EP1477971 - OPTICAL RECORDING MEDIUM INITIALIZATION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.07.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.07.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.08.2012 [2012/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2011/03] | For all designated states Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [2004/47] | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KUROKAWA, Kotaro, @SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
YAMASAKI, Takeshi, @SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | 03 /
YUKUMOTO, Tomomi, @SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | 04 /
YAMAMOTO, Masanobu, @SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | 05 /
UEDA, Daisuke, @SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | [2011/38] |
Former [2011/03] | 01 /
KUROKAWA, Kotaro, SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | ||
02 /
YAMASAKI, Takeshi, SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | |||
03 /
YUKUMOTO, Tomomi, SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | |||
04 /
YAMAMOTO, Masanobu, SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | |||
05 /
UEDA, Daisuke, SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | |||
Former [2004/47] | 01 /
KUROKAWA, Kotaro, SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | ||
02 /
YAMASAKI, Takeshi, SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | |||
03 /
YUKUMOTO, Tomomi, SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | |||
04 /
YAMAMOTO, Masanobu, SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | |||
05 /
UEDA, Daisuke, SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | Representative(s) | Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB St.-Martin-Straße 58 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/38] | Müller - Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte Innere Wiener Strasse 17 81667 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/47] | Müller - Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte, Innere Wiener Strasse 17 81667 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03705312.1 | 19.02.2003 | [2004/47] | WO2003JP01771 | Priority number, date | JP20020046487 | 22.02.2002 Original published format: JP 2002046487 | [2004/47] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03071525 | Date: | 28.08.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1477971 | Date: | 17.11.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.08.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1477971 | Date: | 21.09.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 28.08.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.02.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G11B7/0055, G11B7/24, G11B7/26 | [2004/47] | CPC: |
G11B7/26 (EP,KR,US);
G11B7/0055 (KR);
G11B7/242 (KR);
G11B7/268 (EP,US);
G11B7/24038 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB, NL [2010/35] |
Former [2004/47] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, TR | Title | German: | INITIALISIERUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR OPTISCHES AUFZEICHNUNGSMEDIUM | [2004/47] | English: | OPTICAL RECORDING MEDIUM INITIALIZATION METHOD | [2004/47] | French: | PROCEDE SERVANT A INITIALISER UN SUPPORT D'ENREGISTREMENT OPTIQUE | [2004/47] | Entry into regional phase | 21.10.2003 | Translation filed | 21.10.2003 | National basic fee paid | 21.10.2003 | Search fee paid | 21.10.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.10.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.10.2003 | Examination requested [2004/47] | 16.01.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.08.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.12.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 10.12.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.01.2009 | Opposition(s) | 22.06.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5395735 (NAGATA KENICHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-3* column 8, lines 35-51 *; | [E]WO03067582 (SONY CORP [JP], et al) [E] 1 * abstract *; | [L]US2004145999 (KUROKAWA KOTARO [JP], et al) [L] 1 * paragraphs [0014] - [0023]; figure 1 * | International search | [Y]JPH05159299 (FUJI ELECTRIC CO LTD); | [Y]JP2001250265 (SONY CORP); | [AP]JP2002144736 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) | by applicant | JPH05159299 | US5395735 | US2004145999 |