EP1466157 - DEVICE FOR LOW-VIBRATION FORCE MEASUREMENT IN RAPID DYNAMIC TENSILE EXPERIMENTS ON MATERIAL SAMPLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.06.2006 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.12.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 25.01.2017 [2017/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Leonrodstrasse 54 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/42] | For all designated states FRAUNHOFER-GESELLSCHAFT ZUR FÖRDERUNG DER ANGEWANDTEN FORSCHUNG E.V. Leonrodstrasse 54 80636 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BÖHME, Wolfgang Ahornring 38 79211 Denzlingen / DE | 02 /
HUG, Manfred Burgunder Weg 11 79291 Merdingen / DE | [2004/42] | Representative(s) | Rösler, Uwe Rösler Patentanwaltskanzlei Landsberger Strasse 480a 81241 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/42] | Rösler, Uwe, Dipl.-Phys. Rösler Patentanwaltskanzlei, Landsberger Strasse 480a 81241 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03704426.0 | 17.01.2003 | [2004/42] | WO2003EP00458 | Priority number, date | DE20021001861 | 18.01.2002 Original published format: DE 10201861 | [2004/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03060481 | Date: | 24.07.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1466157 | Date: | 13.10.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.07.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1466157 | Date: | 03.08.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.07.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G01N3/04, G01N3/30 | [2004/42] | CPC: |
G01N3/04 (EP,US);
G01N3/30 (EP,US);
G01N2203/001 (EP,US);
G01N2203/0016 (EP,US);
G01N2203/0051 (EP,US);
G01N2203/0423 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/42] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR SCHWINGUNGSARMEN KRAFTMESSUNG BEI SCHNELLEN, DYNAMISCHEN ZUGVERSUCHEN AN WERKSTOFFPROBEN | [2004/42] | English: | DEVICE FOR LOW-VIBRATION FORCE MEASUREMENT IN RAPID DYNAMIC TENSILE EXPERIMENTS ON MATERIAL SAMPLES | [2004/42] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE MESURE DE FORCE A FAIBLE TAUX DE VIBRATIONS DANS DES ESSAIS DE TRACTION DYNAMIQUES RAPIDES SUR DES ECHANTILLONS DE MATERIAUX | [2004/42] | Entry into regional phase | 21.11.2003 | National basic fee paid | 21.11.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.11.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.07.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.11.2003 | Examination requested [2004/42] | 14.02.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.05.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 27.05.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.05.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 03.08.2005 | EE | 03.08.2005 | FI | 03.08.2005 | IE | 03.08.2005 | NL | 03.08.2005 | SI | 03.08.2005 | SK | 03.08.2005 | TR | 03.08.2005 | BG | 03.11.2005 | DK | 03.11.2005 | GR | 03.11.2005 | SE | 03.11.2005 | ES | 14.11.2005 | PT | 03.01.2006 | AT | 17.01.2006 | BE | 31.01.2006 | LU | 31.01.2006 | MC | 31.01.2006 | HU | 04.02.2006 | [2017/04] |
Former [2009/02] | CY | 03.08.2005 | |
EE | 03.08.2005 | ||
FI | 03.08.2005 | ||
IE | 03.08.2005 | ||
NL | 03.08.2005 | ||
SI | 03.08.2005 | ||
SK | 03.08.2005 | ||
TR | 03.08.2005 | ||
BG | 03.11.2005 | ||
DK | 03.11.2005 | ||
GR | 03.11.2005 | ||
SE | 03.11.2005 | ||
ES | 14.11.2005 | ||
PT | 03.01.2006 | ||
AT | 17.01.2006 | ||
BE | 31.01.2006 | ||
LU | 31.01.2006 | ||
MC | 31.01.2006 | ||
HU | 04.02.2006 | ||
Former [2007/28] | EE | 03.08.2005 | |
FI | 03.08.2005 | ||
IE | 03.08.2005 | ||
NL | 03.08.2005 | ||
SI | 03.08.2005 | ||
SK | 03.08.2005 | ||
TR | 03.08.2005 | ||
BG | 03.11.2005 | ||
DK | 03.11.2005 | ||
GR | 03.11.2005 | ||
SE | 03.11.2005 | ||
ES | 14.11.2005 | ||
PT | 03.01.2006 | ||
AT | 17.01.2006 | ||
BE | 31.01.2006 | ||
LU | 31.01.2006 | ||
MC | 31.01.2006 | ||
HU | 04.02.2006 | ||
Former [2007/14] | EE | 03.08.2005 | |
FI | 03.08.2005 | ||
IE | 03.08.2005 | ||
NL | 03.08.2005 | ||
SI | 03.08.2005 | ||
SK | 03.08.2005 | ||
TR | 03.08.2005 | ||
BG | 03.11.2005 | ||
DK | 03.11.2005 | ||
GR | 03.11.2005 | ||
SE | 03.11.2005 | ||
ES | 14.11.2005 | ||
PT | 03.01.2006 | ||
BE | 31.01.2006 | ||
LU | 31.01.2006 | ||
MC | 31.01.2006 | ||
HU | 04.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/52] | FI | 03.08.2005 | |
IE | 03.08.2005 | ||
NL | 03.08.2005 | ||
SI | 03.08.2005 | ||
SK | 03.08.2005 | ||
TR | 03.08.2005 | ||
BG | 03.11.2005 | ||
DK | 03.11.2005 | ||
GR | 03.11.2005 | ||
SE | 03.11.2005 | ||
ES | 14.11.2005 | ||
PT | 03.01.2006 | ||
MC | 31.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/44] | FI | 03.08.2005 | |
IE | 03.08.2005 | ||
NL | 03.08.2005 | ||
SI | 03.08.2005 | ||
SK | 03.08.2005 | ||
BG | 03.11.2005 | ||
DK | 03.11.2005 | ||
GR | 03.11.2005 | ||
SE | 03.11.2005 | ||
ES | 14.11.2005 | ||
PT | 03.01.2006 | ||
MC | 31.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/29] | FI | 03.08.2005 | |
IE | 03.08.2005 | ||
NL | 03.08.2005 | ||
SI | 03.08.2005 | ||
SK | 03.08.2005 | ||
BG | 03.11.2005 | ||
DK | 03.11.2005 | ||
GR | 03.11.2005 | ||
SE | 03.11.2005 | ||
ES | 14.11.2005 | ||
PT | 03.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/26] | FI | 03.08.2005 | |
IE | 03.08.2005 | ||
NL | 03.08.2005 | ||
SI | 03.08.2005 | ||
BG | 03.11.2005 | ||
DK | 03.11.2005 | ||
GR | 03.11.2005 | ||
SE | 03.11.2005 | ||
ES | 14.11.2005 | ||
PT | 03.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/25] | FI | 03.08.2005 | |
IE | 03.08.2005 | ||
NL | 03.08.2005 | ||
SI | 03.08.2005 | ||
BG | 03.11.2005 | ||
GR | 03.11.2005 | ||
SE | 03.11.2005 | ||
ES | 14.11.2005 | ||
PT | 03.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/14] | FI | 03.08.2005 | |
NL | 03.08.2005 | ||
SI | 03.08.2005 | ||
BG | 03.11.2005 | ||
GR | 03.11.2005 | ||
SE | 03.11.2005 | ||
ES | 14.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | FI | 03.08.2005 | |
SI | 03.08.2005 | ||
BG | 03.11.2005 | ||
SE | 03.11.2005 | Cited in | International search | [X]GB549140 (EDWARD ERNEST SIMMONS JR) [X] 1,2,4,5,8,9 * page 2, line 71 - page 3, line 24; figures 2,3 *; | [DX]DE3636252 (HECK SIEGFRIED [DE]) [DX] 1,3,4,7,8 * figure - *; | [X]DE4204589 (MTU MUENCHEN GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,2,5,6,8,9 * column 1, line 58 - column 2, line 10 * * column 3, line 65 - column 4, line 61; figure 2 *; | [A]US5388464 (MADDISON ANTHONY [GB]) [A] 1 * column 4, line 61 - column 5, line 5; figure 4 *; | [A]US5585570 (RAYMOND LOUIS [US]) [A] 1* column 9, line 13 - column 11, line 53; figure 7 * |