EP1477569 - METHOD OF QUANTIFYING GLYCOSYLATED PROTEIN USING REDOX REACTION AND QUANTIFICATION KIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.05.2008 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 15.09.2010 [2010/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ARKRAY, Inc. 57, Nishiaketa-cho Higashikujo Minami-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 601-8045 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/21] | For all designated states Arkray, Inc. 57, Nishiaketa-cho Higashikujo Minami-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 601-8045 / JP | ||
Former [2004/47] | For all designated states ARKRAY, Inc. 57, Nishi Aketa-Cho, Higashi-kujo, Minami-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 601-8045 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YONEHARA, Satoshi, ARKRAY, INC. 57, Nishiaketa-cho, Higashikujo, Minami-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 601-8045 / JP | 02 /
ISHIMARU, Kaori, ARKRAY, INC. 57, Nishiaketa-cho, Higashikujo, Minami-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 601-8045 / JP | 03 /
KOMORI, Tsuguki 1229, Shimatani, Hachiman-cho Gujo-gun, Gifu 501-4222 / JP | [2004/47] | Representative(s) | Golding, Louise Ann Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/47] | Golding, Louise Ann Frank B. Dehn & Co., 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 03705030.9 | 29.01.2003 | [2004/47] | WO2003JP00820 | Priority number, date | JP20020023897 | 31.01.2002 Original published format: JP 2002023897 | JP20020023898 | 31.01.2002 Original published format: JP 2002023898 | [2004/47] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03064683 | Date: | 07.08.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1477569 | Date: | 17.11.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.08.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1477569 | Date: | 18.07.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 07.08.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.06.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/72, G01N33/68, C12Q1/26 | [2005/31] | CPC: |
G01N33/6842 (EP,US);
C12Q1/26 (EP,US);
G01N33/6803 (EP,US);
G01N33/723 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2004/47] | C12Q1/26, G01N33/50, G01N33/15 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/47] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR QUANTIFIZIERUNG VON GLYKOSYLIERTEM PROTEIN UNTER VERWENDUNG EINER REDOXREAKTION SOWIE EINES QUANTIFIZIERUNGSKITS | [2004/47] | English: | METHOD OF QUANTIFYING GLYCOSYLATED PROTEIN USING REDOX REACTION AND QUANTIFICATION KIT | [2004/47] | French: | METHODE DE QUANTIFICATION DE PROTEINE GLYCOSYLEE AU MOYEN D'UNE REACTION D'OXYDOREDUCTION, ET KIT DE QUANTIFICATION ASSOCIE | [2004/47] | Entry into regional phase | 24.08.2004 | Translation filed | 24.08.2004 | National basic fee paid | 24.08.2004 | Search fee paid | 24.08.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.08.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.04.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 24.08.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.08.2004 | Examination requested [2004/47] | 09.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.02.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.11.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.01.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.05.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 31.05.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.04.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 18.07.2007 | BE | 18.07.2007 | CH | 18.07.2007 | CY | 18.07.2007 | CZ | 18.07.2007 | DK | 18.07.2007 | EE | 18.07.2007 | FI | 18.07.2007 | LI | 18.07.2007 | NL | 18.07.2007 | SI | 18.07.2007 | SK | 18.07.2007 | TR | 18.07.2007 | BG | 18.10.2007 | SE | 18.10.2007 | GR | 19.10.2007 | ES | 29.10.2007 | PT | 18.12.2007 | HU | 19.01.2008 | IE | 29.01.2008 | LU | 29.01.2008 | MC | 31.01.2008 | [2010/37] |
Former [2010/34] | AT | 18.07.2007 | |
BE | 18.07.2007 | ||
CH | 18.07.2007 | ||
CY | 18.07.2007 | ||
CZ | 18.07.2007 | ||
DK | 18.07.2007 | ||
EE | 18.07.2007 | ||
FI | 18.07.2007 | ||
LI | 18.07.2007 | ||
NL | 18.07.2007 | ||
SI | 18.07.2007 | ||
SK | 18.07.2007 | ||
BG | 18.10.2007 | ||
SE | 18.10.2007 | ||
GR | 19.10.2007 | ||
ES | 29.10.2007 | ||
PT | 18.12.2007 | ||
HU | 19.01.2008 | ||
IE | 29.01.2008 | ||
LU | 29.01.2008 | ||
MC | 31.01.2008 | ||
Former [2010/32] | AT | 18.07.2007 | |
BE | 18.07.2007 | ||
CH | 18.07.2007 | ||
CY | 18.07.2007 | ||
CZ | 18.07.2007 | ||
DK | 18.07.2007 | ||
EE | 18.07.2007 | ||
FI | 18.07.2007 | ||
LI | 18.07.2007 | ||
NL | 18.07.2007 | ||
SI | 18.07.2007 | ||
SK | 18.07.2007 | ||
BG | 18.10.2007 | ||
SE | 18.10.2007 | ||
GR | 19.10.2007 | ||
ES | 29.10.2007 | ||
PT | 18.12.2007 | ||
IE | 29.01.2008 | ||
LU | 29.01.2008 | ||
MC | 31.01.2008 | ||
Former [2009/34] | AT | 18.07.2007 | |
BE | 18.07.2007 | ||
CH | 18.07.2007 | ||
CY | 18.07.2007 | ||
CZ | 18.07.2007 | ||
DK | 18.07.2007 | ||
EE | 18.07.2007 | ||
FI | 18.07.2007 | ||
LI | 18.07.2007 | ||
NL | 18.07.2007 | ||
SI | 18.07.2007 | ||
SK | 18.07.2007 | ||
BG | 18.10.2007 | ||
SE | 18.10.2007 | ||
GR | 19.10.2007 | ||
ES | 29.10.2007 | ||
PT | 18.12.2007 | ||
IE | 29.01.2008 | ||
MC | 31.01.2008 | ||
Former [2009/29] | AT | 18.07.2007 | |
BE | 18.07.2007 | ||
CH | 18.07.2007 | ||
CZ | 18.07.2007 | ||
DK | 18.07.2007 | ||
EE | 18.07.2007 | ||
FI | 18.07.2007 | ||
LI | 18.07.2007 | ||
NL | 18.07.2007 | ||
SI | 18.07.2007 | ||
SK | 18.07.2007 | ||
BG | 18.10.2007 | ||
SE | 18.10.2007 | ||
GR | 19.10.2007 | ||
ES | 29.10.2007 | ||
PT | 18.12.2007 | ||
IE | 29.01.2008 | ||
MC | 31.01.2008 | ||
Former [2009/11] | AT | 18.07.2007 | |
BE | 18.07.2007 | ||
CH | 18.07.2007 | ||
CZ | 18.07.2007 | ||
DK | 18.07.2007 | ||
EE | 18.07.2007 | ||
FI | 18.07.2007 | ||
LI | 18.07.2007 | ||
NL | 18.07.2007 | ||
SK | 18.07.2007 | ||
BG | 18.10.2007 | ||
SE | 18.10.2007 | ||
GR | 19.10.2007 | ||
ES | 29.10.2007 | ||
PT | 18.12.2007 | ||
IE | 29.01.2008 | ||
MC | 31.01.2008 | ||
Former [2009/08] | AT | 18.07.2007 | |
BE | 18.07.2007 | ||
CH | 18.07.2007 | ||
CZ | 18.07.2007 | ||
DK | 18.07.2007 | ||
FI | 18.07.2007 | ||
LI | 18.07.2007 | ||
NL | 18.07.2007 | ||
SK | 18.07.2007 | ||
BG | 18.10.2007 | ||
SE | 18.10.2007 | ||
GR | 19.10.2007 | ||
ES | 29.10.2007 | ||
PT | 18.12.2007 | ||
IE | 29.01.2008 | ||
MC | 31.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/40] | AT | 18.07.2007 | |
BE | 18.07.2007 | ||
CH | 18.07.2007 | ||
CZ | 18.07.2007 | ||
DK | 18.07.2007 | ||
FI | 18.07.2007 | ||
LI | 18.07.2007 | ||
NL | 18.07.2007 | ||
SK | 18.07.2007 | ||
BG | 18.10.2007 | ||
SE | 18.10.2007 | ||
GR | 19.10.2007 | ||
ES | 29.10.2007 | ||
PT | 18.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/28] | AT | 18.07.2007 | |
BE | 18.07.2007 | ||
CH | 18.07.2007 | ||
CZ | 18.07.2007 | ||
DK | 18.07.2007 | ||
FI | 18.07.2007 | ||
LI | 18.07.2007 | ||
NL | 18.07.2007 | ||
SK | 18.07.2007 | ||
BG | 18.10.2007 | ||
SE | 18.10.2007 | ||
GR | 19.10.2007 | ||
ES | 29.10.2007 | ||
PT | 18.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/25] | AT | 18.07.2007 | |
BE | 18.07.2007 | ||
CH | 18.07.2007 | ||
CZ | 18.07.2007 | ||
DK | 18.07.2007 | ||
FI | 18.07.2007 | ||
LI | 18.07.2007 | ||
NL | 18.07.2007 | ||
SK | 18.07.2007 | ||
BG | 18.10.2007 | ||
GR | 19.10.2007 | ||
ES | 29.10.2007 | ||
PT | 18.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | AT | 18.07.2007 | |
BE | 18.07.2007 | ||
CH | 18.07.2007 | ||
DK | 18.07.2007 | ||
FI | 18.07.2007 | ||
LI | 18.07.2007 | ||
NL | 18.07.2007 | ||
BG | 18.10.2007 | ||
GR | 19.10.2007 | ||
ES | 29.10.2007 | ||
PT | 18.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 18.07.2007 | |
BE | 18.07.2007 | ||
CH | 18.07.2007 | ||
FI | 18.07.2007 | ||
LI | 18.07.2007 | ||
NL | 18.07.2007 | ||
BG | 18.10.2007 | ||
GR | 19.10.2007 | ||
ES | 29.10.2007 | ||
PT | 18.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/13] | AT | 18.07.2007 | |
CH | 18.07.2007 | ||
FI | 18.07.2007 | ||
LI | 18.07.2007 | ||
NL | 18.07.2007 | ||
BG | 18.10.2007 | ||
ES | 29.10.2007 | ||
PT | 18.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/10] | FI | 18.07.2007 | |
NL | 18.07.2007 | ||
BG | 18.10.2007 | ||
ES | 29.10.2007 | ||
PT | 18.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | NL | 18.07.2007 | |
BG | 18.10.2007 | ||
ES | 29.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/08] | ES | 29.10.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [DX]EP0678576 (KYOTO DAIICHI KAGAKU KK [JP]) [DX] 1-30 * the whole document *; | [DX]EP0737744 (KYOTO DAIICHI KAGAKU KK [JP]) [DX] 1-30* the whole document * | International search | [A]JPS60214900 (FUJIMOTO DIAGNOSTICS); | [A]EP0166505 (WARNER LAMBERT CO [US]); | [A]JPH10313893 (KYOTO DAIICHI KAGAKU KK); | [A]JPH11155596 (KYOTO DAIICHI KAGAKU KK); | [A]JP2923222B |