EP1490322 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING 2,2-DICHLORO OR DIBROMO-PHENYL ALKYL ACETATES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.06.2016 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DSM Fine Chemicals Austria Nfg GmbH & Co KG St.-Peter-Strasse 25 4021 Linz / AT | [2005/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KRICH, Sylvia Raiffeisenweg 24/5 A-4203 Altenberger bei Linz / AT | 02 /
HOLUB, Bernhard Winklfeld 2 A-4072 Strassham / AT | [2005/01] | Representative(s) | Verhaegen, Ilse Maria M. DSM Intellectual Property P.O. Box 4 6100 AA Echt / NL | [2015/31] |
Former [2014/04] | Verhaegen, Ilse Maria M. DSM Intellectual Property P.O. Box 4 6100 AA Echt / NL | ||
Former [2007/33] | Habets, Winand, et al DSM Intellectual Property Office Geleen P.O. Box 9 6160 MA Geleen / NL | ||
Former [2007/27] | Habets, Winand, et al DSM Intellectual Property DSM IP Assets B.V. Geleen Office P.O. Box 9 6160 MA Geleen / NL | ||
Former [2005/01] | Lindinger, Ingrid DSM Fine Chemicals Austria Nfg GmbH & Co KG, CEL/Patente, St. Peter-Strasse 21 4021 Linz / AT | Application number, filing date | 03708200.5 | 10.03.2003 | [2005/01] | WO2003EP02407 | Priority number, date | AT20020000523 | 04.04.2002 Original published format: AT 5232002 | [2005/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03084918 | Date: | 16.10.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1490322 | Date: | 29.12.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.10.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/53] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1490322 | Date: | 29.07.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.10.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C07C67/22, C07C69/65 | [2005/01] | CPC: |
C07C67/22 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C67/22, C07C69/65 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/31] |
Former [2005/01] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON 2,2-DICHLORO- ODER DIBROMO-PHENYLESSIGSÄUREALKYLESTERN | [2005/01] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING 2,2-DICHLORO OR DIBROMO-PHENYL ALKYL ACETATES | [2005/01] | French: | PROCEDE POUR REALISER DES ACETATES D'ALKYLE 2,2-DICHLORO- OU DIBROMO-PHENYLE | [2005/01] | Entry into regional phase | 10.09.2004 | National basic fee paid | 10.09.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.09.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.10.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 10.09.2004 | Examination requested [2004/53] | 02.08.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.03.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 15.04.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.02.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.06.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 19.06.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 19.06.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.08.2010 | Opposition(s) | 02.05.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/27] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 15.04.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 15.04.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 29.04.2011 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 11.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 12.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 10.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.03.2003 | BG | 29.07.2015 | CY | 29.07.2015 | CZ | 29.07.2015 | DK | 29.07.2015 | EE | 29.07.2015 | FI | 29.07.2015 | MC | 29.07.2015 | RO | 29.07.2015 | SE | 29.07.2015 | SI | 29.07.2015 | SK | 29.07.2015 | TR | 29.07.2015 | GR | 30.10.2015 | PT | 30.11.2015 | AT | 10.03.2016 | IE | 10.03.2016 | LU | 10.03.2016 | BE | 31.03.2016 | [2018/38] |
Former [2018/33] | HU | 10.03.2003 | |
CY | 29.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 29.07.2015 | ||
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
EE | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
MC | 29.07.2015 | ||
RO | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
SI | 29.07.2015 | ||
SK | 29.07.2015 | ||
TR | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
AT | 10.03.2016 | ||
IE | 10.03.2016 | ||
LU | 10.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 10.03.2003 | |
CY | 29.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 29.07.2015 | ||
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
EE | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
MC | 29.07.2015 | ||
RO | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
SI | 29.07.2015 | ||
SK | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
AT | 10.03.2016 | ||
IE | 10.03.2016 | ||
LU | 10.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2017/45] | CZ | 29.07.2015 | |
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
EE | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
MC | 29.07.2015 | ||
RO | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
SI | 29.07.2015 | ||
SK | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
AT | 10.03.2016 | ||
IE | 10.03.2016 | ||
LU | 10.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | CZ | 29.07.2015 | |
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
EE | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
MC | 29.07.2015 | ||
RO | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
SI | 29.07.2015 | ||
SK | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
IE | 10.03.2016 | ||
LU | 10.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | CZ | 29.07.2015 | |
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
EE | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
MC | 29.07.2015 | ||
RO | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
SI | 29.07.2015 | ||
SK | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
LU | 10.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/47] | CZ | 29.07.2015 | |
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
EE | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
RO | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
SI | 29.07.2015 | ||
SK | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
LU | 10.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | CZ | 29.07.2015 | |
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
EE | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
RO | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
SI | 29.07.2015 | ||
SK | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | CZ | 29.07.2015 | |
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
EE | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
RO | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
SK | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CZ | 29.07.2015 | |
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
EE | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | DK | 29.07.2015 | |
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | FI | 29.07.2015 | |
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 29.07.2015 | |
GR | 30.10.2015 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE2827977 (BAYER AG) [A] 1,6* example 3 *; | [DX]EP0075356 (STAMICARBON [NL]) [DX] 1-4,9,10 * the whole document *; | [DA]EP0518412 (DSM NV [NL]) [DA] 1,6 * the whole document * | by applicant | EP0518412 |