EP1554615 - DISPLAY DEVICE, PARTICULARLY FOR TRAFFIC SIGNS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.09.2006 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.09.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.10.2006 [2006/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Microlux S.r.l. Via Bandello, 11 15057 Tortona / IT | [2005/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NICOLINI, Andrea Via Bandello 11 15057 Tortona (AL) / IT | 02 /
BRACCO, Egidio Via Bandello 11 15057 Tortona (AL) / IT | [2005/29] | Representative(s) | Minoja, Fabrizio Bianchetti & Minoja S.r.l. Via Plinio, 63 20129 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2005/29] | Minoja, Fabrizio, Dr. Bianchetti Bracco Minoja S.r.l. Via Plinio, 63 20129 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 03704853.5 | 25.02.2003 | [2005/29] | WO2003IB00704 | Priority number, date | IT2002MI02227 | 21.10.2002 Original published format: IT MI20022227 | [2005/29] | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004036275 | Date: | 29.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1554615 | Date: | 20.07.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.04.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.04.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/00 | [2005/29] | CPC: |
G02B6/0038 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/29] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG, INSBESONDERE FÜR VERKEHRSSCHILDER | [2005/29] | English: | DISPLAY DEVICE, PARTICULARLY FOR TRAFFIC SIGNS | [2005/29] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE, EN PARTICULIER POUR PANNEAUX DE SIGNALISATION | [2005/29] | Entry into regional phase | 25.02.2003 | Translation filed | 21.04.2005 | National basic fee paid | 21.04.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.04.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.04.2005 | Examination requested [2005/29] | 15.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.03.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/41] | 28.04.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO0188432 (INEOS ACRYLICS UK LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1 * abstract * |