EP1483918 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR LAYERED VIDEO ENCODING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 07.09.2007 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.09.2007 | Withdrawal of application | published on 10.10.2007 [2007/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2004/50] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAN DER SCHAAR, Mihaela c/o Prof . Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
KALLURI, Rama c/o Prof . Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [2004/50] | Representative(s) | Groenendaal, Antonius W. M. Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2004/50] | Groenendaal, Antonius Wilhelmus Maria Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 03706790.7 | 04.03.2003 | [2004/50] | WO2003IB00789 | Priority number, date | US20020362592P | 05.03.2002 Original published format: US 362592 P | US20020434055P | 17.12.2002 Original published format: US 434055 P | [2004/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03075579 | Date: | 12.09.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/37] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1483918 | Date: | 08.12.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.09.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.12.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/26, H04N7/50 | [2004/50] | CPC: |
H04N19/34 (EP);
H04N19/30 (KR);
H04N19/119 (EP);
H04N19/17 (EP);
H04N19/46 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/50] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR SCHICHTVIDEOKODIERUNG | [2004/50] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR LAYERED VIDEO ENCODING | [2004/50] | French: | PROCEDE ET SYSTEME POUR LE CODAGE DE PLANS DE MEMOIRE D'IMAGE FRACTIONNELS | [2004/50] | Entry into regional phase | 05.10.2004 | National basic fee paid | 05.10.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.10.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.10.2004 | Examination requested [2004/50] | 27.08.2007 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2007/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]WO9949412 (UNIV MARYLAND [US], et al); | [A]US2001016008 (BAHL PARAMVIR [US], et al); | [A]WO0191454 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]); | [A]US2002006161 (VAN DER SCHAAR MIHAELA [US], et al); | [PA]US2002080878 (LI WEIPING [US]); |