EP1500123 - A DEVICE FOR GENERATING X-RAYS HAVING A HEAT ABSORBING MEMBER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.11.2009 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HU
IE
IT
LI
LU
MC
NL
PT
RO
SE
SK
TR
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | For:DE
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Steindamm 94 20099 Hamburg / DE | [2009/03] |
Former [2005/04] | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HU
IE
IT
LI
LU
MC
NL
PT
RO
SE
SK
TR
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | ||
For:DE
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Steindamm 94 20099 Hamburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BATHE, Christoph, H. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
CHROST, Wolfgang Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [2005/04] | Representative(s) | Wolfs, Marc Johannes Maria Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2005/04] | Wolfs, Marc Johannes Maria Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 03706811.1 | 10.03.2003 | [2005/04] | WO2003IB00903 | Priority number, date | EP20020076302 | 02.04.2002 Original published format: EP 02076302 | [2005/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03083891 | Date: | 09.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1500123 | Date: | 26.01.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.10.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1500123 | Date: | 14.01.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.10.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H01J35/10 | [2005/04] | CPC: |
H01J35/106 (EP,US);
H05G1/025 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/04] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR ERZEUGUNG VON RÖNTGENSTRAHLUNG MIT WÄRMEABSORBIERENDEM BAUTEIL | [2005/04] | English: | A DEVICE FOR GENERATING X-RAYS HAVING A HEAT ABSORBING MEMBER | [2005/04] | French: | DISPOSITIF SERVANT A GENERER DES RAYONS X POURVU D'UN ELEMENT ANTICALORIFIQUE | [2005/04] | Entry into regional phase | 02.11.2004 | National basic fee paid | 02.11.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.11.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.11.2004 | Examination requested [2005/04] | 10.07.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.10.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 30.10.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.10.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 14.01.2009 | BE | 14.01.2009 | CY | 14.01.2009 | CZ | 14.01.2009 | DK | 14.01.2009 | EE | 14.01.2009 | FI | 14.01.2009 | IT | 14.01.2009 | NL | 14.01.2009 | RO | 14.01.2009 | SI | 14.01.2009 | SK | 14.01.2009 | TR | 14.01.2009 | IE | 10.03.2009 | LU | 10.03.2009 | CH | 31.03.2009 | LI | 31.03.2009 | MC | 31.03.2009 | BG | 14.04.2009 | GB | 14.04.2009 | SE | 14.04.2009 | GR | 15.04.2009 | ES | 25.04.2009 | PT | 15.06.2009 | HU | 15.07.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/31] | AT | 14.01.2009 | |
BE | 14.01.2009 | ||
CZ | 14.01.2009 | ||
DK | 14.01.2009 | ||
EE | 14.01.2009 | ||
FI | 14.01.2009 | ||
IT | 14.01.2009 | ||
NL | 14.01.2009 | ||
RO | 14.01.2009 | ||
SI | 14.01.2009 | ||
SK | 14.01.2009 | ||
IE | 10.03.2009 | ||
LU | 10.03.2009 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
BG | 14.04.2009 | ||
GB | 14.04.2009 | ||
SE | 14.04.2009 | ||
GR | 15.04.2009 | ||
ES | 25.04.2009 | ||
PT | 15.06.2009 | ||
HU | 15.07.2009 | ||
Former [2011/21] | AT | 14.01.2009 | |
BE | 14.01.2009 | ||
CZ | 14.01.2009 | ||
DK | 14.01.2009 | ||
EE | 14.01.2009 | ||
FI | 14.01.2009 | ||
IT | 14.01.2009 | ||
NL | 14.01.2009 | ||
RO | 14.01.2009 | ||
SI | 14.01.2009 | ||
SK | 14.01.2009 | ||
IE | 10.03.2009 | ||
LU | 10.03.2009 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
BG | 14.04.2009 | ||
GB | 14.04.2009 | ||
SE | 14.04.2009 | ||
GR | 15.04.2009 | ||
ES | 25.04.2009 | ||
PT | 15.06.2009 | ||
Former [2011/14] | AT | 14.01.2009 | |
BE | 14.01.2009 | ||
CZ | 14.01.2009 | ||
DK | 14.01.2009 | ||
EE | 14.01.2009 | ||
FI | 14.01.2009 | ||
IT | 14.01.2009 | ||
NL | 14.01.2009 | ||
RO | 14.01.2009 | ||
SI | 14.01.2009 | ||
SK | 14.01.2009 | ||
IE | 10.03.2009 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
BG | 14.04.2009 | ||
GB | 14.04.2009 | ||
SE | 14.04.2009 | ||
GR | 15.04.2009 | ||
ES | 25.04.2009 | ||
PT | 15.06.2009 | ||
Former [2010/48] | AT | 14.01.2009 | |
BE | 14.01.2009 | ||
CZ | 14.01.2009 | ||
DK | 14.01.2009 | ||
EE | 14.01.2009 | ||
FI | 14.01.2009 | ||
NL | 14.01.2009 | ||
RO | 14.01.2009 | ||
SI | 14.01.2009 | ||
SK | 14.01.2009 | ||
IE | 10.03.2009 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
BG | 14.04.2009 | ||
GB | 14.04.2009 | ||
SE | 14.04.2009 | ||
GR | 15.04.2009 | ||
ES | 25.04.2009 | ||
PT | 15.06.2009 | ||
Former [2010/23] | AT | 14.01.2009 | |
BE | 14.01.2009 | ||
CZ | 14.01.2009 | ||
DK | 14.01.2009 | ||
EE | 14.01.2009 | ||
FI | 14.01.2009 | ||
NL | 14.01.2009 | ||
RO | 14.01.2009 | ||
SI | 14.01.2009 | ||
SK | 14.01.2009 | ||
IE | 10.03.2009 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
BG | 14.04.2009 | ||
GB | 14.04.2009 | ||
SE | 14.04.2009 | ||
ES | 25.04.2009 | ||
PT | 15.06.2009 | ||
Former [2010/08] | AT | 14.01.2009 | |
BE | 14.01.2009 | ||
CZ | 14.01.2009 | ||
DK | 14.01.2009 | ||
EE | 14.01.2009 | ||
FI | 14.01.2009 | ||
NL | 14.01.2009 | ||
RO | 14.01.2009 | ||
SI | 14.01.2009 | ||
SK | 14.01.2009 | ||
IE | 10.03.2009 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
BG | 14.04.2009 | ||
SE | 14.04.2009 | ||
ES | 25.04.2009 | ||
PT | 15.06.2009 | ||
Former [2010/07] | AT | 14.01.2009 | |
BE | 14.01.2009 | ||
CZ | 14.01.2009 | ||
DK | 14.01.2009 | ||
EE | 14.01.2009 | ||
FI | 14.01.2009 | ||
NL | 14.01.2009 | ||
RO | 14.01.2009 | ||
SI | 14.01.2009 | ||
SK | 14.01.2009 | ||
IE | 10.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
SE | 14.04.2009 | ||
ES | 25.04.2009 | ||
PT | 15.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/50] | AT | 14.01.2009 | |
BE | 14.01.2009 | ||
CZ | 14.01.2009 | ||
DK | 14.01.2009 | ||
EE | 14.01.2009 | ||
FI | 14.01.2009 | ||
NL | 14.01.2009 | ||
RO | 14.01.2009 | ||
SI | 14.01.2009 | ||
SK | 14.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
SE | 14.04.2009 | ||
ES | 25.04.2009 | ||
PT | 15.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/49] | AT | 14.01.2009 | |
BE | 14.01.2009 | ||
CZ | 14.01.2009 | ||
DK | 14.01.2009 | ||
EE | 14.01.2009 | ||
FI | 14.01.2009 | ||
NL | 14.01.2009 | ||
SI | 14.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
SE | 14.04.2009 | ||
ES | 25.04.2009 | ||
PT | 15.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/47] | AT | 14.01.2009 | |
BE | 14.01.2009 | ||
DK | 14.01.2009 | ||
FI | 14.01.2009 | ||
NL | 14.01.2009 | ||
SI | 14.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
SE | 14.04.2009 | ||
ES | 25.04.2009 | ||
PT | 15.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/46] | AT | 14.01.2009 | |
BE | 14.01.2009 | ||
DK | 14.01.2009 | ||
FI | 14.01.2009 | ||
NL | 14.01.2009 | ||
SI | 14.01.2009 | ||
SE | 14.04.2009 | ||
ES | 25.04.2009 | ||
PT | 15.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/43] | AT | 14.01.2009 | |
BE | 14.01.2009 | ||
FI | 14.01.2009 | ||
NL | 14.01.2009 | ||
SI | 14.01.2009 | ||
SE | 14.04.2009 | ||
ES | 25.04.2009 | ||
PT | 15.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/39] | AT | 14.01.2009 | |
FI | 14.01.2009 | ||
NL | 14.01.2009 | ||
SI | 14.01.2009 | ||
SE | 14.04.2009 | ||
ES | 25.04.2009 | ||
PT | 15.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/36] | FI | 14.01.2009 | |
NL | 14.01.2009 | ||
SI | 14.01.2009 | ||
ES | 25.04.2009 | ||
Former [2009/34] | NL | 14.01.2009 | |
ES | 25.04.2009 | ||
Former [2009/26] | NL | 14.01.2009 | Cited in | International search | [DA]US6215852 (ROGERS CAREY S [US], et al) [DA] 1* column 7, line 63 - column 8, line 13 * |