Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2005516450 | Global Dossier | 02.06.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | US5203502 | 16.01.2002 | US0301040 | 14.01.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1468489 | Global Dossier | 15.03.2006 | B1 | EP1468489 | 20.10.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US5203502 | 16.01.2002 | US0301040 | 14.01.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2472125 | 31.07.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US5203502 | 16.01.2002 | US0301040 | 14.01.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE60304028T | 31.08.2006 | T2 | DE60304028D1 | 11.05.2006 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US5203502 | 16.01.2002 | US0301040 | 14.01.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO03063344 | Global Dossier | 18.09.2003 | B1 | WO03063344 | 31.07.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US5203502 | 16.01.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6549072 | 15.04.2003 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US5203502 | 16.01.2002 |