EP1476659 - WIND ENERGY TURBINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.08.2010 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.10.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 17.11.2010 [2010/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wobben, Aloys Argestrasse 19 26607 Aurich / DE | [2009/40] |
Former [2004/47] | For all designated states Wobben, Aloys Argestrasse 19 26607 Aurich / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2004/47] | Representative(s) | Göken, Klaus G. Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR Bremen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/47] | Göken, Klaus G. Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | Application number, filing date | 03704591.1 | 12.02.2003 | [2004/47] | WO2003EP01352 | Priority number, date | DE2002105988 | 14.02.2002 Original published format: DE 10205988 | [2004/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03069156 | Date: | 21.08.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1476659 | Date: | 17.11.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.08.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1476659 | Date: | 30.09.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.08.2003 | Classification | IPC: | F03D11/04, F03D1/02 | [2004/47] | CPC: |
F03D13/20 (EP,US);
F03D1/02 (KR);
F03D13/25 (EP,US);
F03D80/50 (EP,US);
F03D80/70 (EP,US);
E02B2017/0091 (EP,US);
F05B2240/95 (EP,US);
Y02E10/72 (EP);
Y02E10/727 (US);
Y02P70/50 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/47] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WINDENERGIEANLAGE | [2004/47] | English: | WIND ENERGY TURBINE | [2004/47] | French: | EOLIENNE | [2004/47] | Entry into regional phase | 14.09.2004 | National basic fee paid | 14.09.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.09.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.09.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 14.09.2004 | Examination requested [2004/47] | 25.01.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.04.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.08.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 21.08.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.07.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 03.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | MC | 01.03.2010 | [2010/46] | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO9610130 (HEHENBERGER GERALD [AT]) [Y] 4-15* the whole document *; | [XY]WO9832968 (BEHEERMAATSCHAPPIJ P BUITENDIJ [NL], et al) [X] 1-3 * the whole document * [Y] 4-15 |