EP1479137 - DEVICE FOR GENERATING TERAHERTZ RADIATION, AND A SEMICONDUCTOR COMPONENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.09.2007 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.09.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.10.2007 [2007/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Femtolasers Produktions GmbH Kleinengersdorferstrasse 24 2100 Korneuburg / AT | [2004/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
UNTERRAINER, Karl Rudolf Kaspargasse 32/12 A-2511 Pfaffstätten / AT | 02 /
STRASSER, Gottfried Rudolf Kaspargasse 32/7 A-2511 Pfaffstätten / AT | 03 /
DARMO, Juraj Tomankova 1 SK-84105 Bratislava / SK | 04 /
STINGL, Andreas Kleinengersdorferstrasse 24 A-2100 Korneuburg / AT | 05 /
LE, Tuan Bäuerlegasse 7/4 A-1200 Wien / AT | [2006/43] |
Former [2005/08] | 01 /
UNTERRAINER, Karl Rudolf Kaspargasse 32/12 A-2511 Pfaffstätten / AT | ||
02 /
STRASSER, Gottfried Rudolf Kaspargasse 32/7 A-2511 Pfaffstätten / AT | |||
03 /
DARMO, Juraj Tomankova 1 SK-84105 Bratislava / SL | |||
04 /
STINGL, Andreas Kleinengersdorferstrasse 24 A-2100 Korneuburg / AT | |||
05 /
LE, Tuan Bäuerlegasse 7/4 A-1200 Wien / AT | |||
Former [2004/48] | 01 /
UNTERRAINER, Karl Rudolf Kaspargasse 32/12 A-2511 Pfaffstätten / AT | ||
02 /
STRASSER, Gottfried Rudolf Kaspargasse 32/7 A-2511 Pfaffstätten / AT | |||
03 /
DARMO, Juraj Amalienstrasse 51/211 A-1130 Wien / AT | |||
04 /
STINGL, Andreas Kleinengersdorferstrasse 24 A-2100 Korneuburg / AT | |||
05 /
LE, Tuan Bäuerlegasse 7/4 A-1200 Wien / AT | Representative(s) | SONN Patentanwälte GmbH & Co KG Riemergasse 14 1010 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2004/48] | Sonn & Partner Patentanwälte Riemergasse 14 1010 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 03704092.0 | 18.02.2003 | [2004/48] | WO2003AT00053 | Priority number, date | AT20020000312 | 28.02.2002 Original published format: AT 3122002 | [2004/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03073563 | Date: | 04.09.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/36] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1479137 | Date: | 24.11.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.09.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1479137 | Date: | 02.11.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.06.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H01S3/108 | [2004/48] | CPC: |
H01S3/1112 (EP,US);
H01S3/08036 (EP,US);
H01S1/02 (EP,US);
H01S3/0811 (EP,US);
H01S3/0816 (EP,US);
H01S3/1625 (EP,US);
H01S3/1636 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/44] |
Former [2004/48] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EINRICHTUNG ZUR ERZEUGUNG VON TERAHERTZ-STRAHLUNG SOWIE HALBLEITERBAUELEMENT | [2006/20] | English: | DEVICE FOR GENERATING TERAHERTZ RADIATION, AND A SEMICONDUCTOR COMPONENT | [2004/48] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR PRODUIRE UN RAYONNEMENT TERAHERTZIEN ET COMPOSANT SEMI-CONDUCTEUR | [2004/48] |
Former [2004/48] | EINRICHTUNG ZUR ERZEUGUNG VON TERAHERTZ−STRAHLUNG SOWIE HALBLEITERBAUELEMENT | Entry into regional phase | 12.08.2004 | National basic fee paid | 12.08.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.08.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.08.2004 | Examination requested [2004/48] | 21.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 17.11.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.05.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.09.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 14.09.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.08.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DA]US5729017 (BRENER IGAL M [US], et al) [DA] 1-33 * column 6, line 32 - line 38; figure 7 * * column 4, line 12 - line 25 * * column 2, line 43 - line 62 * * column 1, line 13 - line 33 *; | [DA] - LIU ET AL., "THz Radiation from Intracavity Saturable Bragg Reflector in Magnetic Field with Self-Started Mode-Locking by Strained Saturable Bragg Reflector", JPN. J. APPL. PHYS., (19991115), vol. 38, no. 11b, pages L1333 - L1335, XP002272906 [DA] 1-33 * abstract * * page L1333, column L, paragraph 1 * | [A] - BROWN E R, "A PHOTOCONDUCTIVE MODEL FOR SUPERIOR GAAS THZ PHOTOMIXERS", APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS, AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS. NEW YORK, US, (19990809), vol. 75, no. 6, ISSN 0003-6951, pages 769 - 771, XP000877773 [A] 1-33 * abstract * * page 771, line 9 - line 13 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.124507 | [AD] - ZHENLIN LIU ET AL, "Efficient terahertz radiation generation from a bulk InAs mirror as an intracavity terahertz radiation emitter", JAPANESE JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS, PART 2 (LETTERS), 15 APRIL 2000, PUBLICATION OFFICE, JAPANESE JOURNAL APPL. PHYS, JAPAN, vol. 39, no. 4B, ISSN 0021-4922, pages L366 - L367, XP002272907 [AD] 1-33 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1143/JJAP.39.L366 | [A] - NEMEC H ET AL, "Study of carrier dynamics in LT GaAs by means of time-resolved emission terahertz spectroscopy", CONFERENCE DIGEST 2000 INTERNATIONAL QUANTUM ELECTRONICS CONFERENCE, (20000910), pages 154 - 154, XP010540312 [A] 1-33 * the whole document * |