EP1484988 - PRODUCTION OF FOODSTUFFS WITH A FILLING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.05.2008 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 15.09.2010 [2010/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nienstedt GmbH Recklinghäuser Strasse 90-92 45721 Haltern / DE | [2004/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GRONEBERG-NIENSTEDT, Petra Freytagstrasse 44 40237 Düsseldorf / DE | [2004/51] | Representative(s) | Cohausz, Helge B. Cohausz Hannig Borkowski Wissgott Patentanwaltskanzlei GbR Schumannstrasse 97-99 40237 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/51] | Cohausz, Helge B., Dipl.-Ing. Cohausz Dawidowicz Hannig & Partner Schumannstrasse 97-99 40237 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 03706371.6 | 23.01.2003 | [2004/51] | WO2003EP00640 | Priority number, date | DE2002112456 | 20.03.2002 Original published format: DE 10212456 | DE2002147283 | 10.10.2002 Original published format: DE 10247283 | [2004/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03077682 | Date: | 25.09.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1484988 | Date: | 15.12.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.09.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1484988 | Date: | 18.07.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.09.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A23L1/31, A23P1/08 | [2004/51] | CPC: |
A23L17/75 (EP,US);
A23L13/03 (EP,US);
A23L13/55 (EP,US);
A23L13/57 (EP,US);
A23P20/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/51] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HERSTELLEN VON LEBENSMITTELN MIT FÜLLUNG | [2004/51] | English: | PRODUCTION OF FOODSTUFFS WITH A FILLING | [2004/51] | French: | PRODUCTION DE PRODUITS ALIMENTAIRES FOURRES | [2004/51] | Entry into regional phase | 14.08.2004 | National basic fee paid | 14.08.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.08.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.08.2004 | Examination requested [2004/51] | 17.01.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.04.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 19.04.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.04.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 18.07.2007 | CZ | 18.07.2007 | FI | 18.07.2007 | SI | 18.07.2007 | SK | 18.07.2007 | TR | 18.07.2007 | BG | 18.10.2007 | SE | 18.10.2007 | GR | 19.10.2007 | PT | 18.12.2007 | HU | 19.01.2008 | AT | 23.01.2008 | LU | 23.01.2008 | BE | 31.01.2008 | CH | 31.01.2008 | LI | 31.01.2008 | MC | 31.01.2008 | [2010/37] |
Former [2010/34] | CY | 18.07.2007 | |
CZ | 18.07.2007 | ||
FI | 18.07.2007 | ||
SI | 18.07.2007 | ||
SK | 18.07.2007 | ||
BG | 18.10.2007 | ||
SE | 18.10.2007 | ||
GR | 19.10.2007 | ||
PT | 18.12.2007 | ||
HU | 19.01.2008 | ||
AT | 23.01.2008 | ||
LU | 23.01.2008 | ||
BE | 31.01.2008 | ||
CH | 31.01.2008 | ||
LI | 31.01.2008 | ||
MC | 31.01.2008 | ||
Former [2010/32] | CY | 18.07.2007 | |
CZ | 18.07.2007 | ||
FI | 18.07.2007 | ||
SI | 18.07.2007 | ||
SK | 18.07.2007 | ||
BG | 18.10.2007 | ||
SE | 18.10.2007 | ||
GR | 19.10.2007 | ||
PT | 18.12.2007 | ||
AT | 23.01.2008 | ||
LU | 23.01.2008 | ||
BE | 31.01.2008 | ||
CH | 31.01.2008 | ||
LI | 31.01.2008 | ||
MC | 31.01.2008 | ||
Former [2009/34] | CY | 18.07.2007 | |
CZ | 18.07.2007 | ||
FI | 18.07.2007 | ||
SI | 18.07.2007 | ||
SK | 18.07.2007 | ||
BG | 18.10.2007 | ||
SE | 18.10.2007 | ||
GR | 19.10.2007 | ||
PT | 18.12.2007 | ||
AT | 23.01.2008 | ||
BE | 31.01.2008 | ||
CH | 31.01.2008 | ||
LI | 31.01.2008 | ||
MC | 31.01.2008 | ||
Former [2009/29] | CZ | 18.07.2007 | |
FI | 18.07.2007 | ||
SI | 18.07.2007 | ||
SK | 18.07.2007 | ||
BG | 18.10.2007 | ||
SE | 18.10.2007 | ||
GR | 19.10.2007 | ||
PT | 18.12.2007 | ||
AT | 23.01.2008 | ||
BE | 31.01.2008 | ||
CH | 31.01.2008 | ||
LI | 31.01.2008 | ||
MC | 31.01.2008 | ||
Former [2009/23] | CZ | 18.07.2007 | |
FI | 18.07.2007 | ||
SK | 18.07.2007 | ||
BG | 18.10.2007 | ||
SE | 18.10.2007 | ||
GR | 19.10.2007 | ||
PT | 18.12.2007 | ||
AT | 23.01.2008 | ||
BE | 31.01.2008 | ||
CH | 31.01.2008 | ||
LI | 31.01.2008 | ||
MC | 31.01.2008 | ||
Former [2009/14] | CZ | 18.07.2007 | |
FI | 18.07.2007 | ||
SK | 18.07.2007 | ||
BG | 18.10.2007 | ||
SE | 18.10.2007 | ||
GR | 19.10.2007 | ||
PT | 18.12.2007 | ||
BE | 31.01.2008 | ||
CH | 31.01.2008 | ||
LI | 31.01.2008 | ||
MC | 31.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | CZ | 18.07.2007 | |
FI | 18.07.2007 | ||
SK | 18.07.2007 | ||
BG | 18.10.2007 | ||
SE | 18.10.2007 | ||
GR | 19.10.2007 | ||
PT | 18.12.2007 | ||
CH | 31.01.2008 | ||
LI | 31.01.2008 | ||
MC | 31.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/40] | CZ | 18.07.2007 | |
FI | 18.07.2007 | ||
SK | 18.07.2007 | ||
BG | 18.10.2007 | ||
SE | 18.10.2007 | ||
GR | 19.10.2007 | ||
PT | 18.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/28] | CZ | 18.07.2007 | |
FI | 18.07.2007 | ||
SK | 18.07.2007 | ||
BG | 18.10.2007 | ||
SE | 18.10.2007 | ||
GR | 19.10.2007 | ||
PT | 18.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/25] | CZ | 18.07.2007 | |
FI | 18.07.2007 | ||
SK | 18.07.2007 | ||
BG | 18.10.2007 | ||
GR | 19.10.2007 | ||
PT | 18.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | FI | 18.07.2007 | |
BG | 18.10.2007 | ||
GR | 19.10.2007 | ||
PT | 18.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/10] | FI | 18.07.2007 | |
BG | 18.10.2007 | ||
PT | 18.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | BG | 18.10.2007 | Cited in | International search | [A]FR2145730 (GORTON CORP) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US4474823 (NISHIKAWA KENJIRO [JP], et al); | [A]WO9500043 (UNIFROST GMBH [AT]); | [A]DE19753027 (WHITEHOUSE JOHN A [GB]); | [DA]DE19806391 (NIENSTEDT HEINZ MASCHF [DE]) [DA] 1-7 * figure .; claim - *; | [A]DE29823878U (NIENSTEDT HEINZ MASCHF [DE]) |