EP1474839 - POLYMER ELECTROLYTE MEMBRANES FOR USE IN FUEL CELLS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.02.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BATTELLE MEMORIAL INSTITUTE 505 King Avenue Columbus, OH 43201-2693 / US | [2010/14] |
Former [2008/37] | For all designated states BATTELLE MEMORIAL INSTITUTE 505 King Avenue Columbus OH 43201-2693 / US | ||
Former [2004/46] | For all designated states BATTELLE MEMORIAL INSTITUTE 505 King Avenue Columbus Ohio 43201 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VIJAYENDRAN, Bhima 5924 Brigids Close Drive Dublin, OH 43017 / US | 02 /
MCGINNISS, Vincent, D. P.O. Box 702 Sunbury, OH 43074 / US | 03 /
RISSER, Steven, M. 8991 Kingsley Drive Reynoldsburg, OH 43068 / US | 04 /
SCHULTE, Michael, D. 3378 River Place Drive Columbus, OH 43230 / US | 05 /
SAYRE, Jay, R. 5550 Swingley Drive Columbus, OH 43230 / US | 06 /
CAFMEYER, Jeffrey, T. 492 Waring Way Columbus, OH 43212 / US | [2005/04] |
Former [2004/46] | 01 /
VIJAYENDRAN, Bhima 5924 Brigids Close Drive Dublin, OH 43017 / US | ||
02 /
MCGINNISS, Vincent, D. P.O. Box 702 Sunbury, OH 43074 / US | |||
03 /
RISSER, Steven, M. 7176 Feather Court Reynoldsburg, OH 43068 / US | |||
04 /
SCHULTE, Michael, D. 3378 River Place Drive Columbus, OH 43230 / US | |||
05 /
SAYRE, Jay, R. 5550 Swingley Drive Columbus, OH 43230 / US | |||
06 /
CAFMEYER, Jeffrey, T. 492 Waring Way Columbus, OH 43212 / US | Representative(s) | Giles, Ashley Simon, et al Haseltine Lake LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/46] | Giles, Ashley Simon, et al HASELTINE LAKE, Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 03707808.6 | 06.02.2003 | [2004/46] | WO2003US03862 | Priority number, date | US20020354717P | 06.02.2002 Original published format: US 354717 P | [2004/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03067691 | Date: | 14.08.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/33] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1474839 | Date: | 10.11.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.08.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1474839 | Date: | 07.04.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.10.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H01M8/02 | [2004/46] | CPC: |
C08J5/2256 (EP,US);
B01D69/1411 (EP,US);
B01D71/46 (EP,US);
B01D71/5222 (EP,US);
B01D71/68 (EP,US);
B01D71/82 (EP,US);
H01M8/1025 (EP,US);
H01M8/1027 (EP,US);
H01M8/1032 (EP,US);
H01M8/1037 (EP,US);
H01M8/1044 (EP,US);
H01M8/1048 (EP,US);
C08J2371/12 (EP,US);
H01M2300/0082 (EP,US);
H01M2300/0091 (EP,US);
H01M4/881 (EP,US);
H01M8/04197 (EP,US);
H01M8/1011 (EP,US);
Y02E60/50 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/46] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | Title | German: | POLYMERELEKTROLYTMEMBRANEN ZUR VERWENDUNG IN BRENNSTOFFZELLEN | [2004/46] | English: | POLYMER ELECTROLYTE MEMBRANES FOR USE IN FUEL CELLS | [2004/46] | French: | MEMBRANES ELECTROLYTIQUES POLYMERES DESTINEES A ETRE UTILISEES DANS DES CELLULES ELECTROCHIMIQUES | [2004/46] | Entry into regional phase | 02.09.2004 | National basic fee paid | 02.09.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.09.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.09.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 02.09.2004 | Examination requested [2004/46] | 07.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.08.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.09.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 26.11.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.10.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.02.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 15.02.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.01.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/11] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 24.11.2008 | Request for further processing filed | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.04.2010 | BE | 07.04.2010 | CZ | 07.04.2010 | DK | 07.04.2010 | EE | 07.04.2010 | FI | 07.04.2010 | HU | 07.04.2010 | NL | 07.04.2010 | SE | 07.04.2010 | SI | 07.04.2010 | SK | 07.04.2010 | TR | 07.04.2010 | CY | 14.04.2010 | BG | 07.07.2010 | GR | 08.07.2010 | ES | 18.07.2010 | PT | 09.08.2010 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 07.04.2010 | |
BE | 07.04.2010 | ||
CZ | 07.04.2010 | ||
DK | 07.04.2010 | ||
EE | 07.04.2010 | ||
FI | 07.04.2010 | ||
NL | 07.04.2010 | ||
SE | 07.04.2010 | ||
SI | 07.04.2010 | ||
SK | 07.04.2010 | ||
TR | 07.04.2010 | ||
CY | 14.04.2010 | ||
BG | 07.07.2010 | ||
GR | 08.07.2010 | ||
ES | 18.07.2010 | ||
PT | 09.08.2010 | ||
Former [2013/42] | AT | 07.04.2010 | |
BE | 07.04.2010 | ||
CZ | 07.04.2010 | ||
DK | 07.04.2010 | ||
EE | 07.04.2010 | ||
FI | 07.04.2010 | ||
NL | 07.04.2010 | ||
SE | 07.04.2010 | ||
SI | 07.04.2010 | ||
SK | 07.04.2010 | ||
CY | 14.04.2010 | ||
BG | 07.07.2010 | ||
GR | 08.07.2010 | ||
ES | 18.07.2010 | ||
PT | 09.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/13] | AT | 07.04.2010 | |
BE | 07.04.2010 | ||
CZ | 07.04.2010 | ||
DK | 07.04.2010 | ||
EE | 07.04.2010 | ||
FI | 07.04.2010 | ||
NL | 07.04.2010 | ||
SE | 07.04.2010 | ||
SI | 07.04.2010 | ||
SK | 07.04.2010 | ||
CY | 14.04.2010 | ||
GR | 08.07.2010 | ||
ES | 18.07.2010 | ||
PT | 09.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/10] | AT | 07.04.2010 | |
CZ | 07.04.2010 | ||
DK | 07.04.2010 | ||
EE | 07.04.2010 | ||
FI | 07.04.2010 | ||
NL | 07.04.2010 | ||
SE | 07.04.2010 | ||
SI | 07.04.2010 | ||
SK | 07.04.2010 | ||
CY | 14.04.2010 | ||
GR | 08.07.2010 | ||
ES | 18.07.2010 | ||
PT | 09.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/08] | AT | 07.04.2010 | |
DK | 07.04.2010 | ||
EE | 07.04.2010 | ||
FI | 07.04.2010 | ||
NL | 07.04.2010 | ||
SE | 07.04.2010 | ||
SI | 07.04.2010 | ||
CY | 14.04.2010 | ||
GR | 08.07.2010 | ||
ES | 18.07.2010 | ||
PT | 09.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/07] | AT | 07.04.2010 | |
DK | 07.04.2010 | ||
FI | 07.04.2010 | ||
NL | 07.04.2010 | ||
SE | 07.04.2010 | ||
SI | 07.04.2010 | ||
CY | 14.04.2010 | ||
GR | 08.07.2010 | ||
ES | 18.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/03] | AT | 07.04.2010 | |
FI | 07.04.2010 | ||
NL | 07.04.2010 | ||
SE | 07.04.2010 | ||
SI | 07.04.2010 | ||
CY | 14.04.2010 | ||
GR | 08.07.2010 | ||
ES | 18.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/01] | AT | 07.04.2010 | |
FI | 07.04.2010 | ||
NL | 07.04.2010 | ||
SE | 07.04.2010 | ||
SI | 07.04.2010 | ||
GR | 08.07.2010 | ||
ES | 18.07.2010 | ||
Former [2010/50] | AT | 07.04.2010 | |
FI | 07.04.2010 | ||
NL | 07.04.2010 | ||
SE | 07.04.2010 | ||
SI | 07.04.2010 | ||
ES | 18.07.2010 | ||
Former [2010/49] | AT | 07.04.2010 | |
NL | 07.04.2010 | ||
SE | 07.04.2010 | ||
SI | 07.04.2010 | ||
ES | 18.07.2010 | ||
Former [2010/46] | NL | 07.04.2010 | |
SI | 07.04.2010 | ||
ES | 18.07.2010 | ||
Former [2010/45] | NL | 07.04.2010 | |
SI | 07.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/36] | SI | 07.04.2010 | Cited in | International search | [X]US5599638 (SURAMPUDI SUBBARAO [US], et al); | [X]US5817718 (NEZU SHINJI [JP], et al); | [X]WO0049069 (PARONEN MIKAEL [FI]); | [X]EP1110992 (TOYODA CHUO KENKYUSHO KK [JP]); | [X]US6268430 (CHOI SUSAN KUHARCIK [US], et al); |