EP1470595 - METHOD FOR PRETREATING A PIEZOELECTRIC CERAMIC AND METHOD FOR ADJUSTING AN INJECTION VALVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.11.2011 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.11.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.12.2011 [2011/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/43] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/44] | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VOIGT, Andreas Goethestr. 36 93133 Burglengenfeld / DE | 02 /
GOLLER, Matthias Goethestrasse 15c 93077 Bad Abbach / DE | 03 /
KOHN, Stefan Adertshausen 13 92277 Hohenburg / DE | 04 /
REISINGER, Wolfgang Zollerstr. 8 93053 Regensburg / DE | 05 /
ZUMSTRULL, Claus Zum Vogelherd 3 93128 Regenstauf / DE | [2011/51] |
Former [2004/44] | 01 /
VOIGT, Andreas Liebigstr. 27 93055 Regensburg / DE | ||
02 /
GOLLER, Matthias Goethestrasse 15c 93077 Bad Abbach / DE | |||
03 /
KOHN, Stefan Adertshausen 13 92277 Hohenburg / DE | |||
04 /
REISINGER, Wolfgang Zollerstr. 8 93053 Regensburg / DE | |||
05 /
ZUMSTRULL, Claus Zum Vogelherd 3 93128 Regenstauf / DE | Application number, filing date | 03706272.6 | 30.01.2003 | [2004/44] | WO2003DE00262 | Priority number, date | DE2002104047 | 01.02.2002 Original published format: DE 10204047 | [2004/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03065468 | Date: | 07.08.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/32] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1470595 | Date: | 27.10.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.08.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1470595 | Date: | 26.10.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.04.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H01L41/24, F02M51/06 | [2004/44] | CPC: |
F02M47/027 (EP,US);
F02M51/0603 (EP,US);
F02M63/0026 (EP,US);
H10N30/045 (EP,US);
F02M2200/701 (EP,US);
F02M2200/8092 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB, IT [2005/43] |
Former [2004/44] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM VORBEHANDELN EINER PIEZOELEKTRISCHEN KERAMIK UND VERFAHREN ZUM JUSTIEREN EINES EINSPRITZVENTILS | [2004/44] | English: | METHOD FOR PRETREATING A PIEZOELECTRIC CERAMIC AND METHOD FOR ADJUSTING AN INJECTION VALVE | [2004/44] | French: | PROCEDE DE PRETRAITEMENT D'UNE CERAMIQUE PIEZOELECTRIQUE ET PROCEDE D'AJUSTAGE D'UNE SOUPAPE D'INJECTION | [2004/44] | Entry into regional phase | 16.07.2004 | National basic fee paid | 16.07.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.07.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.08.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 16.07.2004 | Examination requested [2004/44] | 06.12.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.03.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.04.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.08.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 22.08.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.07.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/40] | 27.07.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/51] | 27.07.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2007/45] |
Former [2007/40] | IT | 26.10.2005 | Cited in | International search | [X]JPH06151996 ; | [XA]DE1646551 (GEN ELECTRIC); | [XY]EP0485995 (NEC CORP [JP]); | JPH06151996 [ ] (NEC CORP); | [X]DE19619319 (UFERMANN RUEDIGER [DE]); | [Y]WO9931739 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al); | [XA]DE19902807 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | [XA]DE10039641 (MURATA MANUFACTURING CO [JP]); | [A]WO0123736 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al); | [PX]DE10028335 (EPCOS AG [DE]) |