EP1599004 - COMMUNICATION CONTROL PROGRAM AND COMMUNICATION CONTROL METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.12.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.12.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.01.2018 [2018/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [2005/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HIRAI, Koichi, c/o Fujitsu Limited 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [2005/47] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/48] | Seeger · Seeger · Lindner Partnerschaft Patentanwälte Paosostrasse 95 81249 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/48] | Seeger, Wolfgang Seeger & Seeger Patentanwälte & European Patent Attorneys Georg-Hager-Strasse 40 81369 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/47] | Seeger, Wolfgang Georg-Hager-Strasse 40 81369 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03707157.8 | 27.02.2003 | [2005/47] | WO2003JP02277 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004077781 | Date: | 10.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1599004 | Date: | 23.11.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.09.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 10.09.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.03.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/04 | [2005/47] | CPC: |
H04L41/0668 (EP,US);
H04L43/0811 (EP,US);
H04L45/00 (EP,US);
H04L45/22 (US);
H04L45/28 (EP,US);
H04L69/40 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE [2006/14] |
Former [2005/47] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | KOMMUNIKATIONSSTEUERPROGRAMM UND KOMMUNIKATIONSSTEUERVERFAHREN | [2005/47] | English: | COMMUNICATION CONTROL PROGRAM AND COMMUNICATION CONTROL METHOD | [2005/47] | French: | PROCEDE ET PROGRAMME DE CONTROLE DE COMMUNICATION | [2005/47] | Entry into regional phase | 17.03.2005 | Translation filed | 17.03.2005 | National basic fee paid | 17.03.2005 | Search fee paid | 17.03.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.03.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.03.2005 | Examination requested [2005/47] | 28.09.2005 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 14.10.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.11.2005 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | 12.12.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.06.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.08.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/04] | 14.09.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/04] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.12.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 09.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 02.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 04.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 28.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 02.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 29.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2017 | 15   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO0028715 (HONEYWELL INC [US]) [X] 1-9 * abstract * * page 2, line 30 - page 7, line 25 * * page 9, line 11 - page 27, line 32; figures 1a-19; claims 1-30 *; | [X]US6314525 (MAHALINGHAM MALLIKARJUNAN [US], et al) [X] 1-9 * abstract * * column 1, line 65 - column 3, line 11; figures 1-14b * * column 3, line 64 - column 30, line 32; claims 1-24 *; | [A]GB2371706 (3COM CORP [US]) [A] 1-9 * abstract * * page 3, line 25 - page 4, line 10; figures 1-20 ** page 5, line 9 - page 17, line 23; claims 1-4 *; | [X]CA2459027 (TROPIC NETWORKS INC [CA]) [X] 1-9 * abstract * * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0052] * | International search | [Y]JPH10173773 (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC); | [Y]JP2002026909 (HITACHI LTD); | [Y]JP2002232427 (FUJITSU LTD) | Examination | US5862335 | US6308281 | by applicant | WO0028715 | CA2459027 |