EP1485120 - USE OF ONE OR MORE NATURAL OR MODIFIED OXYGEN CARRIERS, DEVOID OF PLASMA AND CELLULAR MEMBRANE CONSTITUENTS, FOR EXTERNALLY TREATING OPEN, IN PARTICULAR CHRONIC WOUNDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.11.2006 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SanguiBioTech GmbH Alfred-Herrhausen-Strasse 44 58455 Witten an der Ruhr / DE | [2004/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BARNIKOL, Wolfgang Lanzelhohl 66 55128 Mainz / DE | 02 /
TESLENKO, Alexander Lilienstrasse 30 58095 Hagen / DE | [2004/51] | Representative(s) | Müller, Claudia European Patent Attorney Uhlandstrasse 58 60314 Frankfurt / Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/44] | Müller, Claudia Schnickel Darr Müller Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Uhlandstrasse 58 60314 Frankfurt am Main / DE | ||
Former [2004/51] | Müller, Claudia, Dr. Uhlandstrasse 58 60314 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 03708173.4 | 04.03.2003 | [2004/51] | WO2003EP02193 | Priority number, date | DE2002112321 | 20.03.2002 Original published format: DE 10212321 | [2004/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03077941 | Date: | 25.09.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1485120 | Date: | 15.12.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.09.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1485120 | Date: | 11.01.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.09.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/42, A61P17/02 | [2004/51] | CPC: |
A61K38/42 (EP,US);
A61P17/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/51] | Extension states | AL | 01.09.2004 | LT | 01.09.2004 | LV | 01.09.2004 | MK | 01.09.2004 | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG EINES ODER MEHRERER VON PLASMA UND ZELLWANDBESTANDTEILEN BEFREITEN NATÜRLICHEN ODER MODIFIZIERTEN SAUERSTOFFBINDER ZUR EXTERNEN BEHANDLUNG OFFENER, INSBESONDERE CHRONISCHER WUNDEN | [2004/51] | English: | USE OF ONE OR MORE NATURAL OR MODIFIED OXYGEN CARRIERS, DEVOID OF PLASMA AND CELLULAR MEMBRANE CONSTITUENTS, FOR EXTERNALLY TREATING OPEN, IN PARTICULAR CHRONIC WOUNDS | [2004/51] | French: | UTILISATION D'UN OU DE PLUSIEURS LIANTS D'OXYGENE NATURELS OU MODIFIES, EXEMPTS DE PLASMA ET DE CONSTITUANTS DE LA PAROI CELLULAIRE, POUR LE TRAITEMENT EXTERNE DE PLAIES OUVERTES, NOTAMMENT CHRONIQUES | [2004/51] | Entry into regional phase | 01.09.2004 | National basic fee paid | 01.09.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.09.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.07.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 01.09.2004 | Examination requested [2004/51] | 26.07.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.11.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 10.11.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.10.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 11.01.2006 | CZ | 11.01.2006 | EE | 11.01.2006 | FI | 11.01.2006 | IE | 11.01.2006 | NL | 11.01.2006 | RO | 11.01.2006 | SI | 11.01.2006 | SK | 11.01.2006 | AT | 04.03.2006 | BE | 31.03.2006 | LU | 31.03.2006 | MC | 31.03.2006 | BG | 11.04.2006 | DK | 11.04.2006 | SE | 11.04.2006 | GR | 12.04.2006 | PT | 12.06.2006 | HU | 12.07.2006 | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/32] | CZ | 11.01.2006 | |
EE | 11.01.2006 | ||
FI | 11.01.2006 | ||
IE | 11.01.2006 | ||
NL | 11.01.2006 | ||
RO | 11.01.2006 | ||
SI | 11.01.2006 | ||
SK | 11.01.2006 | ||
AT | 04.03.2006 | ||
BE | 31.03.2006 | ||
LU | 31.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
BG | 11.04.2006 | ||
DK | 11.04.2006 | ||
SE | 11.04.2006 | ||
GR | 12.04.2006 | ||
PT | 12.06.2006 | ||
HU | 12.07.2006 | ||
Former [2008/28] | CZ | 11.01.2006 | |
EE | 11.01.2006 | ||
FI | 11.01.2006 | ||
IE | 11.01.2006 | ||
NL | 11.01.2006 | ||
RO | 11.01.2006 | ||
SI | 11.01.2006 | ||
SK | 11.01.2006 | ||
AT | 04.03.2006 | ||
BE | 31.03.2006 | ||
LU | 31.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
BG | 11.04.2006 | ||
DK | 11.04.2006 | ||
SE | 11.04.2006 | ||
GR | 12.04.2006 | ||
PT | 12.06.2006 | ||
Former [2008/21] | CZ | 11.01.2006 | |
FI | 11.01.2006 | ||
IE | 11.01.2006 | ||
NL | 11.01.2006 | ||
RO | 11.01.2006 | ||
SI | 11.01.2006 | ||
SK | 11.01.2006 | ||
AT | 04.03.2006 | ||
BE | 31.03.2006 | ||
LU | 31.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
BG | 11.04.2006 | ||
DK | 11.04.2006 | ||
SE | 11.04.2006 | ||
GR | 12.04.2006 | ||
PT | 12.06.2006 | ||
Former [2007/45] | FI | 11.01.2006 | |
IE | 11.01.2006 | ||
NL | 11.01.2006 | ||
RO | 11.01.2006 | ||
SI | 11.01.2006 | ||
SK | 11.01.2006 | ||
AT | 04.03.2006 | ||
BE | 31.03.2006 | ||
LU | 31.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
BG | 11.04.2006 | ||
DK | 11.04.2006 | ||
SE | 11.04.2006 | ||
PT | 12.06.2006 | ||
Former [2007/42] | FI | 11.01.2006 | |
IE | 11.01.2006 | ||
IT | 11.01.2006 | ||
NL | 11.01.2006 | ||
RO | 11.01.2006 | ||
SI | 11.01.2006 | ||
SK | 11.01.2006 | ||
BE | 31.03.2006 | ||
LU | 31.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
BG | 11.04.2006 | ||
DK | 11.04.2006 | ||
SE | 11.04.2006 | ||
PT | 12.06.2006 | ||
Former [2007/40] | FI | 11.01.2006 | |
IE | 11.01.2006 | ||
IT | 11.01.2006 | ||
NL | 11.01.2006 | ||
SI | 11.01.2006 | ||
SK | 11.01.2006 | ||
BE | 31.03.2006 | ||
LU | 31.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
BG | 11.04.2006 | ||
DK | 11.04.2006 | ||
SE | 11.04.2006 | ||
PT | 12.06.2006 | ||
Former [2007/14] | FI | 11.01.2006 | |
IE | 11.01.2006 | ||
NL | 11.01.2006 | ||
SI | 11.01.2006 | ||
SK | 11.01.2006 | ||
BE | 31.03.2006 | ||
LU | 31.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
BG | 11.04.2006 | ||
DK | 11.04.2006 | ||
SE | 11.04.2006 | ||
PT | 12.06.2006 | ||
Former [2007/03] | FI | 11.01.2006 | |
IE | 11.01.2006 | ||
NL | 11.01.2006 | ||
SI | 11.01.2006 | ||
SK | 11.01.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
BG | 11.04.2006 | ||
DK | 11.04.2006 | ||
SE | 11.04.2006 | ||
PT | 12.06.2006 | ||
Former [2006/51] | FI | 11.01.2006 | |
IE | 11.01.2006 | ||
NL | 11.01.2006 | ||
SI | 11.01.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
BG | 11.04.2006 | ||
DK | 11.04.2006 | ||
SE | 11.04.2006 | ||
PT | 12.06.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | FI | 11.01.2006 | |
IE | 11.01.2006 | ||
NL | 11.01.2006 | ||
SI | 11.01.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
BG | 11.04.2006 | ||
SE | 11.04.2006 | ||
PT | 12.06.2006 | ||
Former [2006/45] | FI | 11.01.2006 | |
NL | 11.01.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
SE | 11.04.2006 | ||
Former [2006/36] | FI | 11.01.2006 | Cited in | International search | [XY]WO0200246 (BEIL HANS [DE], et al) [X] 1-8,13-18 * page 1, line 19 - page 3, line 20; claims 22-26 * [Y] 1-18; | [XDY]WO0205754 (SANGUIBIOTECH AG [DE], et al) [XD] 1-8,13-18 * page 2, line 1 - page 3, line 5 * * page 7, line 5 - line 20; claim - * [Y] 1-18; | [XY] - HINZ J ET AL, "Local treatment of non-healing and infected wounds with the biocatalytic activated oxygen carrier tetrachlorodecaoxide (TCDO)", MEDIZINISCHE WELT 1985 GERMANY, (1985), vol. 36, no. 8, pages 210 - 215, XP001152691 [X] 1,9,14,15,17,18 * the whole document * [Y] 1-18 | [A] - JONSSON K ET AL, "TISSUE OXYGENATION ANEMIA AND PERFUSION IN RELATION TO WOUND HEALING IN SURGICAL PATIENTS", ANNALS OF SURGERY, (1991), vol. 214, no. 5, ISSN 0003-4932, pages 605 - 613, XP009012115 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1097/00000658-199111000-00011 |