18.09.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.10.2009 [2009/43] |
21.08.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.09.2009 [2009/39] |
30.01.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.03.2009 [2009/10] |
26.09.2008 |
Change - representative |
published on 29.10.2008 [2008/44] |
13.06.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.07.2008 [2008/29] |
25.04.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.05.2008 [2008/22] |
25.01.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.02.2008 [2008/09] |
21.12.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.01.2008 [2008/04] |
19.10.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.11.2007 [2007/47] |
14.09.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.10.2007 [2007/42] |
07.09.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.10.2007 [2007/41] |
31.08.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.10.2007 [2007/40] |
31.08.2007 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 03.10.2007 [2007/40] |
01.06.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.07.2007 [2007/27] |
18.05.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.06.2007 [2007/25] |
20.04.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.05.2007 [2007/21] |
06.04.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.05.2007 [2007/19] |
02.03.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.04.2007 [2007/14] |
20.10.2006 |
Change - applicant |
published on 22.11.2006 [2006/47] |
20.10.2006 |
Change - inventor |
published on 22.11.2006 [2006/47] |
15.09.2006 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 18.10.2006 [2006/42] |
29.08.2006 |
New entry: Decision on request for further processing |
|
29.08.2006 |
Change: Receipt of request for further processing |
|
29.08.2006 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
29.08.2006 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
29.08.2006 |
New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing |
|
11.08.2006 |
New entry: Receipt of request for further processing |
|
07.07.2006 |
Change - representative |
published on 09.08.2006 [2006/32] |
16.05.2006 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
11.04.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
26.10.2005 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
03.09.2005 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
04.08.2005 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
10.06.2005 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 27.07.2005 [2005/30] |
10.06.2005 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 27.07.2005 [2005/30] |
04.06.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
04.06.2005 |
New entry: Fee payment for extension state |
|
01.06.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.06.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
27.05.2005 |
Deletion: Fee payment for extension state |
|
27.05.2005 |
Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state |
|
26.05.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
04.05.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
16.03.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
16.03.2005 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
26.11.2004 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
25.02.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.02.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.01.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
14.11.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
09.10.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
04.10.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.10.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.05.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|