12.12.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] |
26.09.2008 |
Change - representative |
published on 29.10.2008 [2008/44] |
04.07.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.08.2008 [2008/32] |
06.06.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.07.2008 [2008/28] |
25.04.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.05.2008 [2008/22] |
18.04.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.05.2008 [2008/21] |
19.10.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.11.2007 [2007/47] |
05.10.2007 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 07.11.2007 [2007/45] |
14.09.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.10.2007 [2007/42] |
31.08.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.10.2007 [2007/40] |
02.03.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.04.2007 [2007/14] |
15.12.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.01.2007 [2007/03] |
17.11.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.12.2006 [2006/51] |
17.11.2006 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 20.12.2006 [2006/51] |
27.10.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.11.2006 [2006/48] |
13.10.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.11.2006 [2006/46] |
06.10.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.11.2006 [2006/45] |
04.08.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.09.2006 [2006/36] |
25.11.2005 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 11.01.2006 [2006/02] |
18.11.2005 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
18.11.2005 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
21.07.2005 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
29.10.2004 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 15.12.2004 [2004/51] |
29.10.2004 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 15.12.2004 [2004/51] |
22.10.2004 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
10.09.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
10.09.2004 |
New entry: Fee payment for extension state |
|
10.09.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.09.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.09.2004 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
31.08.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
16.03.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.02.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.02.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.10.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.09.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
26.09.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.06.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.05.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|