY | 14.05.2008 | CZ | 14.05.2008 | DK | 14.05.2008 | EE | 14.05.2008 | FI | 14.05.2008 | IT | 14.05.2008 | NL | 14.05.2008 | SI | 14.05.2008 | SK | 14.05.2008 | TR | 14.05.2008 | BG | 14.08.2008 | SE | 14.08.2008 | GR | 15.08.2008 | ES | 25.08.2008 | PT | 14.10.2008 | HU | 15.11.2008 | IE | 16.01.2009 | LU | 16.01.2009 | CH | 31.01.2009 | LI | 31.01.2009 | MC | 31.01.2009 | FR | 02.02.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/31] | AT | 14.05.2008 | |
BE | 14.05.2008 | ||
CZ | 14.05.2008 | ||
DK | 14.05.2008 | ||
EE | 14.05.2008 | ||
FI | 14.05.2008 | ||
IT | 14.05.2008 | ||
NL | 14.05.2008 | ||
SI | 14.05.2008 | ||
SK | 14.05.2008 | ||
BG | 14.08.2008 | ||
SE | 14.08.2008 | ||
GR | 15.08.2008 | ||
ES | 25.08.2008 | ||
PT | 14.10.2008 | ||
HU | 15.11.2008 | ||
IE | 16.01.2009 | ||
LU | 16.01.2009 | ||
CH | 31.01.2009 | ||
LI | 31.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
FR | 02.02.2009 | ||
Former [2011/21] | AT | 14.05.2008 | |
BE | 14.05.2008 | ||
CZ | 14.05.2008 | ||
DK | 14.05.2008 | ||
EE | 14.05.2008 | ||
FI | 14.05.2008 | ||
IT | 14.05.2008 | ||
NL | 14.05.2008 | ||
SI | 14.05.2008 | ||
SK | 14.05.2008 | ||
BG | 14.08.2008 | ||
SE | 14.08.2008 | ||
GR | 15.08.2008 | ||
ES | 25.08.2008 | ||
PT | 14.10.2008 | ||
IE | 16.01.2009 | ||
LU | 16.01.2009 | ||
CH | 31.01.2009 | ||
LI | 31.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
FR | 02.02.2009 | ||
Former [2010/48] | AT | 14.05.2008 | |
BE | 14.05.2008 | ||
CZ | 14.05.2008 | ||
DK | 14.05.2008 | ||
EE | 14.05.2008 | ||
FI | 14.05.2008 | ||
IT | 14.05.2008 | ||
NL | 14.05.2008 | ||
SI | 14.05.2008 | ||
SK | 14.05.2008 | ||
BG | 14.08.2008 | ||
SE | 14.08.2008 | ||
GR | 15.08.2008 | ||
ES | 25.08.2008 | ||
PT | 14.10.2008 | ||
IE | 16.01.2009 | ||
CH | 31.01.2009 | ||
LI | 31.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
FR | 02.02.2009 | ||
Former [2010/21] | AT | 14.05.2008 | |
BE | 14.05.2008 | ||
CZ | 14.05.2008 | ||
DK | 14.05.2008 | ||
EE | 14.05.2008 | ||
FI | 14.05.2008 | ||
IT | 14.05.2008 | ||
NL | 14.05.2008 | ||
SI | 14.05.2008 | ||
SK | 14.05.2008 | ||
BG | 14.08.2008 | ||
SE | 14.08.2008 | ||
ES | 25.08.2008 | ||
PT | 14.10.2008 | ||
IE | 16.01.2009 | ||
CH | 31.01.2009 | ||
LI | 31.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
FR | 02.02.2009 | ||
Former [2010/07] | AT | 14.05.2008 | |
BE | 14.05.2008 | ||
CZ | 14.05.2008 | ||
DK | 14.05.2008 | ||
EE | 14.05.2008 | ||
FI | 14.05.2008 | ||
IT | 14.05.2008 | ||
NL | 14.05.2008 | ||
SI | 14.05.2008 | ||
SK | 14.05.2008 | ||
BG | 14.08.2008 | ||
SE | 14.08.2008 | ||
ES | 25.08.2008 | ||
PT | 14.10.2008 | ||
IE | 16.01.2009 | ||
CH | 31.01.2009 | ||
LI | 31.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/47] | AT | 14.05.2008 | |
BE | 14.05.2008 | ||
CZ | 14.05.2008 | ||
DK | 14.05.2008 | ||
EE | 14.05.2008 | ||
FI | 14.05.2008 | ||
IT | 14.05.2008 | ||
NL | 14.05.2008 | ||
SI | 14.05.2008 | ||
SK | 14.05.2008 | ||
BG | 14.08.2008 | ||
SE | 14.08.2008 | ||
ES | 25.08.2008 | ||
PT | 14.10.2008 | ||
CH | 31.01.2009 | ||
LI | 31.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/39] | AT | 14.05.2008 | |
BE | 14.05.2008 | ||
CZ | 14.05.2008 | ||
DK | 14.05.2008 | ||
EE | 14.05.2008 | ||
FI | 14.05.2008 | ||
IT | 14.05.2008 | ||
NL | 14.05.2008 | ||
SI | 14.05.2008 | ||
SK | 14.05.2008 | ||
BG | 14.08.2008 | ||
SE | 14.08.2008 | ||
ES | 25.08.2008 | ||
PT | 14.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/23] | AT | 14.05.2008 | |
BE | 14.05.2008 | ||
CZ | 14.05.2008 | ||
DK | 14.05.2008 | ||
EE | 14.05.2008 | ||
FI | 14.05.2008 | ||
NL | 14.05.2008 | ||
SI | 14.05.2008 | ||
SK | 14.05.2008 | ||
BG | 14.08.2008 | ||
SE | 14.08.2008 | ||
ES | 25.08.2008 | ||
PT | 14.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | AT | 14.05.2008 | |
BE | 14.05.2008 | ||
CZ | 14.05.2008 | ||
DK | 14.05.2008 | ||
EE | 14.05.2008 | ||
FI | 14.05.2008 | ||
NL | 14.05.2008 | ||
SI | 14.05.2008 | ||
SK | 14.05.2008 | ||
SE | 14.08.2008 | ||
ES | 25.08.2008 | ||
PT | 14.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/14] | AT | 14.05.2008 | |
BE | 14.05.2008 | ||
CZ | 14.05.2008 | ||
DK | 14.05.2008 | ||
FI | 14.05.2008 | ||
NL | 14.05.2008 | ||
SI | 14.05.2008 | ||
SK | 14.05.2008 | ||
SE | 14.08.2008 | ||
ES | 25.08.2008 | ||
PT | 14.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/12] | AT | 14.05.2008 | |
BE | 14.05.2008 | ||
CZ | 14.05.2008 | ||
DK | 14.05.2008 | ||
FI | 14.05.2008 | ||
NL | 14.05.2008 | ||
SI | 14.05.2008 | ||
SE | 14.08.2008 | ||
ES | 25.08.2008 | ||
PT | 14.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/09] | AT | 14.05.2008 | |
DK | 14.05.2008 | ||
FI | 14.05.2008 | ||
NL | 14.05.2008 | ||
SI | 14.05.2008 | ||
SE | 14.08.2008 | ||
ES | 25.08.2008 | ||
PT | 14.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/07] | AT | 14.05.2008 | |
FI | 14.05.2008 | ||
NL | 14.05.2008 | ||
SI | 14.05.2008 | ||
SE | 14.08.2008 | ||
ES | 25.08.2008 | ||
Former [2008/50] | AT | 14.05.2008 | |
FI | 14.05.2008 | ||
NL | 14.05.2008 | ||
SI | 14.05.2008 | ||
ES | 25.08.2008 | ||
Former [2008/47] | SI | 14.05.2008 | |
ES | 25.08.2008 | ||
Former [2008/44] | SI | 14.05.2008 | Cited in | International search | [X]AT306137B (INVENTIO AG [CH]) [X] 1,11,14 * figure 1; claims 1-10 *; | [A]US5634803 (CHENG LEE M [US], et al) [A] 1,11,14* the whole document * |