EP1500254 - COMMUNICATIONS DEVICE FOR TRANSMITTING ACOUSTIC SIGNALS IN A MOTOR VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.10.2014 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Volkswagen Aktiengesellschaft Berliner Ring 2 38440 Wolfsburg / DE | [2012/28] |
Former [2005/04] | For all designated states Volkswagen AG 38436 Wolfsburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHULTZ, Jürgen Auf der Günne 49 38165 Lehre / DE | 02 /
SCHÖNING, Volkmar Im Jagdrevier 30900 Wedemark / DE | 03 /
BÖHM, Tobias Auefeld 9 38464 Gross Twülpstedt / DE | 04 /
MATULOVIC, Stefan Im Wagnerring 7 38471 Rühen / DE | [2005/10] |
Former [2005/04] | 01 /
SCHULTZ, Jürgen Auf der Günne 49 38165 Lehre / DE | ||
02 /
SCHÖNING, Volkmar Im Jagdrevier 30900 Wedemark / DE | |||
03 /
BÖHM, Tobias Auefeld 9 38464 Gross Twülpstedt / DE | |||
04 /
MATULOVIC, Stefan Triftstücke 29 38471 Rühen / DE | Representative(s) | Zucker, Volker Patentanwälte Bressel und Partner mbB Potsdamer Platz 10 10785 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/52] | Zucker, Volker Bressel und Partner Patentanwälte Park Kolonnaden Potsdamer Platz 10 10785 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [2005/04] | Zucker, Volker, Dipl.-Ing. Effert, Bressel und Kollegen Patentanwälte Radickestrasse 48 12489 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 03708192.4 | 07.03.2003 | [2005/04] | WO2003EP02368 | Priority number, date | DE2002117778 | 18.04.2002 Original published format: DE 10217778 | [2005/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03088637 | Date: | 23.10.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1500254 | Date: | 26.01.2005 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.10.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1500254 | Date: | 25.12.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.10.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04M9/08 | [2005/04] | CPC: |
H04M9/08 (EP,US);
H04M19/005 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/04] | Title | German: | KOMMUNIKATIONSEINRICHTUNG ZUR ÜBERTRAGUNG AKUSTISCHER SIGNALE IN EINEM KRAFTFAHRZEUG | [2005/04] | English: | COMMUNICATIONS DEVICE FOR TRANSMITTING ACOUSTIC SIGNALS IN A MOTOR VEHICLE | [2005/04] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COMMUNICATION DESTINE A LA TRANSMISSION DE SIGNAUX ACOUSTIQUES DANS UN VEHICULE | [2005/04] | Entry into regional phase | 18.11.2004 | National basic fee paid | 18.11.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.11.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.06.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 18.11.2004 | Examination requested [2005/04] | 02.01.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.04.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.08.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.11.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 13.11.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.01.2008 | Opposition(s) | 26.09.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 02.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.03.2003 | BG | 25.12.2013 | CY | 25.12.2013 | CZ | 25.12.2013 | DK | 25.12.2013 | EE | 25.12.2013 | ES | 25.12.2013 | FI | 25.12.2013 | IT | 25.12.2013 | MC | 25.12.2013 | NL | 25.12.2013 | RO | 25.12.2013 | SE | 25.12.2013 | SI | 25.12.2013 | SK | 25.12.2013 | TR | 25.12.2013 | AT | 07.03.2014 | IE | 07.03.2014 | LU | 07.03.2014 | GB | 25.03.2014 | GR | 26.03.2014 | BE | 31.03.2014 | CH | 31.03.2014 | LI | 31.03.2014 | PT | 28.04.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 07.03.2003 | |
BG | 25.12.2013 | ||
CY | 25.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
DK | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
ES | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
IT | 25.12.2013 | ||
MC | 25.12.2013 | ||
NL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
SI | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
AT | 07.03.2014 | ||
IE | 07.03.2014 | ||
LU | 07.03.2014 | ||
GB | 25.03.2014 | ||
GR | 26.03.2014 | ||
BE | 31.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
Former [2016/29] | BG | 25.12.2013 | |
CY | 25.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
DK | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
ES | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
IT | 25.12.2013 | ||
MC | 25.12.2013 | ||
NL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
SI | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
AT | 07.03.2014 | ||
IE | 07.03.2014 | ||
LU | 07.03.2014 | ||
GB | 25.03.2014 | ||
GR | 26.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | BG | 25.12.2013 | |
CY | 25.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
DK | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
ES | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
MC | 25.12.2013 | ||
NL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
SI | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
AT | 07.03.2014 | ||
IE | 07.03.2014 | ||
LU | 07.03.2014 | ||
GB | 25.03.2014 | ||
GR | 26.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
Former [2016/27] | BG | 25.12.2013 | |
CY | 25.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
DK | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
ES | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
MC | 25.12.2013 | ||
NL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
SI | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
AT | 07.03.2014 | ||
IE | 07.03.2014 | ||
LU | 07.03.2014 | ||
GB | 25.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
Former [2016/25] | BG | 25.12.2013 | |
CY | 25.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
DK | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
ES | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
NL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
SI | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
AT | 07.03.2014 | ||
IE | 07.03.2014 | ||
LU | 07.03.2014 | ||
GB | 25.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
Former [2015/38] | CY | 25.12.2013 | |
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
DK | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
ES | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
NL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
SI | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
AT | 07.03.2014 | ||
IE | 07.03.2014 | ||
LU | 07.03.2014 | ||
GB | 25.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | CY | 25.12.2013 | |
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
DK | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
ES | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
NL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
SI | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
IE | 07.03.2014 | ||
LU | 07.03.2014 | ||
GB | 25.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | CY | 25.12.2013 | |
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
DK | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
ES | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
NL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
IE | 07.03.2014 | ||
LU | 07.03.2014 | ||
GB | 25.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | CY | 25.12.2013 | |
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
DK | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
ES | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
NL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
IE | 07.03.2014 | ||
LU | 07.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
Former [2015/07] | CY | 25.12.2013 | |
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
DK | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
ES | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
NL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
IE | 07.03.2014 | ||
LU | 07.03.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 25.12.2013 | |
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
DK | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
ES | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
NL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
LU | 07.03.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/39] | CY | 25.12.2013 | |
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
ES | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
NL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | CY | 25.12.2013 | |
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
ES | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | EE | 25.12.2013 | |
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/22] | FI | 25.12.2013 | |
SE | 25.12.2013 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0304257 (MCGREGOR THOMAS [GB], et al) [X] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [A]US5185803 (MOYSKI MATTHEW T [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * column 3, line 66 - column 4, line 3 *; | [A]US4449238 (LEE BYUNG H [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * abstract *; | [A]EP0903726 (DIGISONIX INC [US]) [A] 1-11 * abstract *; | [DA]DE19827134 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [DA] 1-11 * the whole document * |