|
24.09.2008 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.09.2008 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.08.2007 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.10.2006 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.10.2006 |
Request for transfer of rights |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
21.09.2006 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.08.2006 |
Decision to allow further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.07.2006 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.07.2006 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.07.2006 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.07.2006 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.07.2006 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.07.2006 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.07.2006 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.07.2006 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.07.2006 |
Request for further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.07.2006 |
Communication confirming withdrawal from representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.07.2006 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.06.2006 |
Request for change of representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.06.2006 |
Request for change of representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.05.2006 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (translations of claims/payment missing) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.10.2005 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.10.2005 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
31.10.2005 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
31 |
|
19.08.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.08.2005 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.08.2005 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.08.2005 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.06.2005 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.06.2005 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.05.2005 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.05.2005 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.05.2005 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
09.05.2005 |
Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.03.2005 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-entry into European phase) |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
03.12.2004 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-entry into European phase) |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
05.08.2004 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
30.07.2004 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
07.06.2004 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
07.06.2004 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
07.06.2004 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
07.06.2004 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
07.06.2004 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
07.06.2004 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
07.06.2004 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
07.06.2004 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
19.05.2004 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
33 |
|
02.02.2004 |
Written opinion |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
02.02.2004 |
Written opinion - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
02.02.2004 |
Written opinion - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
15.01.2004 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
08.01.2004 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
08.01.2004 |
International publication of the international search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.10.2003 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
24.10.2003 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
14.10.2003 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
14.10.2003 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
02.10.2003 |
Published international application - A2 |
Search / examination |
32 |
|
04.04.2003 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
04.04.2003 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
04.04.2003 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
17 |
|
04.04.2003 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
13 |
|
18.03.2003 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |