EP1497115 - DURABLE, LIQUID IMPERMEABLE AND MOISTURE VAPOR PERMEABLE CARPET PAD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.06.2017 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Invista Technologies S.à.r.l. Zweigniederlassung St. Gallen Kreuzackerstrasse 9 9000 St. Gallen / CH | [2012/33] |
Former [2011/03] | For all designated states Invista Technologies S.A R.L. Zweigniederlassung St. Gallen Pestalozzistrasse 2 9000 St. Gallen / CH | ||
Former [2008/14] | For all designated states INVISTA Technologies S.à.r.l. Talstrasse 80 8001 Zürich / CH | ||
Former [2005/10] | For all designated states INVISTA Technologies S.à.r.l. Intellectual Property Record Center Three Little Falls Centre - Room Number 1052 2801 Centerville Road Wilmington, DE 19808 / US | ||
Former [2005/03] | For all designated states Invista Technologies S.à.r.l. Intellectual Property Record Center, 4417 Lancaster Pike, CRP 722/1032 Wilmington, DE 19805 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VINOD, Yashavant, Vinayak 6 Farm House Circle Hockessin, DE 19707 / US | [2005/03] | Representative(s) | Cockerton, Bruce Roger, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2016/31] |
Former [2009/30] | Cockerton, Bruce Roger, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | ||
Former [2005/03] | Cockerton, Bruce Roger, et al Carpmaels & Ransford, 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 03705939.1 | 27.01.2003 | [2005/03] | WO2003US02466 | Priority number, date | US20020124168 | 17.04.2002 Original published format: US 124168 | [2005/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03089236 | Date: | 30.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1497115 | Date: | 19.01.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.10.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1497115 | Date: | 03.08.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 30.10.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.05.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B32B9/04, B32B27/00, B32B27/40, B32B13/04, B32B13/12, B32B27/08, B32B27/36, B32B5/00, A47G27/04, D06N7/00 | [2007/26] | CPC: |
A47G27/0468 (EP,US);
B32B27/08 (EP,US);
D06N7/0089 (EP,US);
Y10T428/26 (EP,US);
Y10T428/264 (EP,US);
Y10T428/265 (EP,US);
Y10T428/269 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31511 (EP,US);
Y10T428/3154 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31547 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31551 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31663 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2005/03] | B32B9/04, B32B27/00, B32B27/40, B32B13/04, B32B13/12, B32B27/08, B32B27/36, B32B5/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/31] |
Former [2005/03] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | WIDERSTANDSFÄHIGE, FLÜSSIGKEITSUNDURCHLÄSSIGE UND WASSERDAMPFDURCHLÄSSIGE TEPPICHUNTERLAGE | [2005/03] | English: | DURABLE, LIQUID IMPERMEABLE AND MOISTURE VAPOR PERMEABLE CARPET PAD | [2005/03] | French: | TAPIS MOQUETTE SUR THIBAUDE DURABLE, IMPERMEABLE AU LIQUIDE ET PERMEABLE A LA VAPEUR D'EAU | [2005/03] | Entry into regional phase | 18.10.2004 | National basic fee paid | 18.10.2004 | Search fee paid | 18.10.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.10.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.10.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 18.10.2004 | Examination requested [2005/03] | 24.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.08.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.01.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.09.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 29.11.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.02.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.06.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 22.06.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.06.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.03.2009 | Opposition(s) | 04.05.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/28] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 29.11.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 29.11.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 28.01.2013 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 11.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 10.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 21.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 13.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 11.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Rights in Rem or Legal Means of Execution | deleted | [2012/32] |
Former [2005/44] | ID: | 01 | |
For: | AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR | ||
Date: | 23.08.2005 | ||
[2012/32] | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.01.2003 | AT | 03.08.2016 | CY | 03.08.2016 | CZ | 03.08.2016 | DK | 03.08.2016 | EE | 03.08.2016 | ES | 03.08.2016 | FI | 03.08.2016 | IT | 03.08.2016 | MC | 03.08.2016 | SE | 03.08.2016 | SI | 03.08.2016 | SK | 03.08.2016 | TR | 03.08.2016 | BG | 03.11.2016 | GR | 04.11.2016 | PT | 05.12.2016 | IE | 27.01.2017 | LU | 27.01.2017 | CH | 31.01.2017 | FR | 31.01.2017 | LI | 31.01.2017 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/46] | HU | 27.01.2003 | |
AT | 03.08.2016 | ||
CY | 03.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2016 | ||
DK | 03.08.2016 | ||
EE | 03.08.2016 | ||
ES | 03.08.2016 | ||
FI | 03.08.2016 | ||
IT | 03.08.2016 | ||
MC | 03.08.2016 | ||
SE | 03.08.2016 | ||
SI | 03.08.2016 | ||
SK | 03.08.2016 | ||
BG | 03.11.2016 | ||
GR | 04.11.2016 | ||
PT | 05.12.2016 | ||
IE | 27.01.2017 | ||
LU | 27.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
FR | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 27.01.2003 | |
AT | 03.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2016 | ||
DK | 03.08.2016 | ||
EE | 03.08.2016 | ||
ES | 03.08.2016 | ||
FI | 03.08.2016 | ||
IT | 03.08.2016 | ||
MC | 03.08.2016 | ||
SE | 03.08.2016 | ||
SI | 03.08.2016 | ||
SK | 03.08.2016 | ||
BG | 03.11.2016 | ||
GR | 04.11.2016 | ||
PT | 05.12.2016 | ||
IE | 27.01.2017 | ||
LU | 27.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
FR | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | AT | 03.08.2016 | |
CZ | 03.08.2016 | ||
DK | 03.08.2016 | ||
EE | 03.08.2016 | ||
ES | 03.08.2016 | ||
FI | 03.08.2016 | ||
IT | 03.08.2016 | ||
MC | 03.08.2016 | ||
SE | 03.08.2016 | ||
SI | 03.08.2016 | ||
SK | 03.08.2016 | ||
BG | 03.11.2016 | ||
GR | 04.11.2016 | ||
PT | 05.12.2016 | ||
IE | 27.01.2017 | ||
LU | 27.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
FR | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 03.08.2016 | |
CZ | 03.08.2016 | ||
DK | 03.08.2016 | ||
EE | 03.08.2016 | ||
ES | 03.08.2016 | ||
FI | 03.08.2016 | ||
IT | 03.08.2016 | ||
MC | 03.08.2016 | ||
SE | 03.08.2016 | ||
SI | 03.08.2016 | ||
SK | 03.08.2016 | ||
BG | 03.11.2016 | ||
GR | 04.11.2016 | ||
PT | 05.12.2016 | ||
LU | 27.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
FR | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 03.08.2016 | |
CZ | 03.08.2016 | ||
DK | 03.08.2016 | ||
EE | 03.08.2016 | ||
ES | 03.08.2016 | ||
FI | 03.08.2016 | ||
IT | 03.08.2016 | ||
MC | 03.08.2016 | ||
SE | 03.08.2016 | ||
SI | 03.08.2016 | ||
SK | 03.08.2016 | ||
BG | 03.11.2016 | ||
GR | 04.11.2016 | ||
PT | 05.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
FR | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/45] | AT | 03.08.2016 | |
CZ | 03.08.2016 | ||
DK | 03.08.2016 | ||
EE | 03.08.2016 | ||
ES | 03.08.2016 | ||
FI | 03.08.2016 | ||
IT | 03.08.2016 | ||
MC | 03.08.2016 | ||
SE | 03.08.2016 | ||
SI | 03.08.2016 | ||
SK | 03.08.2016 | ||
BG | 03.11.2016 | ||
GR | 04.11.2016 | ||
PT | 05.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/41] | AT | 03.08.2016 | |
CZ | 03.08.2016 | ||
DK | 03.08.2016 | ||
EE | 03.08.2016 | ||
ES | 03.08.2016 | ||
FI | 03.08.2016 | ||
IT | 03.08.2016 | ||
SE | 03.08.2016 | ||
SI | 03.08.2016 | ||
SK | 03.08.2016 | ||
BG | 03.11.2016 | ||
GR | 04.11.2016 | ||
PT | 05.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 03.08.2016 | |
CZ | 03.08.2016 | ||
DK | 03.08.2016 | ||
EE | 03.08.2016 | ||
ES | 03.08.2016 | ||
FI | 03.08.2016 | ||
IT | 03.08.2016 | ||
SE | 03.08.2016 | ||
SI | 03.08.2016 | ||
SK | 03.08.2016 | ||
BG | 03.11.2016 | ||
GR | 04.11.2016 | ||
PT | 05.12.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/32] | AT | 03.08.2016 | |
CZ | 03.08.2016 | ||
DK | 03.08.2016 | ||
EE | 03.08.2016 | ||
ES | 03.08.2016 | ||
FI | 03.08.2016 | ||
IT | 03.08.2016 | ||
SE | 03.08.2016 | ||
SK | 03.08.2016 | ||
BG | 03.11.2016 | ||
GR | 04.11.2016 | ||
PT | 05.12.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 03.08.2016 | |
ES | 03.08.2016 | ||
FI | 03.08.2016 | ||
IT | 03.08.2016 | ||
SE | 03.08.2016 | ||
GR | 04.11.2016 | ||
PT | 05.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 03.08.2016 | |
IT | 03.08.2016 | ||
SE | 03.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 03.08.2016 | |
IT | 03.08.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2000160818 (HAYASHI GIJUTSU KENKYUSHO KK) [X] 1-21* abstract *; | [X]JP2000265649 (TOMOE KOGYO KK, et al) [X] 1-21 * abstract *; | [DX]WO0127382 (DU PONT [US]) [DX] 1-13 * page 3, lines 20-26 * * page 7, line 4 - page 8, line 16; claims 1-7 * | International search | [X]US5558916 (HEIM WILLIAM W [US], et al); | [X]US6253526 (MURPHY PETER MICHAEL [US], et al) |