EP1478734 - SERUM-FREE MEDIA FOR CHONDROCYTES AND METHODS OF USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.12.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.12.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.01.2012 [2012/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENZYME CORPORATION 500 Kendall Street Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/48] | For all designated states Genzyme Corporation 500 Kendall Street Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BROWN, Liesbeth, Maria, E. 21 Mosman Street West Newton, MA 02465 / US | [2004/48] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Postfach 86 07 67 81634 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/38] | Vossius & Partner P.O. Box 86 07 67 81634 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/26] | Tomlinson, Edward James, et al Frohwitter Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Possartstrasse 20 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/44] | Hermann, Bettina Celia, et al Frohwitter Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Possartstrasse 20 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/48] | Helbig, Christian, Dr. Dipl.-Biol. Frohwitter Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Possartstrasse 20 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03703966.6 | 24.01.2003 | [2004/48] | WO2003US01941 | Priority number, date | US20020351949P | 25.01.2002 Original published format: US 351949 P | US20020389078P | 14.06.2002 Original published format: US 389078 P | [2004/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03064598 | Date: | 07.08.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/32] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1478734 | Date: | 24.11.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.08.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 16.10.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.02.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C12N5/00, C12N5/02 | [2004/48] | CPC: |
C12N5/0655 (EP,US);
C12N2500/25 (EP,US);
C12N2500/36 (EP,US);
C12N2500/38 (EP,US);
C12N2500/90 (EP,US);
C12N2501/115 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/48] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SERUMFREIE MEDIEN FÜR CHONDROZYTEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERWENDUNG DAVON | [2004/48] | English: | SERUM-FREE MEDIA FOR CHONDROCYTES AND METHODS OF USE THEREOF | [2004/48] | French: | MILIEU DEPOURVU DE SERUM POUR CHONDROCYTES ET PROCEDES D'UTILISATION DE CELUI-CI | [2004/48] | Entry into regional phase | 25.08.2004 | National basic fee paid | 25.08.2004 | Search fee paid | 25.08.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.08.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.08.2004 | Examination requested [2004/48] | 21.10.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.02.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.12.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.04.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.08.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/04] | 07.09.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/04] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.05.2006 | Request for further processing for: | 15.02.2007 | Request for further processing filed | 15.02.2007 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 01.03.2007 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2005 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   02.02.2005 | 31.01.2011 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5405772 (PONTING IAN L O [US]) [X] 1,8,9,26,38,44 * column 8, lines 4-9 * * column 12 * * column 10, line 1 - line 5 *; | [X]WO9639487 (OSIRIS THERAPEUTICS INC [US]) [X] 1,3,6,8,9,11,26,28,29,31-35,38,39,41,42,44 * page 9, paragraph 4 * * page 15, paragraph 4 - page 16, paragraph 1 *; | [A]WO9733978 (LIFE TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [A] 1-44 * page 13, line 10 - line 13 * * example 2 * * table 3 *; | [X]WO0027996 (CONSORZIO PER LA GESTIONE DEL [IT], et al) [X] 1,6,8,9,11,26,31-35,38-42,44 * examples 1,2 * * table 1 * * page 3 - page 5 *; | [A] - JENNINGS S D ET AL, "Clonal growth of primary cultures of human hyaline chondrocytes in a defined medium.", CELL BIOLOGY INTERNATIONAL REPORTS. FEB 1983, (198302), vol. 7, no. 2, ISSN 0309-1651, pages 149 - 159, XP009060788 [A] 1-44 * the whole document * | [A] - SCHWARTZ E R, "HUMAN CHONDROCYTES IN COMPLETELY DEFINED MEDIUM", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL CHEMISTRY AND CLINICAL BIOCHEMISTRY, & WORKSHOP CONFERENCE ON PATHOBIOCHEMISTRY OF THE CHONDROCYTE HELD BY THE GERMAN SOCIETY FOR CLINICAL, (1986), vol. 24, no. 11, ISSN 0340-076X, pages 930 - 933, XP009060819 [A] 1-44 * the whole document * | [A] - BOUMEDIENE K ET AL, "Modulation of rabbit articular chondrocyte (RAC) proliferation by TGF-beta isoforms.", CELL PROLIFERATION. APR 1995, (199504), vol. 28, no. 4, ISSN 0960-7722, pages 221 - 234, XP009060830 [A] 1-44 * the whole document * | [A] - MADSEN K ET AL, "GROWTH HORMONE STIMULATES THE PROLIFERATION OF CULTURED CHONDROCYTES FROM RABBIT EAR AND RAT RIB GROWTH CARTILAGE", NATURE, NATURE PUBLISHING GROUP, LONDON, GB, (19830811), vol. 304, ISSN 0028-0836, pages 545 - 547, XP001208261 [A] 1-44 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/304545a0 | International search | [AP]US2002041900 (OLSEN OLE [DK], et al); | [A]US6150163 (MCPHERSON JOHN M [US], et al); | [A]WO0157083 (ZYMOGENETICS INC [US]); | [A] - ADOLPHE ET AL., "Cell multiplication and type II collagen production by rabbit articular chondrocytes cultivated in a defined medium", EXP. CELL RESEARCH, (1984), vol. 155, pages 527 - 536, XP002046800 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0014-4827(84)90212-X | [A] - AULTHOUSE ET AL., "Expression of the human chondrocyte phenotype in vitro", IN VITRO CELLULAR AND DEVELOPMENTAL BIOLOGY, (198907), vol. 25, no. 7, pages 659 - 668, XP001237269 | [A] - BONAVENTURE ET AL., "Reexpression of cartilage-specific genes by dedifferentiated human articular chondrocytes cultured in alginate beads", EXPERIMENTAL CELL RESEARCH, (1994), vol. 212, pages 97 - 104, XP002966147 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/excr.1994.1123 | [A] - BRITTBERG ET AL., "Treatment of deep cartilage defects in the knee with autologous chondrocyte transplantation", THE NEW ENGLAND JOURNAL OF MEDICINE, (19941006), vol. 331, no. 14, pages 889 - 895, XP002071931 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1056/NEJM199410063311401 | [A] - JENNINGS ET AL., "Clonal growth of primary cultures of rabbit ear chondrocytes in a lipid-supplemental defined medium", EXPERIMENTAL CELL RESEARCH, (1983), vol. 145, pages 415 - 423, XP002996275 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0014-4827(83)90020-4 |