EP1475095 - PERCUTANEOUS PREPARATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.01.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.01.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.02.2013 [2013/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KYUKYU PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD. 2-10, Nihonbashi honcho 4-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-0023 / JP | [2007/12] |
Former [2005/35] | For all designated states Astellas Pharma Inc. 3-11, Nihonbashi-Honcho 2-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
For all designated states Kyukyu Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. 2-10, Nihonbashi honcho 4-chome Chuo-ku, Tokyo 103-0023 / JP | |||
Former [2004/46] | For all designated states YAMANOUCHI PHARMACEUTICAL CO. LTD. No. 3-11 Nihonbashi-Honcho, 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8411 / JP | ||
For all designated states Kyukyu Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. 2-10, Nihonbashi honcho 4-chome Chuo-ku, Tokyo 103-0023 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TSUJI, Yasuhiro c/o KYUKYU PHARMACEUT. CO., LTD. 1203, Hibari-goho, Kosugi-machi Imizu-gun, Toyama 939-0351 / JP | 02 /
TAMURA, Kei c/o KYUKYU PHARMACEUT. CO., LTD. 1203, Hibari-goho, Kosugi-machi Imizu-gun, Toyama 939-0351 / JP | 03 /
YAMAZAKI, Yuuhiro c/o KYUKYU PHARMACEUT.CO., LTD. 1203, Hibari-goho, Kosugi-machi Imizu-gun, Toyama 939-0351 / JP | 04 /
SAWAI, Yoshihiro c/o KYUKYU PHARMACEUT.CO., LTD. 1203, Hibari-goho, Kosugi-machi Imizu-gun, Toyama 939-0351 / JP | [2004/46] | Representative(s) | Bates, Philip Ian, et al Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/46] | Bates, Philip Ian, et al Reddie & Grose 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 03705125.7 | 13.02.2003 | [2004/46] | WO2003JP01502 | Priority number, date | JP20020037405 | 14.02.2002 Original published format: JP 2002037405 | JP20020381318 | 27.12.2002 Original published format: JP 2002381318 | [2004/46] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03068241 | Date: | 21.08.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1475095 | Date: | 10.11.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.08.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 21.08.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.06.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/663, A61K9/06, A61K9/08, A61K9/10, A61K9/70, A61K47/04, A61K47/22, A61P3/14, A61P19/08, A61P19/10, A61P43/00 | [2004/46] | CPC: |
A61K9/7053 (EP,US);
A61K31/663 (EP,KR,US);
A61K47/06 (EP,US);
A61K47/22 (EP,US);
A61K47/26 (EP,US);
A61K9/0014 (EP,US);
A61K9/10 (KR);
A61K9/70 (KR);
A61K9/7076 (EP,US);
A61P19/08 (EP);
A61P19/10 (EP);
A61P3/14 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/46] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PERKUTANE ZUBEREITUNGEN | [2004/46] | English: | PERCUTANEOUS PREPARATIONS | [2004/46] | French: | PREPARATIONS PERCUTANEES | [2004/46] | Entry into regional phase | 20.07.2004 | Translation filed | 20.07.2004 | National basic fee paid | 20.07.2004 | Search fee paid | 20.07.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.07.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.06.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 20.07.2004 | Examination requested [2004/46] | 25.10.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.01.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.11.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.03.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.09.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/08] | 08.10.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2013/08] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.01.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 16.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2012 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0600834 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) [X] 1-14 * abstract ** example 2 *; | [X]WO0045795 (CIPLA LIMITED [IN], et al) [X] 1-13 * abstract * * example 6 * * page 5, lines 26-28 * * page 7, lines 10-15 * * page 7, lines 24-26 * * page 8, line 5 * | International search | [X]EP0407344 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]); | [X]JPH0892101 (TEIJIN LTD [US]); | [Y]EP1021194 (ASTRAZENECA AB [SE]) | by applicant | WO0045795 | EP0407344 | EP0600834 | GB1582694 | JPH05201879 |