EP1470137 - EDG RECEPTOR AGONISTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.07.2010 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065 / US | [2010/10] |
Former [2009/36] | For all designated states Merck & Co., Inc. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, New Jersey 07065-0907 / US | ||
Former [2004/44] | For all designated states Merck & Co., Inc. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, New Jersey 07065-0907 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BUGIANESI, Robert, L. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065-0907 / US | 02 /
DOHERTY, George, A. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065-0907 / US | 03 /
GENTRY, Amy 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065-0907 / US | 04 /
HALE, Jeffrey, J. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065-0907 / US | 05 /
LYNCH, Christopher, L. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065-0907 / US | 06 /
MILLS, Sander, G. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065-0907 / US | 07 /
NEWAY, William, E., III 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065-0907 / US | [2004/44] | Representative(s) | Buchan, Gavin MacNicol, et al Merck Sharp & Dohme Limited European Patent Department Hertford Road Hoddesdon Hertfordshire EN11 9BU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/48] | Buchan, Gavin MacNicol, et al Merck & Co., Inc. European Patent Department Merck Sharp & Dohme Limited, Hertford Road, Hoddesdon Hertfordshire, EN11 9BU / GB | ||
Former [2004/44] | Buchan, Gavin MacNicol Merck & Co., Inc., European Patent Department, Terlings Park, Eastwick Road Harlow, Essex CM20 2QR / GB | Application number, filing date | 03705779.1 | 15.01.2003 | [2004/44] | WO2003US01196 | Priority number, date | US20020350000P | 18.01.2002 Original published format: US 350000 P | [2004/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03062252 | Date: | 31.07.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1470137 | Date: | 27.10.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.07.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1470137 | Date: | 02.09.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 31.07.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.04.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C07F9/38, C07F9/572, C07F9/6558, C07D205/04, C07D207/16, C07D403/04, C07D403/12, C07D405/12, C07D409/12, C07D413/10, C07D413/14, A61K31/397, A61K31/40, A61P9/00, A61P21/00 | [2005/24] | CPC: |
C07D403/04 (EP,US);
A61P1/02 (EP);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P11/02 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/04 (EP);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P17/14 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P19/10 (EP);
A61P21/00 (EP);
A61P21/04 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/06 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P27/12 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P31/14 (EP);
A61P31/20 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/04 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
A61P5/14 (EP);
A61P7/06 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/04 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
C07D205/04 (EP,US);
C07D207/16 (EP,US);
C07D403/12 (EP,US);
C07D405/12 (EP,US);
C07D409/12 (EP,US);
C07D413/10 (EP,US);
C07D413/14 (EP,US);
C07F9/572 (EP,US);
C07F9/65586 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2004/44] | C07F9/38 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/44] | Extension states | AL | 18.08.2004 | LT | 18.08.2004 | LV | 18.08.2004 | MK | 18.08.2004 | RO | 18.08.2004 | Title | German: | EDG-REZEPTORAGONISTEN | [2004/44] | English: | EDG RECEPTOR AGONISTS | [2004/44] | French: | AGONISTES DU RECEPTEUR EDG | [2004/44] | Entry into regional phase | 18.08.2004 | National basic fee paid | 18.08.2004 | Search fee paid | 18.08.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.08.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.08.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 15.07.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.08.2004 | Examination requested [2004/44] | 18.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.09.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.01.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.04.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.07.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 24.07.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.09.2009 | BE | 02.09.2009 | BG | 02.09.2009 | CY | 02.09.2009 | CZ | 02.09.2009 | DK | 02.09.2009 | EE | 02.09.2009 | FI | 02.09.2009 | IT | 02.09.2009 | NL | 02.09.2009 | SE | 02.09.2009 | SI | 02.09.2009 | SK | 02.09.2009 | TR | 02.09.2009 | GR | 03.12.2009 | ES | 13.12.2009 | PT | 04.01.2010 | IE | 15.01.2010 | LU | 15.01.2010 | MC | 31.01.2010 | HU | 03.03.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/43] | AT | 02.09.2009 | |
BE | 02.09.2009 | ||
BG | 02.09.2009 | ||
CY | 02.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 02.09.2009 | ||
DK | 02.09.2009 | ||
EE | 02.09.2009 | ||
FI | 02.09.2009 | ||
IT | 02.09.2009 | ||
NL | 02.09.2009 | ||
SE | 02.09.2009 | ||
SI | 02.09.2009 | ||
SK | 02.09.2009 | ||
GR | 03.12.2009 | ||
ES | 13.12.2009 | ||
PT | 04.01.2010 | ||
IE | 15.01.2010 | ||
LU | 15.01.2010 | ||
MC | 31.01.2010 | ||
HU | 03.03.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 02.09.2009 | |
BE | 02.09.2009 | ||
BG | 02.09.2009 | ||
CY | 02.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 02.09.2009 | ||
DK | 02.09.2009 | ||
EE | 02.09.2009 | ||
FI | 02.09.2009 | ||
IT | 02.09.2009 | ||
NL | 02.09.2009 | ||
SE | 02.09.2009 | ||
SI | 02.09.2009 | ||
SK | 02.09.2009 | ||
GR | 03.12.2009 | ||
ES | 13.12.2009 | ||
PT | 04.01.2010 | ||
IE | 15.01.2010 | ||
MC | 31.01.2010 | ||
HU | 03.03.2010 | ||
Former [2012/41] | AT | 02.09.2009 | |
BE | 02.09.2009 | ||
BG | 02.09.2009 | ||
CY | 02.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 02.09.2009 | ||
DK | 02.09.2009 | ||
EE | 02.09.2009 | ||
FI | 02.09.2009 | ||
IT | 02.09.2009 | ||
NL | 02.09.2009 | ||
SE | 02.09.2009 | ||
SI | 02.09.2009 | ||
SK | 02.09.2009 | ||
GR | 03.12.2009 | ||
ES | 13.12.2009 | ||
PT | 04.01.2010 | ||
IE | 15.01.2010 | ||
MC | 31.01.2010 | ||
Former [2011/14] | AT | 02.09.2009 | |
BE | 02.09.2009 | ||
CY | 02.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 02.09.2009 | ||
DK | 02.09.2009 | ||
EE | 02.09.2009 | ||
FI | 02.09.2009 | ||
IT | 02.09.2009 | ||
NL | 02.09.2009 | ||
SE | 02.09.2009 | ||
SI | 02.09.2009 | ||
SK | 02.09.2009 | ||
GR | 03.12.2009 | ||
ES | 13.12.2009 | ||
PT | 04.01.2010 | ||
IE | 15.01.2010 | ||
MC | 31.01.2010 | ||
Former [2011/07] | AT | 02.09.2009 | |
BE | 02.09.2009 | ||
CY | 02.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 02.09.2009 | ||
DK | 02.09.2009 | ||
EE | 02.09.2009 | ||
FI | 02.09.2009 | ||
NL | 02.09.2009 | ||
SE | 02.09.2009 | ||
SI | 02.09.2009 | ||
SK | 02.09.2009 | ||
GR | 03.12.2009 | ||
ES | 13.12.2009 | ||
PT | 04.01.2010 | ||
IE | 15.01.2010 | ||
MC | 31.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/48] | AT | 02.09.2009 | |
BE | 02.09.2009 | ||
CY | 02.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 02.09.2009 | ||
DK | 02.09.2009 | ||
EE | 02.09.2009 | ||
FI | 02.09.2009 | ||
NL | 02.09.2009 | ||
SE | 02.09.2009 | ||
SI | 02.09.2009 | ||
SK | 02.09.2009 | ||
GR | 03.12.2009 | ||
ES | 13.12.2009 | ||
PT | 04.01.2010 | ||
MC | 31.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/37] | AT | 02.09.2009 | |
BE | 02.09.2009 | ||
CY | 02.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 02.09.2009 | ||
DK | 02.09.2009 | ||
EE | 02.09.2009 | ||
FI | 02.09.2009 | ||
NL | 02.09.2009 | ||
SE | 02.09.2009 | ||
SI | 02.09.2009 | ||
SK | 02.09.2009 | ||
ES | 13.12.2009 | ||
PT | 04.01.2010 | ||
MC | 31.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/35] | AT | 02.09.2009 | |
BE | 02.09.2009 | ||
CY | 02.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 02.09.2009 | ||
DK | 02.09.2009 | ||
EE | 02.09.2009 | ||
FI | 02.09.2009 | ||
NL | 02.09.2009 | ||
SE | 02.09.2009 | ||
SI | 02.09.2009 | ||
SK | 02.09.2009 | ||
ES | 13.12.2009 | ||
PT | 04.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/30] | AT | 02.09.2009 | |
BE | 02.09.2009 | ||
CY | 02.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 02.09.2009 | ||
EE | 02.09.2009 | ||
FI | 02.09.2009 | ||
NL | 02.09.2009 | ||
SE | 02.09.2009 | ||
SI | 02.09.2009 | ||
SK | 02.09.2009 | ||
ES | 13.12.2009 | ||
PT | 04.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/28] | BE | 02.09.2009 | |
CY | 02.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 02.09.2009 | ||
EE | 02.09.2009 | ||
FI | 02.09.2009 | ||
NL | 02.09.2009 | ||
SE | 02.09.2009 | ||
SI | 02.09.2009 | ||
SK | 02.09.2009 | ||
ES | 13.12.2009 | ||
PT | 04.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/24] | CY | 02.09.2009 | |
CZ | 02.09.2009 | ||
EE | 02.09.2009 | ||
FI | 02.09.2009 | ||
NL | 02.09.2009 | ||
SE | 02.09.2009 | ||
SI | 02.09.2009 | ||
SK | 02.09.2009 | ||
ES | 13.12.2009 | ||
PT | 04.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/22] | CY | 02.09.2009 | |
CZ | 02.09.2009 | ||
EE | 02.09.2009 | ||
FI | 02.09.2009 | ||
NL | 02.09.2009 | ||
SE | 02.09.2009 | ||
SI | 02.09.2009 | ||
ES | 13.12.2009 | ||
PT | 04.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/20] | CY | 02.09.2009 | |
EE | 02.09.2009 | ||
FI | 02.09.2009 | ||
NL | 02.09.2009 | ||
SE | 02.09.2009 | ||
SI | 02.09.2009 | ||
ES | 13.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/19] | CY | 02.09.2009 | |
FI | 02.09.2009 | ||
NL | 02.09.2009 | ||
SE | 02.09.2009 | ||
SI | 02.09.2009 | ||
ES | 13.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/16] | CY | 02.09.2009 | |
FI | 02.09.2009 | ||
NL | 02.09.2009 | ||
SE | 02.09.2009 | ||
SI | 02.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/11] | FI | 02.09.2009 | |
NL | 02.09.2009 | ||
SE | 02.09.2009 | ||
SI | 02.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/10] | FI | 02.09.2009 | |
NL | 02.09.2009 | ||
SE | 02.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/09] | FI | 02.09.2009 | |
SE | 02.09.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [DA] - IM D-S ET AL, "CHARACTERIZATION OF A NOVEL SPHINGOSINE 1-PHOSPHATE RECEPTOR, EDG-8", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN SOCIETY OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTS, BALTIMORE, MD, US, (20000512), vol. 275, no. 19, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 14281 - 14286, XP000939039 [DA] 1-39 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.275.19.14281 | International search | [AP]US2002042443 (DAY WESLEY W [US], et al) | by applicant | - Protecting Groups in Organic Synthesis, JOHN WILEY & SONS, INC. | - LAROCK, Comprehensive Organic Transformations, A Guide to Functional Group Preparations, VCH PUBLISHERS, INC. |