EP1477304 - BIODEGRADABLE FILM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.01.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.01.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.02.2009 [2009/08] | 16.01.2009 | Change or deletion - application deemed withdrawn | published on 18.02.2009 [2009/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KAO CORPORATION 14-10, Nihonbashi Kayaba-cho 1-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8210 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2004/47] | For all designated states Kao Corporation 14-10, Nihonbashi-Kayabacho 1-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8210 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ISSHIKI, N., c/o Kao Corporation, Research Lab. 2606, Akabane, Ichikai-machi Haga-gun, Tochigi 321-3497 / JP | 02 /
ODAJIMA, S., c/o Kao Corporation, Research Lab. 2606, Akabane, Ichikai-machi Haga-gun, Tochigi 321-3497 / JP | 03 /
GOTO, M., c/o Kao Corporation, Research Lab. 2606, Akabane, Ichikai-machi Haga-gun, Tochigi 321-3497 / JP | [2004/47] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/47] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03706985.3 | 20.02.2003 | [2004/47] | WO2003JP01872 | Priority number, date | JP20020044429 | 21.02.2002 Original published format: JP 2002044429 | [2004/47] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03070459 | Date: | 28.08.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1477304 | Date: | 17.11.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.08.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 28.08.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.05.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B32B27/08, B32B27/00, C08L91/06, B65D1/00 | [2004/47] | CPC: |
B32B9/02 (EP,US);
B32B27/08 (EP,KR);
B32B9/043 (US);
B32B25/04 (EP,US);
B32B27/28 (EP);
B32B3/04 (EP);
B32B7/027 (EP,KR,US);
B32B9/04 (EP,US);
B32B9/045 (EP,US);
B32B2250/40 (EP);
B32B2307/30 (EP);
B32B2307/306 (EP);
B32B2307/3065 (US);
B32B2307/7163 (EP,US);
B32B2307/7246 (EP,US);
B32B2307/748 (EP);
B32B2317/22 (US);
B32B2439/00 (EP);
Y10T428/3188 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/47] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BIOLOGISCH ABBAUBARE FOLIE | [2004/47] | English: | BIODEGRADABLE FILM | [2004/47] | French: | FILM BIODEGRADABLE | [2004/47] | Entry into regional phase | 12.08.2004 | Translation filed | 10.09.2004 | National basic fee paid | 10.09.2004 | Search fee paid | 10.09.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.09.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.08.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.09.2004 | Examination requested [2004/47] | 05.08.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/08] | 09.09.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5512378 (BASTIOLI CATIA [IT], et al) [X] 1-3,5-15 * example 7 * * column 1, line 38 - column 2, line 35 *; | [A]NL1006548C (SARA LEE DE NV [NL]) [A] 1-15* page 2, line 28 - page 4, line 28 * | International search | [AP]JP2002200725 (TOYO SEIKAN KAISHA LTD); | [AP]JP2002225841 (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD); | [AP]JP2003040242 (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD) |