23.12.2011 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 25.01.2012 [2012/04] |
01.09.2011 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
08.04.2011 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
04.03.2011 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
28.01.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.12.2009 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
27.10.2009 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
11.06.2009 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
10.02.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
25.07.2008 |
Change - representative |
published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] |
01.02.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
17.08.2007 |
Change - representative |
published on 19.09.2007 [2007/38] |
25.05.2007 |
Change - representative |
published on 27.06.2007 [2007/26] |
27.02.2007 |
New entry: Decision on request for further processing |
|
24.02.2007 |
New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing |
|
21.02.2007 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
21.02.2007 |
New entry: Receipt of request for further processing |
|
06.02.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
13.12.2006 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
29.09.2006 |
Change - representative |
published on 02.11.2006 [2006/44] |
07.09.2006 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
27.04.2006 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
17.02.2006 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] |
08.02.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.03.2005 |
Deletion: Fee payment for extension state |
|
29.03.2005 |
Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state |
|
12.02.2005 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
12.02.2005 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee |
|
12.02.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
25.10.2004 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
08.10.2004 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 24.11.2004 [2004/48] |
08.10.2004 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 24.11.2004 [2004/48] |
05.10.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.09.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.09.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.02.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
17.10.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
14.08.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
09.08.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.08.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
26.03.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|