EP1475368 - N-CARBAMOYL NITROGEN-CONTAINING FUSED RING COMPOUNDS AND DRUGS CONTAINING THESE COMPOUNDS AS THE ACTIVE INGREDIENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.10.2006 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.10.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.11.2006 [2006/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ONO PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD. 1-5, Doshomachi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-8526 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2004/46] | For all designated states ONO PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD. 1-5, Doshomachi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-8526 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SEKO, Takuya, c/o Ono Pharmaceutical Co. Ltd. 1-5, Doshomachi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-8526 / JP | 02 /
KATSUMATA, Seishi, c/o Minase Research Inst. Ono Pharm. Co. Ltd., 1-1, Sakura 3-ch., Shimamoto-cho Mishima-gun, Osaka 618-8526 / JP | 03 /
KATO, Masashi, c/o Minase Research Institute Ono Pharm. Co. Ltd., 1-1, Sakura 3-ch., Shimamoto-ch Mishima-gun, Osaka 618-8585 / JP | 04 /
MANAKO, Jun-ichiro, c/o Minase Research Inst. Ono Pharm. Co. Ltd., 1-1, Sakurai 3-ch., Shimamoto-cho Mishima-gun, Osaka 618-8585 / JP | 05 /
OHMOTO, Kazuyuki, c/o Minase Research Inst. Ono Pharm. Co. Ltd., 1-1, Sakurai 3-ch., Shimamoto-cho Mishima-gun, Osaka 618-8585 / JP | [2004/46] | Representative(s) | Henkel & Partner mbB Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/46] | Henkel, Feiler & Hänzel Möhlstrasse 37 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03705105.9 | 13.02.2003 | [2004/46] | WO2003JP01481 | Priority number, date | JP20020036340 | 14.02.2002 Original published format: JP 2002036340 | [2004/46] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03068753 | Date: | 21.08.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1475368 | Date: | 10.11.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.08.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 21.08.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.02.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C07D223/16, C07D225/06, C07D401/12, C07D405/12, C07D409/12, C07D413/12, C07D417/12, C07D471/04, C07D495/04, A61K31/395, A61K35/55, A61K31/553, A61P1/00, A61P1/04, A61P1/16, A61P1/18, A61P43/00 | [2004/46] | CPC: |
C07D401/12 (EP,US);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P1/02 (EP);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P1/06 (EP);
A61P1/14 (EP);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P1/18 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P13/00 (EP);
A61P15/00 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/18 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P27/16 (EP);
A61P3/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P5/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
C07D223/16 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/46] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STICKSTOFFHALTIGE N-CARBAMOYLVERBINDUNGEN MIT KONDENSIERTEM RING, UND ARZNEIMITTEL, DIE DIESE VERBINDUNGEN ALS WIRKSTOFF ENTHALTEN | [2004/46] | English: | N-CARBAMOYL NITROGEN-CONTAINING FUSED RING COMPOUNDS AND DRUGS CONTAINING THESE COMPOUNDS AS THE ACTIVE INGREDIENT | [2004/46] | French: | COMPOSES A NOYAU FUSIONNE CONTENANT N-CARBAMOYLE AZOTE ET MEDICAMENTS CONTENANT CES COMPOSES COMME INGREDIENTS ACTIFS | [2004/46] | Entry into regional phase | 13.08.2004 | Translation filed | 13.08.2004 | National basic fee paid | 13.08.2004 | Search fee paid | 13.08.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.08.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.07.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 13.08.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.08.2004 | Examination requested [2004/46] | 11.04.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/45] | 21.06.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2006 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [X]US378321 ; | [A]FR1473839 (ALPHACHIMIE); | [X]US3346565 (EMILIO TESTA, et al); | [X]US3395150 (JOHN KRAPCHO); | [X]US3458498 (KOO CHARLES M C, et al); | [X]GB1193534 (UCB SA [BE]); | [X]US3516987 (KOO CHARLES M C, et al); | [X]US3542760 (KOO CHARLES M C, et al); | [X]US3960876 (CURRAN ADRIAN CHARLES WARD); | [X]US4029667 (CURRAN ADRIAN CHARLES WARD); | [X]WO0132610 (KAKEN PHARMA CO LTD [JP], et al); | [AP]WO03030937 (ONO PHARMACEUTICAL CO [JP], et al); | [X] - KHANNA J.M. ET AL., "Agents acting on the central nervous system. X. 1-Substituted 3-phenyl-2,3,4,5-tetrahydro-1H-1benzazepines", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, (1967), vol. 395, no. 10, pages 944 - 945, XP002968897 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm00317a043 | [X] - ISHIHARA YUJI ET AL., "Regioselective Friedel-Crafts acylation of 1,2,3,4-tetrahydroquinoline and related nitrogen heterocycles: effects of NH protective groups and ring size", J. CHEM. SOC. PERKIN TRANS. 1, (1992), vol. 24, pages 3401 - 3406, XP002968898 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/p19920003401 | [X] - YANAGIDA A. JOSSANG ET AL., "Derivatives of 2,3,4,5-tetrahydro-1H-pyrido(3,2-b)azepine, of 2,3,4,5-tetrahydro-1H-pyrido(2,3-b)azepine and their corresponding lactams. II. Synthesis and pharmacological study on their psychotropic activity", FARMACO, EDIZIONE SCIENTIFICA, (1979), vol. 34, no. 1, pages 26 - 35 | [X] - YANAGIDA A. JOSSANG ET AL., "Derivatives of tetrahydropyrido azepines and tetrahydropyridoazepinones. I. Derivatives of 2,3,4,5-tetrahydro-1H-pyrido(3,2-b)azepine and the corresponding lactam", FARMACO, EDIZIONE SCIENTIFICA, (1978), vol. 33, no. 12, pages 984 - 991, XP002968899 | [X] - BEATTIE, DOREEN E. ET AL., "5,6,7,8-Tetrahydroquinolines. 5. Antiulcer and antisecretory activity of 5,6,7,8-tetrahydroquinolinethioureas and related heterocycles", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, (1977), vol. 20, no. 5, pages 718 - 721, XP002969401 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm00215a020 | [X] - TESTA E. ET AL., "Substances active on the nervous system. XXXVIII. Synthesis of 5-phenyl-3,5-dihydro-4,1-benzoazepin-2(1H)-ones and 5-phenyl.2.3.5-tetrahydro-4,1-benzoxazepines", FARMACO(PAVIA), ED. SCI., (1963), vol. 18, no. 11, pages 815 - 827, XP002969402 | [A] - DODD ROBERT H. ET AL., "Modification of mitochondrial benzodiazepine receptor numbers in stressful situations", PERIPHER. BENZODIAZEPINE RECEPT, (1993), pages 187 - 207, XP002969403 |