EP1474700 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR TESTING ASSISTED POSITION LOCATION CAPABLE DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.07.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG, HU, TR | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM INCORPORATED 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [2014/36] |
Former [2004/46] | For all designated states Qualcomm Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GAAL, Peter 9515 Easter Way San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [2004/46] | Representative(s) | Heselberger, Johannes Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [2014/36] |
Former [2004/46] | Heselberger, Johannes Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Geissler Galileiplatz 1 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03707739.3 | 04.02.2003 | [2004/46] | WO2003US03555 | Priority number, date | US20020067588 | 04.02.2002 Original published format: US 67588 | [2004/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03067277 | Date: | 14.08.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/33] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1474700 | Date: | 10.11.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.08.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1474700 | Date: | 03.09.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.11.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G01S19/05, G01S19/23, G01S19/25, G01S13/46 | [2014/16] | CPC: |
G01S19/25 (EP,US);
G01S5/14 (KR);
G01R31/00 (KR);
G01S19/03 (KR);
G01S19/05 (EP,US);
G01S19/23 (EP,US);
G01S2013/466 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2004/46] | G01S5/14 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/46] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM TESTEN VON UNTERSTÜTZTEN POSITIONSBESTIMMUNGSGERÄTEN | [2004/46] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR TESTING ASSISTED POSITION LOCATION CAPABLE DEVICES | [2004/46] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL PERMETTANT DE TESTER DES DISPOSITIFS ASSISTES DE LOCALISATION DE POSITION | [2004/46] | Entry into regional phase | 01.09.2004 | National basic fee paid | 01.09.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.09.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.09.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 01.09.2004 | Examination requested [2004/46] | 02.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.03.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.07.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 22.07.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.07.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.11.2007 | Opposition(s) | 04.06.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 08.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 07.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 07.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 07.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.02.2003 | AT | 03.09.2014 | BE | 03.09.2014 | BG | 03.09.2014 | CY | 03.09.2014 | CZ | 03.09.2014 | DK | 03.09.2014 | EE | 03.09.2014 | ES | 03.09.2014 | FI | 03.09.2014 | IT | 03.09.2014 | MC | 03.09.2014 | NL | 03.09.2014 | SE | 03.09.2014 | SI | 03.09.2014 | SK | 03.09.2014 | TR | 03.09.2014 | GR | 04.12.2014 | PT | 05.01.2015 | IE | 04.02.2015 | LU | 04.02.2015 | CH | 28.02.2015 | LI | 28.02.2015 | FR | 02.03.2015 | [2017/39] |
Former [2016/32] | AT | 03.09.2014 | |
BE | 03.09.2014 | ||
CY | 03.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 03.09.2014 | ||
DK | 03.09.2014 | ||
EE | 03.09.2014 | ||
ES | 03.09.2014 | ||
FI | 03.09.2014 | ||
IT | 03.09.2014 | ||
MC | 03.09.2014 | ||
NL | 03.09.2014 | ||
SE | 03.09.2014 | ||
SI | 03.09.2014 | ||
SK | 03.09.2014 | ||
GR | 04.12.2014 | ||
PT | 05.01.2015 | ||
IE | 04.02.2015 | ||
LU | 04.02.2015 | ||
CH | 28.02.2015 | ||
LI | 28.02.2015 | ||
FR | 02.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 03.09.2014 | |
CY | 03.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 03.09.2014 | ||
DK | 03.09.2014 | ||
EE | 03.09.2014 | ||
ES | 03.09.2014 | ||
FI | 03.09.2014 | ||
IT | 03.09.2014 | ||
MC | 03.09.2014 | ||
NL | 03.09.2014 | ||
SE | 03.09.2014 | ||
SI | 03.09.2014 | ||
SK | 03.09.2014 | ||
GR | 04.12.2014 | ||
PT | 05.01.2015 | ||
IE | 04.02.2015 | ||
LU | 04.02.2015 | ||
BE | 28.02.2015 | ||
CH | 28.02.2015 | ||
LI | 28.02.2015 | ||
FR | 02.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | AT | 03.09.2014 | |
CY | 03.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 03.09.2014 | ||
DK | 03.09.2014 | ||
EE | 03.09.2014 | ||
ES | 03.09.2014 | ||
FI | 03.09.2014 | ||
IT | 03.09.2014 | ||
MC | 03.09.2014 | ||
NL | 03.09.2014 | ||
SE | 03.09.2014 | ||
SI | 03.09.2014 | ||
SK | 03.09.2014 | ||
GR | 04.12.2014 | ||
PT | 05.01.2015 | ||
IE | 04.02.2015 | ||
LU | 04.02.2015 | ||
BE | 28.02.2015 | ||
CH | 28.02.2015 | ||
LI | 28.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | AT | 03.09.2014 | |
CY | 03.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 03.09.2014 | ||
DK | 03.09.2014 | ||
EE | 03.09.2014 | ||
ES | 03.09.2014 | ||
FI | 03.09.2014 | ||
IT | 03.09.2014 | ||
MC | 03.09.2014 | ||
NL | 03.09.2014 | ||
SE | 03.09.2014 | ||
SI | 03.09.2014 | ||
SK | 03.09.2014 | ||
GR | 04.12.2014 | ||
PT | 05.01.2015 | ||
LU | 04.02.2015 | ||
BE | 28.02.2015 | ||
CH | 28.02.2015 | ||
LI | 28.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/47] | AT | 03.09.2014 | |
CY | 03.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 03.09.2014 | ||
DK | 03.09.2014 | ||
EE | 03.09.2014 | ||
ES | 03.09.2014 | ||
FI | 03.09.2014 | ||
IT | 03.09.2014 | ||
MC | 03.09.2014 | ||
NL | 03.09.2014 | ||
SE | 03.09.2014 | ||
SK | 03.09.2014 | ||
GR | 04.12.2014 | ||
PT | 05.01.2015 | ||
LU | 04.02.2015 | ||
BE | 28.02.2015 | ||
CH | 28.02.2015 | ||
LI | 28.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/46] | AT | 03.09.2014 | |
CY | 03.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 03.09.2014 | ||
DK | 03.09.2014 | ||
EE | 03.09.2014 | ||
ES | 03.09.2014 | ||
FI | 03.09.2014 | ||
IT | 03.09.2014 | ||
MC | 03.09.2014 | ||
NL | 03.09.2014 | ||
SE | 03.09.2014 | ||
SK | 03.09.2014 | ||
GR | 04.12.2014 | ||
PT | 05.01.2015 | ||
LU | 04.02.2015 | ||
BE | 28.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/44] | AT | 03.09.2014 | |
CY | 03.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 03.09.2014 | ||
DK | 03.09.2014 | ||
EE | 03.09.2014 | ||
ES | 03.09.2014 | ||
FI | 03.09.2014 | ||
IT | 03.09.2014 | ||
NL | 03.09.2014 | ||
SE | 03.09.2014 | ||
SK | 03.09.2014 | ||
GR | 04.12.2014 | ||
PT | 05.01.2015 | ||
LU | 04.02.2015 | ||
BE | 28.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 03.09.2014 | |
CY | 03.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 03.09.2014 | ||
DK | 03.09.2014 | ||
EE | 03.09.2014 | ||
ES | 03.09.2014 | ||
FI | 03.09.2014 | ||
IT | 03.09.2014 | ||
NL | 03.09.2014 | ||
SE | 03.09.2014 | ||
SK | 03.09.2014 | ||
GR | 04.12.2014 | ||
PT | 05.01.2015 | ||
BE | 28.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/34] | AT | 03.09.2014 | |
CY | 03.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 03.09.2014 | ||
DK | 03.09.2014 | ||
EE | 03.09.2014 | ||
ES | 03.09.2014 | ||
FI | 03.09.2014 | ||
NL | 03.09.2014 | ||
SE | 03.09.2014 | ||
SK | 03.09.2014 | ||
GR | 04.12.2014 | ||
PT | 05.01.2015 | ||
BE | 28.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/30] | AT | 03.09.2014 | |
CY | 03.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 03.09.2014 | ||
EE | 03.09.2014 | ||
ES | 03.09.2014 | ||
FI | 03.09.2014 | ||
NL | 03.09.2014 | ||
SE | 03.09.2014 | ||
SK | 03.09.2014 | ||
GR | 04.12.2014 | ||
PT | 05.01.2015 | ||
BE | 28.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | AT | 03.09.2014 | |
CY | 03.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 03.09.2014 | ||
EE | 03.09.2014 | ||
ES | 03.09.2014 | ||
FI | 03.09.2014 | ||
NL | 03.09.2014 | ||
SE | 03.09.2014 | ||
SK | 03.09.2014 | ||
GR | 04.12.2014 | ||
PT | 05.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/22] | AT | 03.09.2014 | |
CY | 03.09.2014 | ||
ES | 03.09.2014 | ||
FI | 03.09.2014 | ||
NL | 03.09.2014 | ||
SE | 03.09.2014 | ||
GR | 04.12.2014 | ||
PT | 05.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/16] | AT | 03.09.2014 | |
CY | 03.09.2014 | ||
ES | 03.09.2014 | ||
FI | 03.09.2014 | ||
NL | 03.09.2014 | ||
SE | 03.09.2014 | ||
GR | 04.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | AT | 03.09.2014 | |
CY | 03.09.2014 | ||
ES | 03.09.2014 | ||
FI | 03.09.2014 | ||
SE | 03.09.2014 | ||
GR | 04.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 03.09.2014 | |
ES | 03.09.2014 | ||
FI | 03.09.2014 | ||
SE | 03.09.2014 | ||
GR | 04.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | ES | 03.09.2014 | |
FI | 03.09.2014 | ||
SE | 03.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | FI | 03.09.2014 | |
SE | 03.09.2014 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5841396 (KRASNER NORMAN F [US]) [A] 1-11 * figure 1A * * figure 5A * * column 2, line 62 - column 11, line 60 *; | [A]US6208289 (HAENDEL RICHARD S [US]) [A] 7 * figure 1 ** column 2, line 65 - line 67 *; | [X] - REBECCA BOUCHER, "Spirent Communications Delivers Automatic Test Solution for E911 Handset", SPIRENT COMMUNICATIONS, (20011001), URL: tas.spirentcom.com/news10_01_01plts.htm, (20030724), XP002248176 [X] 1-11 * the whole document * | [ ] - ANONYMOUS, "Position Location Test System PLTS", SPIRENT COMMUNICATIONS, URL: spirentcom.com/documents/119.PDF, (20030724), XP002248177 [ ] * the whole document * |