EP1484394 - PRIMERS FOR NUCLEIC ACID AMPLIFICATION IN DETECTING HOUSEKEEPING GENE MRNA AND TEST METHOD USING THESE PRIMERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.10.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.10.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.12.2009 [2009/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SYSMEX CORPORATION 1-5-1, Wakinohama-Kaigandori, Chuo-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo 651-0073 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2004/50] | For all designated states Sysmex Corporation 1-5-1, Wakinohama-Kaigandori, Chuo-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 651-0073 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TADA, Sachiyo, c/o SYSMEX CORPORATION 5-1, Wakinohama-kaigandori 1-chome, Chuo-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 651-0073 / JP | [2004/50] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/50] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03705099.4 | 13.02.2003 | [2004/50] | WO2003JP01474 | Priority number, date | JP20020043866 | 20.02.2002 Original published format: JP 2002043866 | JP20020043867 | 20.02.2002 Original published format: JP 2002043867 | [2004/50] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03070935 | Date: | 28.08.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1484394 | Date: | 08.12.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.08.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 28.08.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.09.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/09, C12Q1/68 | [2004/50] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6876 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6851 (EP,US);
C12Q2545/101 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/158 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/16 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/166 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C12Q1/6851, C12Q2545/101, C12Q2531/119 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/50] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PRIMER ZUR NUKLEINSÄUREAMPLIFIKATION BEIM NACHWEISEN VON HAUSHALTUNGSGEN-mRNA SOWIE TESTVERFAHREN MIT DIESEN PRIMERN | [2004/50] | English: | PRIMERS FOR NUCLEIC ACID AMPLIFICATION IN DETECTING HOUSEKEEPING GENE MRNA AND TEST METHOD USING THESE PRIMERS | [2004/50] | French: | AMORCES POUR L'AMPLIFICATION D'ACIDES NUCLEIQUES SERVANT A LA DETECTION DE L'ARNM D'UN GENE DOMESTIQUE ET METHODE D'ESSAI FAISANT INTERVENIR CES AMORCES | [2004/50] | Entry into regional phase | 07.09.2004 | Translation filed | 07.09.2004 | National basic fee paid | 07.09.2004 | Search fee paid | 07.09.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.09.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.08.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 07.09.2004 | Examination requested [2004/50] | 27.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.06.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/49] | 14.07.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/49] | Divisional application(s) | EP09007530.0 / EP2107113 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]WO9417086 (APOLLON INC [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * 100% identity in overlap of SEQ ID No 4 (20 nt in length) of the present application and Seq ID No 34 (24 nt in length) of the citation.; page 25 - page 27 * [A] 4,7-13,21,22,24-27; | [XA]WO9423023 (UNIV ROCHESTER [US]) [X] 1,2,5,7 * pAGE 19, SEQ ID NO 9 of citation is a GAPDH, sense primer (24 bp) that has a 100% identiy to SEQ ID NO 51 between bases 169 to 192.; page 14, paragraph 1 * [A] 14-21,23-27; | [XA]WO9738098 (UNIV MANITOBA [CA], et al) [X] 1-4,7 * Forward primer of 32 bp shows a 100% identity in overlap with SEQ ID No 1 between nt 253 to nt 284.; page 30, line 31 - line 36 * [A] 8-13,21,22,24-27; | [X]WO9831707 (BMRA CORP BV [NL]) [X] 1,2,7 * 21 nt GAPDH primer of SEQ ID No 5 of the citation has a 100% overlap with SEQ ID No 53 (20 nt in length) of the present application.; page 24 - page 25; example 4 *; | [X]WO9940221 (DAHM MICHAEL W [DE], et al) [X] 1,2 * page 16, paragraph 5 - page 17, paragraph 3; sequences ACT1,ACT2 *; | [X]WO9954510 (GENENTECH INC [US]) [X] 1,2 * page 12 - page 13; tables 1a,1b *; | [XA]WO9967634 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US]) [X] 1,2,5,7 * Page 15, Seq ID No 20 of citatation is an antisense GAPDH primer (29 bp) that has a 100% identity to SEQ ID 51 of the application between bases 387 to 414; page 22, line 5. * [A] 14-21,23-27; | [X]DE19909503 (BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM INT [DE]) [X] 1,2,5* GAPDH primer, SEQ ID NO 25 of citation, has a 100% identity in overlap in 20 bp with the 22 bp primer, SEq ID No 52, of the present application. *; | [A]WO0077972 (GEN INSTRUMENT CORP [US], et al) [A] 3 * Example 4: SEQ ID No 13 of citation (22 nt in length) has a 100% identity in, ungapped overlap of 13 nt with SEQ ID No 2 (16 nt in length) of the present application. *; | [X]US6258543 (GERDES JOHN C [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5,7 * Probe, Seq ID No 7 of the citation (30 nt in length) corresponds to the region 114 -143 of SEQ ID No 51 relating to GAPDH gene fragment of the present application.; column 3, lines 5-10; table 1 * | International search | [X]JPH07123984 (HITACHI CHEMICAL CO LTD); | [Y]WO9858083 (OHIO MED COLLEGE [US], et al); | [Y]WO0028082 (EIKEN CHEMICAL [JP], et al); | [Y] - DUMOULIN F.L. ET AL., "Semiquantitation of human chemokine mRNA levels with a newly constructed multispecific competitor fragment", J. IMMUNOL. METHODS, (1999), vol. 224, no. 1-2, pages 61 - 67, XP004165510 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0022-1759(99)00009-5 |