EP1486676 - SCROLL COMPRESSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.02.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DAIKIN INDUSTRIES, LTD. Umeda Center Building, 4-12, Nakazaki-nishi 2-chome, Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8323 / JP | [2011/13] |
Former [2004/51] | For all designated states Daikin Industries, Ltd. Umeda Center Building, 4-12, Nakazaki-nishi 2-chome, Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8323 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FURUSHO, Kazuhiro; c/o Rinkai Factory, Sakai Plant DAIKIN INDUSTRIES, LTD. 12,Chikkou-shinmachi 3-cho Sakai-shi, Osaka 592-8331 / JP | 02 /
KATO, Katsumi; c/o Rinkai Factory, Sakai Plant DAIKIN INDUSTRIES, LTD. 12,Chikkou-shinmachi 3-cho Sakai-shi, Osaka 592-8331 / JP | 03 /
YAMAJI, Hiroyuki; c/o Rinkai Factory, Sakai Plant DAIKIN INDUSTRIES, LTD. 12,Chikkou-shinmachi 3-cho Sakai-shi, Osaka 592-8331 / JP | [2004/51] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/51] | Goddar, Heinz J., Dr. FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03707162.8 | 27.02.2003 | [2004/51] | WO2003JP02283 | Priority number, date | JP20020056874 | 04.03.2002 Original published format: JP 2002056874 | [2004/51] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03074879 | Date: | 12.09.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1486676 | Date: | 15.12.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.09.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1486676 | Date: | 30.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 12.09.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.07.2010 | Classification | IPC: | F04C29/02, F04C18/02 | [2010/42] | CPC: |
F04C27/005 (EP,US);
F04C18/02 (KR);
F01C21/10 (EP,US);
F04C18/0215 (EP,US);
F04C29/021 (EP,US);
F04C2230/231 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2004/51] | F04C18/02, F04C29/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/51] | Title | German: | SPIRALVERDICHTER | [2004/51] | English: | SCROLL COMPRESSOR | [2004/51] | French: | COMPRESSEUR A VOLUTE | [2004/51] | Entry into regional phase | 20.06.2003 | Translation filed | 20.06.2003 | National basic fee paid | 20.06.2003 | Search fee paid | 20.06.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.06.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.06.2003 | Examination requested [2004/51] | 21.10.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.01.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 19.01.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 16.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.02.2003 | AT | 30.03.2011 | CY | 30.03.2011 | CZ | 30.03.2011 | DK | 30.03.2011 | EE | 30.03.2011 | FI | 30.03.2011 | IT | 30.03.2011 | NL | 30.03.2011 | SE | 30.03.2011 | SI | 30.03.2011 | SK | 30.03.2011 | TR | 30.03.2011 | BG | 30.06.2011 | GR | 01.07.2011 | ES | 11.07.2011 | PT | 01.08.2011 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/21] | AT | 30.03.2011 | |
CY | 30.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2011 | ||
DK | 30.03.2011 | ||
EE | 30.03.2011 | ||
FI | 30.03.2011 | ||
IT | 30.03.2011 | ||
NL | 30.03.2011 | ||
SE | 30.03.2011 | ||
SI | 30.03.2011 | ||
SK | 30.03.2011 | ||
TR | 30.03.2011 | ||
BG | 30.06.2011 | ||
GR | 01.07.2011 | ||
ES | 11.07.2011 | ||
PT | 01.08.2011 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 30.03.2011 | |
CY | 30.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2011 | ||
DK | 30.03.2011 | ||
EE | 30.03.2011 | ||
FI | 30.03.2011 | ||
IT | 30.03.2011 | ||
NL | 30.03.2011 | ||
SE | 30.03.2011 | ||
SI | 30.03.2011 | ||
SK | 30.03.2011 | ||
BG | 30.06.2011 | ||
GR | 01.07.2011 | ||
ES | 11.07.2011 | ||
PT | 01.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/23] | AT | 30.03.2011 | |
CY | 30.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2011 | ||
DK | 30.03.2011 | ||
EE | 30.03.2011 | ||
FI | 30.03.2011 | ||
IT | 30.03.2011 | ||
NL | 30.03.2011 | ||
SE | 30.03.2011 | ||
SI | 30.03.2011 | ||
SK | 30.03.2011 | ||
GR | 01.07.2011 | ||
ES | 11.07.2011 | ||
PT | 01.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | AT | 30.03.2011 | |
CY | 30.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2011 | ||
DK | 30.03.2011 | ||
EE | 30.03.2011 | ||
FI | 30.03.2011 | ||
NL | 30.03.2011 | ||
SE | 30.03.2011 | ||
SI | 30.03.2011 | ||
SK | 30.03.2011 | ||
GR | 01.07.2011 | ||
ES | 11.07.2011 | ||
PT | 01.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/02] | AT | 30.03.2011 | |
CY | 30.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2011 | ||
EE | 30.03.2011 | ||
FI | 30.03.2011 | ||
NL | 30.03.2011 | ||
SE | 30.03.2011 | ||
SI | 30.03.2011 | ||
SK | 30.03.2011 | ||
GR | 01.07.2011 | ||
ES | 11.07.2011 | ||
PT | 01.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/51] | AT | 30.03.2011 | |
CY | 30.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2011 | ||
EE | 30.03.2011 | ||
FI | 30.03.2011 | ||
SE | 30.03.2011 | ||
SI | 30.03.2011 | ||
SK | 30.03.2011 | ||
GR | 01.07.2011 | ||
ES | 11.07.2011 | ||
PT | 01.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | AT | 30.03.2011 | |
CY | 30.03.2011 | ||
EE | 30.03.2011 | ||
FI | 30.03.2011 | ||
SE | 30.03.2011 | ||
SI | 30.03.2011 | ||
GR | 01.07.2011 | ||
PT | 01.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/40] | AT | 30.03.2011 | |
CY | 30.03.2011 | ||
FI | 30.03.2011 | ||
SE | 30.03.2011 | ||
SI | 30.03.2011 | ||
GR | 01.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | CY | 30.03.2011 | |
FI | 30.03.2011 | ||
SE | 30.03.2011 | ||
SI | 30.03.2011 | ||
GR | 01.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | SE | 30.03.2011 | |
GR | 01.07.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [Y]JPH08303371 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [A]JPH08303370 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [A]US6135739 (OGAWA HIROSHI [JP], et al); | [A]JP2000329075 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP); | [Y]JP2001214872 (DAIKIN IND LTD) |