blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1480864

EP1480864 - HYDRAULIC POWER ASSISTED STEERING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.10.2007
Database last updated on 26.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2007No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 14.11.2007  [2007/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Continental Teves AG & Co. oHG
Guerickestrasse 7
60488 Frankfurt am Main / DE
[N/P]
Former [2006/49]For all designated states
Continental Teves AG & Co. oHG
Guerickestrasse 7
60488 Frankfurt am Main / DE
Former [2004/49]For all designated states
Continental Teves AG & Co. OHG
Guerickestrasse 7
60488 Frankfurt am Main / DE
Inventor(s)01 / BÖHM, Jürgen
Im Bangert 8
65558 Oberneisen / DE
02 / LINKENBACH, Steffen
Lahnweg 14
65760 Eschborn / DE
03 / HOFFMANN, Oliver
Schlossstrasse 116
60486 Frankfurt / DE
04 / NELL, Joachim
Gustav-Hoch-Strasse 35
63452 Hanau / DE
05 / SCHIRLING, Andreas
Seilerstrasse 18
64319 Pfungstadt / DE
06 / MUTH, Norman
Am Dornbusch 37
35066 Frankenberg / DE
07 / GÖRLACH, Johannes
Eichenring 4
35428 Langgöns / DE
 [2004/49]
Application number, filing date03704633.117.02.2003
[2004/49]
WO2003EP01552
Priority number, dateDE200210851927.02.2002         Original published format: DE 10208519
DE200215630603.12.2002         Original published format: DE 10256306
[2004/49]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO03072418
Date:04.09.2003
Language:DE
[2003/36]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1480864
Date:01.12.2004
Language:DE
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.09.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2004/49]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1480864
Date:06.12.2006
Language:DE
[2006/49]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP04.09.2003
ClassificationIPC:B62D5/06, B62D5/04
[2004/49]
CPC:
B62D15/029 (EP,US); B62D5/0409 (EP,US); B62D5/06 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   IT [2006/49]
Former [2004/49]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:HYDRAULISCHE SERVOLENKUNG[2004/49]
English:HYDRAULIC POWER ASSISTED STEERING SYSTEM[2004/49]
French:DIRECTION ASSISTEE HYDRAULIQUE[2004/49]
Entry into regional phase27.09.2004National basic fee paid 
27.09.2004Designation fee(s) paid 
27.09.2004Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.09.2004Examination requested  [2004/49]
03.06.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.10.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.11.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.03.2006Fee for grant paid
27.03.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)07.09.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/46]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
28.02.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT06.12.2006
[2007/40]
Cited inInternational search[XY]EP0580997  (MAN NUTZFAHRZEUGE AG [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,5,9 * column 3, line 5 - column 5, line 10; figures 1,3 * [Y] 3,6,10;
 [YA]DE19911892  (ALSTOM ANL & AUTOMTECH GMBH [DE]) [Y] 3,10 * column 3, line 33 - column 4, line 51 * * column 5, line 17 - line 25 * * figure . * [A] 1,2,4,5,7,9;
 [YA]EP1142746  (FERRARI SPA [IT]) [Y] 6 * paragraphs [0013] - [0015] - [0018] , [0019] , [0024] , [0028]; figure . *[A] 1-5,8-10
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.